Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. v. Bluechip Power, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.
Defendant: Suniva Inc., Sorrento Solar Farm LLC, Fanuc Robotics America Corporation, Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC, Seminole County Tax Collector, Fifth Third Bank, ICT Investments, LLC, Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., Michael E. Moecker, On Deck Capital, Inc., Jeffery L. Carrier, Bluechip Power, LLC, SG Equipment Finance USA Corp., Demitri Nikitin, Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC, Laser Photonics, LLC, Aegis Business Credit, LLC, Bluechip Energy, LLC, US Investing Corporation, Svetlana Nikitin, Complete Electric Contractors, LLC, Dmitri Nikitin, Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. doing business as APZB Industries, Svetlana Nikitina, C, Fanuc Robotics America, Inc. and Dimitri Nikitin
Petitioner: Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Wanxiang America Corp.
Interested Party: Bank Sinopac
Case Number: 6:2013cv00657
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Seminole
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2016 Filing 267 CERTIFICATE for return of exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes as to the Plaintiff Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. from the hearing held on 5/21/13 (See exhibit list at Doc. No. #53 ). Exhibits returned to attorney Eric Scott Golden on 2/4/16. (AKJ)
October 24, 2014 Filing 266 JUDGMENT in favor of Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC, Bluechip Energy, LLC, Bluechip Power, LLC, ICT Investments, LLC, Laser Photonics, LLC, US Investing Corporation (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMM)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #262 Renewed Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in favor of Suntrust and against the following Defendants jointly and severally, in the amount of $4,478,440.00: Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC; BlueChip Power, LLC; BlueChip Energy, LLC; Laser Photonics, LLC; ICT Investments, LLC; and US Investing Corporation. After entry of judgment, the Clerk shall close this case. The following Defendants are ordered to complete Form 1.977 of the Florida Rules of Civil Procedure within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order: Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC; BlueChip Power, LLC; BlueChip Energy, LLC; Laser Photonics, LLC; ICT Investments, LLC; and US Investing Corporation. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/22/2014. (DJD)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER - re #263 Response to order to show cause filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. Counts IV and V are DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/14/2014. (DJD)
October 6, 2014 Filing 263 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #261 Order to show cause filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
October 6, 2014 Filing 262 MOTION for default judgment against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC, Bluechip Energy, LLC, Bluechip Power, LLC, ICT Investments, LLC, Laser Photonics, LLC, US Investing Corporation (Renewed Motion as to Count III of Complaint) by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER to show cause why Counts IV and V of the Verified Complaint should not be dismissed as moot as to Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2014. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/2/2014. (DJD)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER lifting stay and directing the Clerk to reopen this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/2/2014. (DJD)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER staying this case pending resolution of the Nikitin Bankruptcy. Plaintiff shall continue to file status reports regarding the Nikitin bankruptcy every 120 days. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/30/2014. (DJD)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting in part #238 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting in part #239 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting in part #240 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting in part #241 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting in part #242 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting in part #243 Motion for Default Judgment; Adopting Report and Recommendations - re #251 Report and Recommendations. The Lessee Defendants are liable to Suntrust under Count III for breach of contract, and damages are assessed at $4,478,440.00. At this time, the Court defers entry of final judgment in this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/30/2014. (DJD)
September 29, 2014 Filing 257 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/29/2014. Court addresses remaining counts and inquires of counsel as to what their intentions are regarding the remaining defendants in bankruptcy. Counsel respond and state they have no objections to the Magistrate's report and recommendation, however, they request that the Court enter judgment as to Count Three and not defer the entry of final judgment in this case pending further proceedings; Court takes matter under advisement. Counsel for Pltf: Eric Golden and Michael Nardella; No appearance on behalf of defendants. Start time: 9:05 a.m; End time: 9:18 a.m. Court Reporter: Diane Peede (DJD)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER on Wanxiang America Corp's #254 motion to dismiss. Counts IV and V of Wanxiang's First Amended Cross and Counter and Third Party Complaint ("Counter and Cross Complaint") (Doc. 152) are moot and are therefore DISMISSED as moot. The Motion is construed as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. As a result, there remain no pending claims in Wanxiang's Counter and Cross Complaint. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/22/2014. (DJD)
September 16, 2014 Filing 255 RESPONSE re #253 Order to show cause filed by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel)
September 16, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss Wanxiang America Corporation's Cross, Counter and Third Party Complaint by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER to show cause why the Counter and Cross Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or for violating this Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order as to Wanxiang America Corp. Show Cause Response due by 9/24/2014. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/16/2014. (DJD)
