Ela v. Orange County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Theresa Ann Ela
Defendant: Orange County Sheriff's Office, Kathleen Destefano, Jerry L. Demings, Unknown Supervisors of Orange County Sheriff's Office, Florida Department of Law Enforcement, Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, Gerald M. Bailey, Julie L. Jones, John Does 1-30 and Jane Does 1-30
Case Number: 6:2013cv00491
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Karla R. Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:2721
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 Motion for New Trial; denying 201 Motion to Alter Judgment; amending 199 Order to correct scrivener's error contained therein; vacating 200 judgment; directing the Clerk to enter judgment consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/7/2016. (DMM)
December 2, 2015 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 170 Destefano's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part 171 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting the Sheriff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; a warding Plaintiff liquidated damages; granting in part and denying in part 190 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; granting 196 the Sheriff's Motion for Taxation of Costs. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment consistent with this Order and thereafter to close this case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/2/2015. (DMM)
August 3, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/3/2015. (HV)
January 29, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 , 6 , 20 , and 22 Motions to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss; and setting deadline of February 18, 2014, for the filing of an amended complaint. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/29/2014. (HV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ela v. Orange County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Ann Ela
Represented By: Sherri K. DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Bruce W. Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Destefano
Represented By: Bobby G. Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L. Demings
Represented By: Bruce W. Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Supervisors of Orange County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Law Enforcement
Represented By: Jason Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Jason Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald M. Bailey
Represented By: Jason Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L. Jones
Represented By: Jason Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?