Iglesias v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Tomi Jo Iglesias
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2012cv01683
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
Presiding Judge: G. Kendall Sharp
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting and approving 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Commissioner's final decision in this case is affirmed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and thereafter close the case. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/12/2018. (SC)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER adopting and approving 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Commissioner of Social Security's Motion to Reopen Case 31 is granted in that the Clerk of Court is directed to reopen the case. Otherwise, the Motion to Reopen is denied. A Scheduling Order shall follow after entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 6/15/2017. (SC)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 Unopposed MOTION to remand to Social Security filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Motion is GRANTED. Clerk of the Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/21/2013. (DB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iglesias v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomi Jo Iglesias
Represented By: Bradley K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?