September 15, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference on remaining issues set for 9/29/2014 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (DJD)
September 11, 2014 Filing 251 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #241 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Laser Photonics, LLC; #240 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Energy, LLC ; #243 Amended MOTION for default judgment against US Investing Corporation ; #242 Amended MOTION for default judgment against ICT Investments, LLC; #239 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Power, LLC ; #238 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC. It is RESPECTFULLY RECOMMENDED that the motions be granted in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/11/2014. (LAK)
September 9, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #249 Supplement Notice of Filing Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Amended Supplement to Amended Motion for Default Final Judgment Against ICT Investments, LLC, (Nardella, Michael)
September 9, 2014 Filing 249 Amended SUPPLEMENT with Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #242 Amended MOTION for default judgment against ICT Investments, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2014 (CH).
September 8, 2014 Filing 248 SUPPLEMENT re #243 Amended MOTION for default judgment against US Investing Corporation with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
September 8, 2014 Filing 247 SUPPLEMENT re #242 Amended MOTION for default judgment against ICT Investments, LLC with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 246 PRETRIAL statement by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
September 3, 2014 Filing 245 Seond STATUS report of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Case of Demitri Nikitin and Svetlana M. Nikitin by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re: #200 Order (Nardella, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2014 (LMM).
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER: On or before September 8, 2014, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to its motions for default judgment against US Investing Corp. and ICT Investments LLC showing why service of process was valid as to each of these defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/29/2014. (SR)
August 28, 2014 Filing 243 Amended MOTION for default judgment against US Investing Corporation by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 28, 2014 Filing 242 Amended MOTION for default judgment against ICT Investments, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 28, 2014 Filing 241 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Laser Photonics, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 28, 2014 Filing 240 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Energy, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 28, 2014 Filing 239 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Power, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 28, 2014 Filing 238 Amended MOTION for default judgment against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER that in light of the Court's May 14, 2014 order approving the Receiver's final report, Counts I, II, VI, and VII of the Complaint are moot. Accordingly, Finding as moot #235 motion to dismiss Counts I, II, VI, and VII. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/27/2014. (DJD)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting in part #172 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. As to the solar panels identified in the 2010 Financing Statement that remain on the property at 400 Rinehart Road, Lake Mary, Florida, Wanxiang's security interest is superior to any interest held by Suntrust or Rinehart. Wanxiang's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/21/2014. (DJD)
July 29, 2014 Filing 235 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, VI and VII Without Prejudice by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
July 11, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Bench trial previously scheduled for the October 2014 trial term is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Bench Trial set for the trial term commencing 10/1/2014 in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. CTP(DJD)
July 2, 2014 Filing 233 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:13-CV-657-ORL-41-KRS. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #223 Joint Motion for Approval of Receiver's Final Report, to Terminate Receivership, and to Discharge Receiver. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/14/2014. (BRS)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER denying without prejudice #224 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #225 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #226 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #227 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #228 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #229 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/9/2014. (LAK)
May 2, 2014 Filing 230 STATUS report of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Case of Demitri Nikitin and Svetlana M. Nikitin by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 229 MOTION for default judgment against US Investing Corporation by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 228 MOTION for default judgment against ICT Investments, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 227 MOTION for default judgment against Laser Photonics, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 226 MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Energy, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 225 MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Power, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION for default judgment against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 223 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Receiver's Final Report, To Terminate Receivership, and to Discharge Receiver by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. and Michael E. Moecker. (Golden, Eric) Modified on 4/25/2014 (LMM).
