Ruggiano et al v. Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nick Ruggiano and Jayme Stephens
Defendant: Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC and Sean Marks
Case Number: 5:2021cv00581
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of compliance re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint Defendants' supplement to Rule 3.01(g) certification by Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC (Kennedy, Kristyne)
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC. (Kennedy, Kristyne)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint Answer to Counts I - III of Complaint by Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC.(Kennedy, Kristyne)
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC. Related case(s): No (Almeida, Mikayla)
January 14, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC. (Almeida, Mikayla)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 02/02/22 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 03/23/2022 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 2/23/2022 Settlement Report due by 4/12/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/12/2022. (HAI)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default and directing Defendants to file a response to the Complaint within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/10/2022. (AR)
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Clerk Default by All Defendants. (Kennedy, Kristyne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Wood on behalf of Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens (Wood, Joseph)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sean Marks and Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC (HAI)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendants. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/18/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/4/2022. (LAM)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristyne E. Kennedy on behalf of Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC (Kennedy, Kristyne)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC by Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens. (Biggie, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens. Related case(s): No (Biggie, Stephen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens. (Biggie, Stephen)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on December 6, 2021 by Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens as to Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC. (Biggie, Stephen)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on December 6, 2021 by Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens as to Sean Marks. (Biggie, Stephen)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC. (LAB)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/1/2021. (HAI)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0581-GAP-PRL. (SJB)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sean Marks, Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18974864) filed by Nick Ruggiano, Jayme Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Home Builders, #3 Proposed Summons Marks)(Biggie, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruggiano et al v. Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Ruggiano
Represented By: Stephen J. Biggie
Represented By: Joseph C. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Stephens
Represented By: Stephen J. Biggie
Represented By: Joseph C. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Custom Home Builders LLC
Represented By: Kristyne E. Kennedy
Represented By: Mikayla Elizabeth Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Marks
Represented By: Kristyne E. Kennedy
Represented By: Mikayla Elizabeth Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?