Shealy v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Isabell Shealy
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion of Paul Townsend McChesney, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/31/2022. (AR)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Paul Townsend McChesney to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19128211 for $150 by Isabell Shealy. (Goetz, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Isabell Shealy. (Goetz, David)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Isabell Shealy. Related case(s): No (Goetz, David)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/4/2022. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LAB)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (LAB)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:22-cv-00001-GKS-PRL. (APV)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19076937) filed by Isabell Shealy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Goetz, David) Modified on 1/4/2022 (LAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shealy v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabell Shealy
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Represented By: Paul T McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?