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #221 Motion for relief under Rule 5.2. The Clerk is directed to delete the current copies of Exhibits G, I and J, filed with the #1 Complaint at 1-13, 1-15 and 1-16. The Clerk is then directed to print out and reattach to the Verified Complaint the redacted copies of Exhibits G, I and J that have been filed at #221 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/22/2014. (LAK)
April 21, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Relief Under Rule 5.2 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying without prejudice #219 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/1/2014. (LAK)
March 28, 2014 Filing 219 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Fifth Third Bank. (Kobert, Roy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ENDORSED ORDER granting #217 Fifth Third Bank's Motion to be Excused from Mediation. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/24/2014. (BRS)
March 21, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Be Excused from Mediation by Fifth Third Bank. (Kobert, Roy)
March 19, 2014 Filing 216 REPLY to Response to Motion re #172 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel)
March 14, 2014 Set/reset deadlines as to #172 MOTION for partial summary judgment . Replies due by 3/20/2014. (LMM)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #213 Motion and excusing Plaintiff from mediation. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/13/2014. (HV)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ENDORSED ORDER granting #209 Motion for Leave to File Reply; Defendant Wanxiang America Corp. may file a reply of no more than five pages on or before March 20, 2014. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/13/2014. (HV)
March 12, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically SunTrust's Motion to be Excused from Mediation by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy Scott Kobert on behalf of Fifth Third Bank (Kobert, Roy)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ENDORSED ORDER granting #210 Defendant Wanxiang America Corporation's Motion to Be Excused from Participation in Mediation on March 27, 2014. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/11/2014. (BRS)
March 10, 2014 Filing 210 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Be Excused From Participation in Mediation on March 27, 2014 by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel)
March 4, 2014 Filing 209 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment to Illustrate That There is No Opposition to the Motion by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying without prejudice #193 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/10/2014. (GJS)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Clarissa A. Rodriguez terminated and Katherine A. Sanoja, Esq., appears as counsel of record for Interested Party Bank SinoPac. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/15/2014. (LAK)
January 13, 2014 Filing 206 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bank Sinopac. (Sanoja, Katherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. In the #204 response to #201 order, Plaintiff presented evidence establishing that Defendant On Deck Capital, Inc. is a citizen of Delaware and New York. Based on this evidence and the allegations in the Complaint, complete diversity of citizenship exists in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/10/2014. (LAK)
January 10, 2014 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in response re #201 Order filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael) Modified on 1/10/2014 (CH).
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying without prejudice #191 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #194 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #195 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #196 Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice #197 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/9/2014. (LAK)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER. The Clerk is directed to terminate #192 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Demitri Nikitin. This case has been stayed as to this defendant (docket number 200). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/9/2014. (LAK)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER. Memorandum in response to this order due by 1/16/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/9/2014. (LAK)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER that this case is stayed as to Defendants Demitri Nikitin and Svetlana Nikitin only re #198 Suggestion of Bankruptcy; Plaintiff shall file a report as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings of Demitri Nikitin and Svetlana Nikitin every one hundred twenty (120) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/6/2014. (BRS)
January 6, 2014 Filing 199 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Jeffery L. Carrier, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Jeffrey L. Carrier Trust by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. and Jeffery L. Carrier. (Nardella, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2014 (MAL).
January 6, 2014 Filing 198 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Defendants, Demitri Nikitin and Svetlana Nikitin by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
November 26, 2013 Filing 197 MOTION for default judgment against Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. (d/b/a APZB Industries) by Wanxiang America Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Lynch, Daniel) Modified on 1/10/2014 (LAK).
