MEDai, Inc. v. Quantros, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
MEDai, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Quantros, Inc. |
Counter_claimant: |
Quantros, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
MEDai, Inc. |
Case Number: |
6:2012cv00840 |
Filed: |
June 4, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Orlando Office |
County: |
Orange |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory J. Kelly |
Presiding Judge: |
Roy B. Dalton |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 16, 2012 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction. The Order provides directions to the parties and to the Magistrate Judge. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/16/2012. (LLM)
|
June 29, 2012 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 32 Motion to Seal Document. See Order for additional information. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/29/2012. (HH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: MEDai, Inc. v. Quantros, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MEDai, Inc. |
Represented By: |
J. Allen Maines |
Represented By: |
John Griff Lucas, III |
Represented By: |
Kimberly D. Healy |
Represented By: |
Mayanne Downs |
Represented By: |
Charles Talley Wells, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Quantros, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Gerald P. Dodson |
Represented By: |
Casey Reeder Lennox |
Represented By: |
Lara J. Tibbals |
Represented By: |
Christine Watson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Quantros, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Gerald P. Dodson |
Represented By: |
Casey Reeder Lennox |
Represented By: |
Lara J. Tibbals |
Represented By: |
Christine Watson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: MEDai, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Mayanne Downs |
Represented By: |
Kimberly D. Healy |
Represented By: |
John Griff Lucas, III |
Represented By: |
J. Allen Maines |
Represented By: |
Charles Talley Wells, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?