Hollander et al v. KA and KM Development, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Elson, Sheela Indran, William Henry Hiscocks, Madeleine Blackburn, Catherine Murphy, Adrian Bruce, Simon Astbury, Peter Lightowler, Terence Kenny, Ruixue Wang, Paul Gapp, Paul Ashby, Mary Rose McDougall, Matt Steel, Heather Lightowler, Nicholas Hill, Elaine Shaw, Robert Liddell, Jason R. Nellyer, Tahir Virk, Alison Struthers, Stephen Park, Brett Ellway, Shashi Gupta-Behl, Richard Tomsett, Ian Wagstaff, Rosalind Helen Spanton, Joshua Cole, Lisa Woodward, Ian S. Rathbone, Lee Worley, Kristen Brymer, Isobel Mcainish, Kevin McGurk, Lorna Gapp, Ann Marie Dudley, David Ritchie Pyper, Terry Colin Hayden, Gary Dunn, Margaret May Rathbone, Lesley Hill, Fiona Louise Fawcett, Philip James Leach, Amin K. Somani, Anne Hayden, Edward John Dudley, Gordon Mark Richards, Susan Dempsey, Theodora Samuel, Ravi Louis Valdini, Steven Hilton, Ralph Harris, Laura Hannah Jayne Hewitt, Karen Barker, Trevor Long, Derek George Clement White, Paul Dennison, Annette Lilian Leach, Roger Frampton, Kate Cunningham, Hilary Rusby, Carl George Woodroffe, Susan Wagstaff, Helen Hart, Nicolle Bruce, Susan Coupland, Sanjay Adatia, George Gerard Dempsey, Elizabeth Long, Mary O'Mara, John Rusby, Peter Coupland, Phillip John Aubrey, Karima A. Somani, Janet Ballard, Hugh Thomas Fawcett, Brian O'Mara, Thomas Cunningham, Jennifer Ruth Beckett, Maureen Joy Richards, Anthony Jakara, Paul Murphy, Milica Wetherill, Valerie Hollander, John Russell, Pamela Lad, Suzanne Coleman, Kenneth Haughton, Julie Ellway, Payan Lad, Neil Ballard, Rashpal Baht, Susan Bainbridge, Sarah Nellyer, Suzanne Hilton, David J. Hollander, Susan Park, Kishorilal Shah, Clifford R. Justice, Tina Susan Hiscocks, Nicholas Charles Dyson, Karen Barbara Taylor, Kamaljit Baht, Krishnan Indran, Ian Keith Taylor, Stephen Arnold Beckett, Peter Reynolds, Kerrie Garner, Jonathan Garner, Carl Wetherill, Garry Coleman, Carole Vivien Williams, Gail Holden, Charlotte Ashwick, Barry Ashwick, Brigitte Mundel, Jyoti Shah and Beena Adatia
Defendant: KA and KM Development, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2008cv02132
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Anne C Conway
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER dismissing the listed cases. Each party shall bear their own attorney ffes and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 6/18/2010. (CH) (CH).
June 17, 2010 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Beena Adatia, Sanjay Adatia, Paul Ashby, Barry Ashwick, Charlotte Ashwick, Simon Astbury, Phillip John Aubrey, Kamaljit Baht, Rashpal Baht, Susan Bainbridge, Janet Ballard, Neil Ballard, Karen Barker, Jennifer Ruth Beckett, Stephen Arnold Beckett, Madeleine Blackburn, Adrian Bruce, Nicolle Bruce, Kristen Brymer, Joshua Cole, Garry Coleman, Suzanne Coleman, Peter Coupland, Susan Coupland, Kate Cunningham, Thomas Cunningham, George Gerard Dempsey, Susan Dempsey, Paul Dennison, Ann Marie Dudley, Edward John Dudley, Gary Dunn, Nicholas Charles Dyson, Brett Ellway, Julie Ellway, Stephen Elson, Fiona Louise Fawcett, Hugh Thomas Fawcett, Roger Frampton, Lorna Gapp, Paul Gapp, Jonathan Garner, Kerrie Garner, Shashi Gupta-Behl, Ralph Harris, Helen Hart, Kenneth Haughton, Anne Hayden, Terry Colin Hayden, Laura Hannah Jayne Hewitt, Lesley Hill, Nicholas Hill, Steven Hilton, Suzanne Hilton, Tina Susan Hiscocks, William Henry Hiscocks, Gail Holden, David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander, Krishnan Indran, Sheela Indran, Anthony Jakara, Clifford R. Justice, KA and KM Development, Inc., Terence Kenny, Pamela Lad, Payan Lad, Annette Lilian Leach, Philip James Leach, Robert Liddell, Heather Lightowler, Peter Lightowler, Elizabeth Long, Trevor Long, Mary Rose McDougall, Kevin McGurk, Isobel Mcainish, Brigitte Mundel, Catherine Murphy, Paul Murphy, Jason R. Nellyer, Sarah Nellyer, Brian O'Mara, Mary O'Mara, Stephen Park, Susan Park, David Ritchie Pyper, Ian S. Rathbone, Margaret May Rathbone, Peter Reynolds, Gordon Mark Richards, Maureen Joy Richards, Hilary Rusby, John Rusby, John Russell, Theodora Samuel, Jyoti Shah, Kishorilal Shah, Elaine Shaw, Amin K. Somani, Karima A. Somani, Rosalind Helen Spanton, Matt Steel, Alison Struthers, Ian Keith Taylor, Karen Barbara Taylor, Richard Tomsett, Ravi Louis Valdini, Tahir Virk, Ian Wagstaff, Susan Wagstaff, Ruixue Wang, Carl Wetherill, Milica Wetherill, Derek George Clement White, Carole Vivien Williams, Carl George Woodroffe, Lisa Woodward, Lee Worley. (Urban, John)
April 29, 2010 Filing 110 RESPONSE re #109 Order directing compliance and Status Report filed by KA and KM Development, Inc.. (Green, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER directing compliance with the filing of a status report. Responses due by 5/3/2010 Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/24/2010. (CH)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ENDORSED ORDER granting #106 Motion to substitute attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 12/21/2009. (Baker, David)
December 18, 2009 Filing 107 STATUS REPORT and Response to #105 Order Directing Compliance by KA and KM Development, Inc. (Green, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/21/2009 (IGC).
December 18, 2009 Filing 106 MOTION to substitute attorney Jimmy Parrish in place of Daniel H. Coultoff(Agreed) by KA and KM Development, Inc.. (Green, Elizabeth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Modified on 12/21/2009 (IGC).
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER directing compliance with this Court's Order (Doc. No. #103) Responses due by 12/22/09 Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/8/2009. (CH)
August 18, 2009 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT by KA and KM Development, Inc.. (Green, Elizabeth)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER AUTOMATICALLY STAYING CASE. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. Defendant is directed to file and serve, on or before August 14, 2009, and every three months thereafter a status report regarding bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/13/2009. (CH)
May 6, 2009 Filing 102 SUGGESTION of Pendency of Reorganization Proceeding byKA and KM Development, Inc.. (Thakrar, Sheena)
May 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENDORSED ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No further extensions should be sought absent a showing of extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 5/3/2009. (Baker, David)
