Oscar v. FCC Coleman II USP et al
Plaintiff: Jean Erole Oscar and ZB
Defendant: FCC Coleman II USP, FNU Kasmuke and United States of America
Respondent: FNU Wegner and FNU Clemens
Case Number: 5:2022cv00233
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/16/2022. (LAB)
May 16, 2022 Filing 28 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New Case Number: 5:22-cv-00233-WWB-PRL. (LAB)
May 16, 2022 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-23786. File received electronically
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA Closing Case. Motions terminated: #24 MOTION for Issuance of Summons filed by Jean Erole Oscar, #18 MOTION pursuant to Pending Lawsuit (CEF1-26) Complaints: (non exhausted remedy Rule 5.1, 5.2) Defense re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Jean Erole Oscar. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OMNIBUS ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP, (ECF No. #12), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide Plaintiff with the IFP form. Plaintiff's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel, (ECF No. #13), is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, (ECF No. #16), is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion/Writ of Transfer, (ECF No. #19), is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, (ECF No. #23), is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REOPEN this case pending screening. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 24 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Injunctive Relief pursuant to R.I.C.O. Person Act by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE to the Court by Jean Erole Oscar (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 21 MEMO Admissible Evidence for Permanent Injunctive Relief pursuant to R.I.C.O. Person Act with Derivative Action pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23.1 by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Admissible Evidence by Jean Erole Oscar re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION/Writ of Transfer by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 18 EMERGENCY MOTION pursuant to Pending Lawsuit (ECF 1-26) Complaints: (non exhausted remedy Rule 5.1, 5.2) Defense re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Admissible Evidence by Jean Erole Oscar (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Addendum by Jean Erole Oscar (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: First Request for Production of Documents by Jean Erole Oscar.(ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jean Erole Oscar. Responses due by 1/24/2022 (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of Law re #10 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Jean Erole Oscar. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCC Coleman II USP filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Jean Erole Oscar. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE Pleading Fed.R.Civ.P. 8(a) Claim for Relief by Jean Erole Oscar (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE to Plead Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(a) by Jean Erole Oscar (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of compliance re #6 Order. Copy of Order and forms mailed to Plaintiff. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORRECTED OMNIBUS ORDER. Plaintiff's Complaint, (ECF No. #1), is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Monday, January 31, 2022, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, labeled "Amended Complaint," that cures the deficiencies identified herein. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINSITRATIVELY CLOSE this matter for statistical purposes only. This shall not affect the Parties' substantive rights. On or before Monday, January 31, 2022, Plaintiffs shall either pay the $402 filing fee, or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Assistance of Counsel, (ECF No. #3), is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Newly Discovered Evidence, (ECF No. #4), is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner), #2 IFP form) (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OMNIBUS ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint without prejudice. (Amended Complaint due by 1/31/2022); (Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Filing Fee due by 1/31/2022); denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #4 Motion for Newly Discovered Evidence; Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Newly Discovery Evidence by Jean Erole Oscar. (scn) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Assistance of Counsel by Jean Erole Oscar. Responses due by 11/23/2021. (scn) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to Bivens against FCC Coleman II USP. Filing fee $ 402.00 (Filing fee not filed/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Jean Erole Oscar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(daa) [Transferred from flsd on 5/16/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oscar v. FCC Coleman II USP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Erole Oscar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCC Coleman II USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Kasmuke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU Wegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU Clemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?