November 26, 2013 Filing 196 MOTION for default judgment against Aegis Business Credit, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 26, 2013 Filing 195 MOTION for default judgment against Fifth Third Bank by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 26, 2013 Filing 194 MOTION for default judgment against ICT Investments, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 26, 2013 Filing 193 MOTION for default judgment against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 26, 2013 Filing 192 MOTION for default judgment against Demitri Nikitin by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 26, 2013 Filing 191 MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Power, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 18, 2013 Filing 190 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bluechip Power, LLC (MAL)
November 18, 2013 Filing 189 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Demitri Nikitin (MAL)
November 18, 2013 Filing 188 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC (MAL)
November 18, 2013 Filing 187 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. (MAL)
November 18, 2013 Filing 186 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aegis Business Credit, LLC (MAL).
November 18, 2013 Filing 185 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Fifth Third Bank (MAL).
November 18, 2013 Filing 184 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ICT Investments, LLC (MAL)
November 15, 2013 Filing 183 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Bluechip Power, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 15, 2013 Filing 182 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Demitri Nikitin by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 15, 2013 Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re #172 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
November 15, 2013 Filing 180 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 15, 2013 Filing 179 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 15, 2013 Filing 178 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Aegis Business Credit, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 15, 2013 Filing 177 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Fifth Third Bank by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 15, 2013 Filing 176 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against ICT Investments, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER adopting #162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting #147 Stipulated MOTION for Relief From Receivership Injunction; granting #142 MOTION to Disburse Auction Proceeds. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/6/2013. (BRS)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying without prejudice motions for default judgment as to various counterclaim, crosslclaim, and third party defendnats file at #165 , #166 , #167 , #168 , #169 , #170 , and #171 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/6/2013. (LAK)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying without prejudice #159 Motion to disburse proceeds of account receivable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/5/2013. (LAK)
November 1, 2013 Filing 172 MOTION for partial summary judgment by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lynch, Daniel)
November 1, 2013 Filing 171 MOTION for default judgment as to Aegis Business Credit, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 11/4/2013 (CH).
November 1, 2013 Filing 170 MOTION for default judgment as to Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., d/b/a APZB Industries by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 11/4/2013 (CH).
November 1, 2013 Filing 169 MOTION for default judgment as to Fifth Third Bank by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 11/4/2013 (CH).
November 1, 2013 Filing 168 MOTION for default judgment as to ICT Investments, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 11/4/2013 (CH).
November 1, 2013 Filing 167 MOTION for default , MOTION for default judgment against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 1, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION for default , MOTION for default judgment against Bluechip Power, LLC by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 1, 2013 Filing 165 MOTION for default , MOTION for default judgment against Demitri Nikitin by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lynch, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 1, 2013 Filing 164 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Jeffery L. Carrier, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Jeffrey L. Carrier Trust by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Lynch, Daniel)
October 17, 2013 Filing 163 ANSWER to #152 Amended Crossclaim, Counter and Third Party Complaint by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC.(Hood, Charles) Modified on 10/18/2013 (CH).
October 16, 2013 Filing 162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that #147 MOTION From Receivership Injunction and #142 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds should both be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/16/2013. (LAK)
October 9, 2013 Filing 161 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #152 Crossclaim by Jeffery L. Carrier(as trustee for the Jeffery L. Carrier Revocable Trust). Related document: #152 CounterclaimCrossclaim filed by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McClure, Anthony) Modified on 10/10/2013 (LMM).
October 8, 2013 Filing 160 Answer to #152 Counterclaim by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.(Nardella, Michael) Modified on 10/9/2013 (CH).
October 7, 2013 Filing 159 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Proceeds of Accounts Receivable by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
October 1, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael H. Traison, appearing on behalf of Bank Sinopac (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-28479.) Related document: #150 Amended MOTION for MICHAEL H. TRAISON to appear pro hac vice. (MAL)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/30/2013.(Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (HV)
September 30, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE of Filing Seminole County Property Appraiser's Acknowledgment of Receipt of Motion to Disburse Auction Proceeds re #142 MOTION by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Nardella, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2013 (MAL).
