Foley et al v. Orange County et al
Plaintiff: David W. Foley, Jr. and Jennifer T. Foley
Defendant: Orange County, Phil Smith, Carol Hossfield, Mitch Gordon, Rocco Relvini, Tara Gould, Tim Boldig, Frank Detoma, Asima Azam, Roderick Love, Scott Richman, Joe Roberts, Marcus Robinson, Richard Crotty, Teresa Jacobs, Fred Brummer, Mildred Fernandez, Linda Stewart, Bill Segal and Tiffany Russell
Case Number: 6:2012cv00269
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Presiding Judge: Karla R. Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER dismissing case pursuant to the Eleventh Circuit's directives for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/27/2016. (VMF)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 FINAL JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/30/2013. (VMF)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 269 Motion for summary judgment; denying as moot 175 motion to dismiss and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 261 Motion for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/13/2013. (VMF)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion to determine sufficiency of responses to requests for admission. The County shall serve amended responses as directed in the order on or before June 13, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/10/2013. (Spaulding, Karla)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying the Individual Defendants' 155 Motion for Judgment Pursuant to Rules 54(b) and 58. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/19/2012. (RMN)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to dismiss and Motion for summary judgment;T he Amended Complaint (Doc. 85) is STRICKEN. The claims brought against Defendants Fred Brummer, Richard Crotty, Teresa Jacobs, Linda Stewart, Bill Se gal, and Tiffany Russel, Frank Detoma, Asima Azam, Roderick Love, Scott Richman, Joe Roberts, and Marcus Robinson, Tim Boldig, Mitch Gordon, Tara Gould, Carol Hossfield, Rocco Retini, and Phil Smith are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The claims brought ag ainst Orange County are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint that is consistent with this Order on or before January 4, 2013. Orange County shall answer on or before January 25, 2013 denying without prejudice 100 Motion for summary judgment; denying 115 Motion to strike ; denying 146 Motion ; denying 149 Motion. Discovery in this action is STAYED until such a time as the pleadings are closed. This case is hereby referred the Honorable David A. Baker for a mediation conference. The mediation conference shall be conducted on or before February 15, 2013.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/4/2012. (VMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley et al v. Orange County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Foley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer T. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Hossfield
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Gordon
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocco Relvini
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Gould
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Boldig
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Detoma
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asima Azam
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Richman
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Roberts
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Crotty
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Brummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Fernandez
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Stewart
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Segal
Represented By: Linda Brehmer Lanosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?