May 1, 2009 Filing 100 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION for summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by all defendants. (Thakrar, Sheena) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ENDORSED ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 4/8/2009. (Baker, David)
April 7, 2009 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time up to & including 5/1/09 to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION for summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by KA & KM Development, Inc. (Thakrar, Sheena) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Modified on 4/8/2009 (IGC).
March 30, 2009 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT of Simon Astbury re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Simon Astbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Shashi Gupta-Behl re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Shashi Gupta-Behl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT of Anne Hayden re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Anne Hayden, Terry Colin Hayden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT of Nicolle Bruce re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Nicolle Bruce, Adrian Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Derek George Clement White re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Derek George Clement White, Ruixue Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT of Laura Hannah Jayne Hewitt re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Laura Hannah Jayne Hewitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT of Lee Worley re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Lee Worley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT of Susan Dempsey re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Susan Dempsey, George Gerard Dempsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Jakara re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Anthony Jakara, Elaine Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT of Steven Hilton re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Steven Hilton, Suzanne Hilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT of Krishnan Indran re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Krishnan Indran, Sheela Indran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT of Mary O'Mara re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Mary O'Mara, Brian O'Mara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Arnold Beckett re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Stephen Arnold Beckett, Jennifer Ruth Beckett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT of Ralph Harris re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Ralph Harris, Kristen Brymer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT of Karen Barbara Taylor re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Karen Barbara Taylor, Ian Keith Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of Edward John Dudley re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Edward John Dudley, Ann Marie Dudley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Ravi Louis Valdini re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Ravi Louis Valdini, Mary Rose McDougall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Carole Vivien Williams re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Carole Vivien Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Gordon Mark Richards re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Gordon Mark Richards, Maureen Joy Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Alison Struthers re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Alison Struthers, Kenneth Haughton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Garry Coleman re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Garry Coleman, Suzanne Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Janet Ballard re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Janet Ballard, Neil Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Susan Coupland re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Susan Coupland, Peter Coupland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Kerrie Garner re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Kerrie Garner, Jonathan Garner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Kevin McGurk re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Kevin McGurk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Carl George Woodroffe re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Carl George Woodroffe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of David Ritchie Pyper re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by David Ritchie Pyper, Isobel Mcainish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Mundel re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Brigitte Mundel, Phillip John Aubrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Rosalind Helen Spanton re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Rosalind Helen Spanton, Nicholas Charles Dyson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Gail Holden re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Gail Holden, Roger Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Ian S. Rathbone re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Ian S. Rathbone, Margaret May Rathbone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Fiona Louise Fawcett re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Fiona Louise Fawcett, Hugh Thomas Fawcett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua Cole re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Joshua Cole, Terence Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Peter Lightowler re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Peter Lightowler, Heather Lightowler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Philip James Leach re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Philip James Leach, Annette Lilian Leach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of William Henry Hiscocks re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by William Henry Hiscocks, Tina Susan Hiscocks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Ashby re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Paul Ashby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Helen Hart re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Helen Hart, John Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Amin K. Somani