Realan Investment Partners, LLP et al v. Meininger et al
Interested Party: Euram Laird Point Associates, LP, Euram Peter Point Associates, LP, Daniel D. Dinur, Euram Resources, LLC, Euram, LLC, Euram Greyrock Associates, LP, Euram Laird Bayou Associates, LP and Barrington H. Branch
Appellee: Jane Doe Beneficiaries, Ward Family, PLLC, The Mallory Elizabeth Ward Trust, The Estate of Diane Elizabeth Ward, The Mallory Ward and Descendants Trust, Ward Family Investment, PLLC, The J. Robert Ward Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust No. 1, J. Robert Ward, The J. Robert Ward Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust No. 2, Paula Cardinale Saare, Leigh R. Meininger, The Robert Ward Family Trust, The John Doe Trust, The Sarah Caitlin Ward Trust, Lexcon Insurance Company, Sarah Caitlin Ward, Mallory Elizabeth Ward, Ward Family Investment, LLC and Bond Safeguard Insurance Company
Appellant: Realan Investment Partners, LLP and Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC
In Re: Land Resource, LLC
Trustee: Charles R. Sterbach
Case Number: 6:2013cv00476
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT, Doc. 28. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford. (KS)
February 6, 2018 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal held on 11/12/13 before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 2/27/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2018. (KS)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER. The Order of the bankruptcy court entered on January 22, 2013, which granted the motions to approve the Ward Settlement Agreement and the Euram Litigation Agreement is AFFIRMED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/10/2014. (BGS)
November 12, 2013 Filing 26 Minute Entry (ORAL ARGUMENT ON BANKRUPTCY APPEAL) Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/12/2013. Court takes matter under advisement. Written Order to follow.Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (NBL)
October 24, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Appellants, Realan Investment Partners, LLLP and Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC by Realan Investment Partners, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Higgins, Robert)
October 10, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING ON BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Oral Argument): An Oral Argument is set for 11/12/2013 at 2:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. The Court has set aside 20 minutes for Appellant and 20 minutes for the Appellee. (NBL) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 20, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #22 Appellee's brief - bankruptcy by Leigh R. Meininger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vilmos, Nicolette)
May 29, 2013 Filing 22 APPELLEE'S/ANSWER BRIEF by Leigh R. Meininger. (Vilmos, Nicolette) Text modified on 5/30/2013 (RDO).
May 29, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly A. Pohl on behalf of Leigh R. Meininger (Pohl, Beverly)
May 15, 2013 Reset deadlines: Appellee Brief due by 5/29/2013. (MAA)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. The deadline for Appellee, Leigh Meininger, to file an Answer Brief is extended up to and including May 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/15/2013. (Honeywell, C)
May 14, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Brief by Leigh R. Meininger. (Vilmos, Nicolette)
April 18, 2013 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Realan Investment Partners, LLP identifying Other Affiliate Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC, Other Affiliate REALAN CAPITAL CORP, Other Affiliate FUQUA FAMILY FUND, L.P., Other Affiliate REX FUQUA, an individual, Other Affiliate Ray Weeks, an individual for Realan Investment Partners, LLP.. (Higgins, Robert)
April 18, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Notice of pendency of related cases by Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC and Realan Investment Partners, LLLP per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Realan Investment Partners, LLP. Related case(s): yes (Higgins, Robert)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Appellee's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Brief. The deadline for Appellee, Leigh Meininger, to file an Answer Brief is extended until May 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/18/2013. (BGS)
April 16, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Brief by Leigh R. Meininger. (Vilmos, Nicolette)
April 11, 2013 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #10 Interested persons order Amended by Leigh R. Meininger. (Vilmos, Nicolette)
April 11, 2013 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Leigh R. Meininger. (Vilmos, Nicolette)
April 11, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Leigh R. Meininger. Related case(s): yes (Vilmos, Nicolette)
April 10, 2013 Filing 11 APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Realan Investment Partners, LLP. (Higgins, Robert)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/4/2013. (NBL) copies e-mailed/mailed
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/4/2013. (NBL) copies e-mailed/mailed
April 3, 2013 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. New case number: 6:13-cv-476-orl-36. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (JEV)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of recusal. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another district judge. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/2/2013. (LAM)
March 28, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel John C. Weitnauer of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (JEV) Modified on 3/28/2013 (JET). ENTERED IN ERROR. THIS ATTORNEY WAS ADMITTED PRO HAC IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE.
