Shutts v. Precision Assessment Technology Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Shutts
Defendant: Precision Assessment Technology Corporation and Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation
Case Number: 6:2008cv02191
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #35 Stipulation of Dismissal; case removed from 11/10 trial docket; clerk directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/2/2010. (TKW)
March 1, 2010 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Brian Shutts and Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. (Beaudine, Michael) Modified on 3/2/2010 (JET).
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/23/2009. (ECJ)
June 22, 2009 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to substitute attorney Brian C. Blair and Scott E. Damon in place of John Finnigan as attorney for Defendant by Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. (Damon, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 6/22/2009 (JET).
May 26, 2009 CASE REFERRED to mediation; Jay Cohen appointed Mediator. (JET)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/26/2009. (TKW)
May 22, 2009 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Klein, Jason)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File CMR. The parties shall file their Case Management Report by no later than Friday, May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/14/2009. (TFF)
May 13, 2009 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/22/09 to File Case Management Report by Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. (Finnigan, John) Modified on 5/14/2009 (JET).
April 20, 2009 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Precision Assessment Technology Corporation.(Finnigan, John)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Dismiss and granting #26 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/6/2009. (TFF)
March 27, 2009 Filing 26 MOTION to strike the Affidavit of Robert E. Nowack filed with #25 Notice in support of #23 Memorandum by Brian Shutts. (Klein, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 3/30/2009 (JET).
March 26, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE of filing Affidavit re #23 Memorandum in Support by Precision Assessment Technology Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert E. Nowack)(Finnigan, John) Modified on 3/27/2009 (JET). Modified on 4/7/2009 (JET). AFFIDAVIT STRICKEN PER ORDER #27.
March 23, 2009 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #20 Interested persons order by Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PATC Creditors List)(Finnigan, John)
March 23, 2009 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #19 Motion to dismiss or to Stay The Complaint and/or to Transfer and to Consolidate with Action Filed in Canada, filed by Brian Shutts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed in case 6:08-cv-1653)(Klein, Jason) Modified on 3/24/2009 (JET).
March 20, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE by Brian Shutts of serving Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Attachments: #1 Brian Shutts' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions)(Klein, Jason) Modified on 3/23/2009 (JET).
March 20, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE by Brian Shutts of serving Related Case Order and Track Two Notice and Interested Persons Order for Civil Cases (Attachments: #1 Related Case Order and Track Two Notice, #2 Interested Persons Order for Civil Cases)(Klein, Jason) Modified on 3/23/2009 (JET).
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Defendant PRECISION ASSESSMENT TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/23/2009 Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/10/2009. (Counsel mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
March 9, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for improper venue and/or to transfer and consolidate with action filed in Canada by Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Endorsement On Originating Process for Service Outside British Columbia)(Finnigan, John) Modified on 3/10/2009 (JET).
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Brian Shutts; Plaintiffs claims against Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Any pending motions as to this Defendant are DENIED as moot, specifically said #8 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; this action remains pending against Defendant Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/3/2009. (TKW)
March 2, 2009 Filing 17 RESPONSE to motion re #8 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Brian Shutts. (Klein, Jason)
March 2, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Precission Assessment Technology (US) Corporation Without Prejudice by Brian Shutts (Klein, Jason) Modified on 3/3/2009 (JET).
February 27, 2009 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation. (Finnigan, John)
February 27, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related Case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation. Related case(s): y (Finnigan, John) Modified on 3/2/2009 (JET).
February 27, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE by Brian Shutts of serving Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Klein, Jason) Modified on 3/2/2009 (JET).
February 26, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE by Brian Shutts of Serving Notice of Pendency and Related Case Order and Track Two Notice (Klein, Jason)
February 24, 2009 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on February 17, 2009 by Brian Shutts as to Precision Assessment Technology Corporation. (Klein, Jason)
February 24, 2009 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on January 26, 2009 by Brian Shutts as to Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation, by substitute service on secretary Karla Ingebretsen. (Klein, Jason) Modified on 2/25/2009 (JET).
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Defendant PRECISION ASSESSMENT TECHNOLOGY (U.S.) CORPORATION. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/2/2009 Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/18/2009. (counsel emailed)(AKJ)
February 17, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation. (Finnigan, John)
February 17, 2009 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on February 13, 2009 by Brian Shutts as to Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation. (Klein, Jason)
February 16, 2009 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Brian Shutts (Klein, Jason) Attorney will refile as return of service. Modified on 2/17/2009 (JET).
January 15, 2009 Summons issued as to Precision Assessment Technology Corporation and Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation. (JET)
January 13, 2009 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Brian Shutts. (Klein, Jason)
January 13, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian Shutts. Related case(s): NO (Klein, Jason)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Plaintiff. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/16/2009 Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/5/2009. (counsel emailed)(AKJ)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/16/2009 Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/5/2009. (counsel emailed/mailed)(AKJ)
December 31, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Precision Assessment Technology Corporation, Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 29916) filed by Brian Shutts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(IGC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shutts v. Precision Assessment Technology Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Shutts
Represented By: Michael J. Beaudine
Represented By: Jason H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Assessment Technology Corporation
Represented By: Brian C. Blair
Represented By: Scott E. Damon
Represented By: John M. Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Assessment Technology (U.S.) Corporation
Represented By: John M. Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?