Brewer et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Brewer and Tina M. Brewer
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Freddie Mac Multiclass Series 3231, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS") and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2012cv01633
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Patricia C. Fawsett
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER dismissing case Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/17/2013. (VMF)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 19 motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs may, on or before March 29, 2013, file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/12/2013. (VMF)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiffs Complaint for Damages (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before January 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/13/2012. (VMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph D. Wargo
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Mac Multiclass Series 3231
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Joseph D. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS")
Represented By: Joseph D. Wargo
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph D. Wargo
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Brewer
Represented By: Kenneth H. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M. Brewer
Represented By: Kenneth H. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?