March 28, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8009. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 3/27/13. File received electronically. (JEV)
March 27, 2013 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Doc 1388 Transcript of Nov 28, 2012 Hearing filed by Realan Investment Partners, LLP, Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC.(MH)
March 27, 2013 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Doc 1282 Chapter 7 Trustee's Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement of Claims (Attachments: #1 doc 1312 Mot to Appr Supp Compromise, #2 doc 1313 Mot to appr Compromise of Contro, #3 doc 1314 Mot Release Funds, #4 doc 1330 Ntc filing signatures to suppl, #5 doc 1331 Ntc filing signatures to Euram agrmt, #6 doc 1332 Renewed obj Realan-Weeks, #7 doc 1344 Ntc of Supplemental Case Auth, #8 doc 1346 Plaintiff exhibit list and exhibits pages 1-20, #9 doc 1346 Plaintiff exhibit list and exhibits pages 21-39, #10 doc 1347 Tee prop order and memo op, #11 doc 1348 Tee prop order and memo op, #12 doc 1351 Obj to Tee Prop Order and memo op, #13 doc 1351 exhibit A prop ord memo op, #14 doc 1351 exhibit B 11 28 12 hrg transcript, #15 doc 1352 Obj to tee prop ord and memo op Euram, #16 doc 1352 exhibit A prop ord and memo op, #17 doc 1352 exhibit B 11 28 12 hrg transcript) filed by Realan Investment Partners, LLP, Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC.(MH)
March 27, 2013 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Doc 1216 Motion Pursuant to Rule 9019 to Approve Compromise & Settlement (Attachments: #1 doc 1222 Obj to mot rule 9019, #2 doc 1223 Obj of Bond and Lexcon, #3 doc 1224 Obj to Tee Mot by Realan - Weeks, #4 doc 1230 Branch joinder in obj to tee mot, #5 doc 1234 Euram joinder, #6 doc 1243 Tee mot continue hrg pages 1-40, #7 doc 1243 Tee mot continue hrg pages 41-50, #8 doc 1243 Tee mot continue hrg pages 51-60, #9 doc 1243 Tee mot continue hrg pages 61-70, #10 doc 1243 Tee mot continue hrg pages 71-84, #11 doc 1266 Order grant mot resch hrg, #12 doc 1270 Am Ord gr ore tenis mot resch hrg) filed by Realan Investment Partners, LLP, Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC.(MH)
March 27, 2013 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Transmittal of Record to District Court. (Attachments: #1 doc 1369 ntc of appea, #2 doc 1371 ntc of appeal cert svc, #3 doc 1365 Order on appeal, #4 bankruptcy docket, #5 doc 1373 appellant designation, #6 doc 1374 cert svc appellant desig) filed by Realan Investment Partners, LLP, Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC(MH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realan Investment Partners, LLP et al v. Meininger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Euram Laird Point Associates, LP
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Euram Peter Point Associates, LP
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniel D. Dinur
Represented By: Virginia Ballenger Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Euram Resources, LLC
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Euram, LLC
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Euram Greyrock Associates, LP
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Euram Laird Bayou Associates, LP
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Barrington H. Branch
Represented By: James E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jane Doe Beneficiaries
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ward Family, PLLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Mallory Elizabeth Ward Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Estate of Diane Elizabeth Ward
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Mallory Ward and Descendants Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ward Family Investment, PLLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The J. Robert Ward Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust No. 1
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: J. Robert Ward
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The J. Robert Ward Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust No. 2
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paula Cardinale Saare
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leigh R. Meininger
Represented By: Roy Scott Kobert
Represented By: Beverly A. Pohl
Represented By: Nicolette Corso Vilmos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Robert Ward Family Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The John Doe Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Sarah Caitlin Ward Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lexcon Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Menechino, Jr.
Represented By: David R. McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sarah Caitlin Ward
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mallory Elizabeth Ward
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ward Family Investment, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bond Safeguard Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Menechino, Jr.
Represented By: David R. McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Realan Investment Partners, LLP
Represented By: John C. Weitnauer
Represented By: Jason Ward Johnson
Represented By: Robert F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Weeks-Grey Rock, LLC
Represented By: John C. Weitnauer
Represented By: Jason Ward Johnson
Represented By: Robert F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Land Resource, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Charles R. Sterbach
Represented By: Elena L. Escamilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?