re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Amin K. Somani, Karima A. Somani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Matt Steel re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Matt Steel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of Kishorilal Shah re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Kishorilal Shah, Jyoti Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Lorna Gapp re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Lorna Gapp, Paul Gapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Jason R. Nellyer re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Jason R. Nellyer, Sarah Nellyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of John Rusby re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by John Rusby, Hilary Rusby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Rashpal Baht re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Rashpal Baht, Kamaljit Baht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Tahir Virk re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Tahir Virk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Tomsett re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Richard Tomsett, Stephen Elson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Clifford R. Justice re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Clifford R. Justice, Susan Bainbridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Gary Dunn re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Gary Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Brett Ellway re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Brett Ellway, Julie Ellway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Dennison re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Paul Dennison, Madeleine Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Carl Wetherill re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Carl Wetherill, Milica Wetherill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Liddell re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Robert Liddell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas Cunningham re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Thomas Cunningham, Kate Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Peter Reynolds re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Peter Reynolds, Karen Barker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Theodora Samuel re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Theodora Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Payan Lad re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Payan Lad, Pamela Lad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Trevor Long re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Trevor Long, Elizabeth Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas Hill re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Nicholas Hill, Lesley Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Susan Park re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Susan Park, Stephen Park. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Ian Wagstaff re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Ian Wagstaff, Susan Wagstaff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Charlotte Ashwick re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Charlotte Ashwick, Barry Ashwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Murphy re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Paul Murphy, Catherine Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Lisa Woodward re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Lisa Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Beena Adatia re: #32 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #31 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #30 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #28 MOTION for summary judgment by Beena Adatia, Sanjay Adatia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander re #29 Affidavit, #28 MOTION for summary judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Exhibit 4 to each Plaintiff Affidavit in Support of Omnibus Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Legal Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander re #29 Affidavit, #28 MOTION for summary judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Exhibit 2 to each Plaintiff Affidavit in Support of Omnibus Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Legal Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander re #29 Affidavit, #28 MOTION for summary judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Exhibit 1 to each Plaintiff Affidavit in Support of Omnibus Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Legal Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 2)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of David J. Hollander re: #28 MOTION for summary judgment by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Urban, John)
March 30, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for summary judgment by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. (Urban, John)
March 19, 2009 Filing 27 AMENDED Notice of Pendency of Other Actions by KA and KM Development, Inc. re #24 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. (Thakrar, Sheena) Modified on 3/19/2009 (IGC).
March 19, 2009 Filing 26 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement by KA and KM Development, Inc. re #24 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing (Thakrar, Sheena) Modified on 3/19/2009 (IGC).
March 13, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE of Adopting the Averments of its previously filed ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses as its Responsive pleading in each related case consolidated with the LEAD Case by KA and KM Development, Inc. (Thakrar, Sheena) Modified on 3/16/2009 (MJT).
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing directed to all newly consolidated cases. Notice of pendency of other actions and Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by by 03/27/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/12/2009. (CH)
March 11, 2009 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #24 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2 by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. (Urban, John) Modified on 3/12/2009 (IGC).
March 11, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #24 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. Related case(s): yes (Urban, John) Modified on 3/12/2009 (IGC).
