United States of America v. Collins
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas R. Collins
Case Number: 5:2022cv00529
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/28/2022. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to the pro se defendant. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/14/2022. (LAM)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thomas R. Collins.(LAB)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF of service by United States of America as to Thomas R. Collins. (McQuillan, Hana) Modified on 11/21/2022 (LAB).
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United States of America. Related case(s): No (McQuillan, Hana)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by United States of America. (McQuillan, Hana)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas R. Collins. (LAB)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/8/2022. (HAI)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:22-cv-0529-GAP-PRL. (SJB)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas R. Collins filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(McQuillan, Hana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Hana Bilicki McQuillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?