Federal Trade Commission, and State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General v. Information Management Forum, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General
Defendant: Information Management Forum, Inc. and Edward Lee Windsor
Receiver: Mark J. Bernet
Case Number: 6:2012cv00986
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Presiding Judge: Karla R. Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER adopting 66 Report and Recommendation; granting 64 Receiver's Final Application for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; accepting 65 Final Report; and granting 65 Motion to Conclude Receivership and Discharge Receiver. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/8/2015. (EK)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER adopting 54 Report and Recommendation and granting 52 Receiver's Second Interim Application for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/19/2013. (EK)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 44 Plaintiffs' Renewed Joint Motion for a Judgment and Final Order Against Defendants; Plaintiffs shall have until August 16, 2013, to file a motion, memorandum of law, and evidence in support of the remedies they request in this case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/28/2013. (BRS)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/9/2012. (ED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission, and State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General v. Information Management Forum, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Information Management Forum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lee Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Valerie M. Verduce
Represented By: Steven Spencer Elg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Elizabeth Josephine Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Mark J. Bernet
Represented By: Mark James Bernet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?