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER consolidating for pretrial purposes cases 6:09-cv-411-Orl-22DAB, 6:09-cv-412-Orl-22DAB, 6:09-cv-414-Orl-22DAB, 6:09-cv-419-Orl-22DAB, 6:09-cv-420-Orl-22DAB, 6:09-cv-421-Orl-22DAB & 6:09-cv-422-Orl-22DAB. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/10/2009. (IGC)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for clarification; with instructions to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/10/2009. (EC)
March 5, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION for clarification of Recent Orders Regarding Consolidation by KA and KM Development, Inc.. (Thakrar, Sheena)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing directed to all newly consolidated cases. Notice of pendency of other actions and Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/15/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/2/2009. (CH)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/25/2009. (CH)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER consolidating for pretrial purposes cases 6:09-cv-282-22DAB, 6:09-cv-283-22DAB, 6:09-cv-284-22DAB, 6:09-cv-285-22DAB, 6:09-cv-287-22DAB, 6:09-cv-288-22DAB, 6:09-cv-290-22DAB, 6:09-cv-291-22DAB, 6:09-cv-292-22DAB, 6:09-cv-330-22DAB, 6:09-cv-331-22DAB, 6:09-cv-332-22DAB, 6:09-cv-333-22DAB, 6:09-cv-334-22DAB, 6:09-cv-335-22DAB, 6:09-cv-336-22DAB 6:09-cv-337-22DAB. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/24/2009. (IGC)
February 23, 2009 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Urban, John)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER consolidating for pretrial purposes cases 6:09-cv-189-22DAB, 6:09-cv-190-22DAB, 6:09-cv-195-22DAB, 6:09-cv-196-22DAB & 6:09-cv-197-22DAB, 6:09-cv-198-22DAB & 6:09-cv-199-22DAB. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/3/2009. (IGC)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER consolidating for pretrial purposes cases 6:09-cv-185-22DAB, 6:09-cv-186-22DAB, 6:09-cv-191-22DAB, 6:09-cv-192-22DAB & 6:09-cv-194-22DAB. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/2/2009. (IGC)
February 2, 2009 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by KA and KM Development, Inc..(Thakrar, Sheena)
January 21, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/Interested persons/ECF per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. Related case(s): yes (Urban, John)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to extend time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 1/20/2009. (IGC)
January 16, 2009 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/Interested Persos/ECF-2 by KA and KM Development, Inc. (Thakrar, Sheena) Modified on 1/20/2009 (IGC).
January 15, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/Interested persons/ECF per Local Rule 1.04(d) by KA and KM Development, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Thakrar, Sheena)
January 15, 2009 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to February 2, 2009 To Respond To Complaint by KA and KM Development, Inc.. (Thakrar, Sheena)
January 5, 2009 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/2008 by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander as to KA and KM Development, Inc.. (Urban, John)
December 30, 2008 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/Interested persons/ECF by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. (Urban, John)
December 30, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/Interested persons/ECF per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander. Related case(s): y (Urban, John)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions and Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 01/14/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/30/2008. (CH)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER -- Cases as listed in this order are reassigned to Chief District Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker; The Clerk is directed to file and docket this Order in all of the cases identified in paragraphs 1 and 2 of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/24/2008. (CH)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KA and KM Development, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 29832) filed by David J. Hollander, Valerie Hollander.(IGC)
December 22, 2008 Summons issued as to KA and KM Development, Inc. (IGC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollander et al v. KA and KM Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Elson
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheela Indran
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Henry Hiscocks
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeleine Blackburn
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Murphy
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Bruce
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Astbury
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lightowler
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Kenny
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruixue Wang
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gapp
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ashby
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rose McDougall
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Steel
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lightowler
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hill
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Shaw
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Liddell
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R. Nellyer
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahir Virk
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Struthers
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Park
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Ellway
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shashi Gupta-Behl
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tomsett
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Wagstaff
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Helen Spanton
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Cole
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Woodward
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian S. Rathbone
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Worley
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Brymer
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isobel Mcainish
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McGurk
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Gapp
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Dudley
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ritchie Pyper
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Colin Hayden
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dunn
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret May Rathbone
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Hill
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiona Louise Fawcett
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip James Leach
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amin K. Somani
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Hayden
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward John Dudley
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Mark Richards
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Dempsey
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodora Samuel
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravi Louis Valdini
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hilton
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Harris
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hannah Jayne Hewitt
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Barker
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Long
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek George Clement White
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dennison
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Lilian Leach
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Frampton
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Cunningham
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Rusby
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl George Woodroffe
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wagstaff
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Hart
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolle Bruce
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Coupland
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjay Adatia
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gerard Dempsey
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Long
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary O'Mara
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rusby
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Coupland
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip John Aubrey
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karima A. Somani
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Ballard
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Thomas Fawcett
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian O'Mara
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cunningham
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ruth Beckett
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Joy Richards
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jakara
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Murphy
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milica Wetherill
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Hollander
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Russell
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lad
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Coleman
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Haughton
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ellway
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payan Lad
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Ballard
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashpal Baht
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bainbridge
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Nellyer
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Hilton
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Hollander
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Park
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishorilal Shah
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford R. Justice
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Susan Hiscocks
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Charles Dyson
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Barbara Taylor
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamaljit Baht
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishnan Indran
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Keith Taylor
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Arnold Beckett
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Reynolds
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerrie Garner
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Garner
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wetherill
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Coleman
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Vivien Williams
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Holden
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Ashwick
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Ashwick
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigitte Mundel
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jyoti Shah
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beena Adatia
Represented By: John L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KA and KM Development, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel H. Coultoff
Represented By: Sheena A. Thakrar
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Represented By: Jimmy D. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?