September 26, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE of settlement with Seminole County Tax Collector of Plaintiff's Motion to Disburse Auction Proceeds (Doc. No. 142) by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Nardella, Michael)
September 26, 2013 Filing 155 WAIVER of service returned executed on September 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Seminole County Tax Collector. (Nardella, Michael)
September 26, 2013 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property at Public Auction by Michael E. Moecker. (Thompson, Christopher)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #150 motion to appear pro hac vice. Michael H. Traison, Esq. may specially appear in this case as counsel for Bank Sinopac. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/25/2013. (LAK)
September 25, 2013 Filing 152 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp., Amended CROSSCLAIM against ICT Investments, LLC, Jeffery L. Carrier, Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC, Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., Bluechip Power, LLC, Demitri Nikitin, Aegis Business Credit, LLC, Fifth Third Bank, Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC filed by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lynch, Daniel) RELATED DOCUMENT: #99 Counterclaim/Crossclaim/Third Party Complaint. Modified on 9/26/2013 (LMM).
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ENDORSED ORDER granting #149 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross and Counter Complaint, which is unopposed. Wanxiang America Corporation shall file the document attached as Exhibit A to the motion as a separate filing in the electronic record. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/24/2013. (EK)
September 24, 2013 Filing 150 Amended MOTION for MICHAEL H. TRAISON to appear pro hac vice by Bank Sinopac. (Rodriguez, Clarissa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 23, 2013 Filing 149 MOTION for leave to file First Amended Cross and Counter Complaint by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lynch, Daniel)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying without prejudice #146 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/19/2013. (LAK)
September 18, 2013 Filing 147 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically From Receivership Injunction by Bank Sinopac; Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. and Michael E. Moecker . (Rodriguez, Clarissa) Modified on 9/19/2013 (MAL).
September 18, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION for MICHAEL H. TRAISON to appear pro hac vice by Bank Sinopac. (Rodriguez, Clarissa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying without prejudice #139 Motion for leave to file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/16/2013. (LAK)
September 12, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 27, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. before David Henry, Esq.. (Nardella, Michael)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file the Notice of Mediation within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/6/2013. (BRS)
September 3, 2013 Filing 142 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Auction Proceeds) by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Composite Exhibit 4)(Golden, Eric) Modified on 9/4/2013 (LMM).
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #138 Motion for extension of time to file motion to add parties or amend; deadline is 10/25/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/28/2013. (LAK)
August 28, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE to counsel, Michael H. Traison of Local Rule 2.02 re #128 Notice of Appearance (signed by deputy clerk). (IGC)
August 26, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION for leave to file First Amended Cross, Counter, and Third Party Complaint by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lynch, Daniel)
August 26, 2013 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Add Parties or to Amend Pleadings by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Nardella, Michael)
August 16, 2013 Filing 137 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (IGC)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2013, Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2013, Discovery due by 4/1/2014, Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2014, Pretrial statement due by 9/15/2014, All other motions due by 8/1/2014, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/3/2014, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2014, Bench Trial set for the trial term commencing 10/1/2014 in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/30/2014. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/15/2013. (DJD)
August 8, 2013 Filing 135 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC.(Hood, Charles)
August 7, 2013 Filing 134 Amended CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #110 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Demitri Nikitin (Amended as to date of regular mail service only). (Golden, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2013 (MAL).
August 7, 2013 Filing 133 Amended CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #111 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Svetlana Nikitin (Amended as to date of regular mail service only). (Golden, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2013 (MAL).
August 7, 2013 Filing 132 Amended CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #109 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against US Investing Corporation (Amended as to date of regular mail service only). (Golden, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2013 (MAL).
August 7, 2013 Filing 131 Amended CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #112 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Bluechip Power, LLC (Amended as to date of regular mail service only). (Golden, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2013 (MAL).
August 7, 2013 Filing 130 ANSWER to #99 Crossclaim by Jeffery L. Carrier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McClure, Anthony)
August 7, 2013 Set/reset deadlines/ for Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. Response to Counterclaim 9/6/13. (CH)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #119 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff SunTrust Equipment Financing and Leasing Corp. to respond to the counterclaim by Wanxiang America Corp. is 9/6/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/6/2013. (LAK)
August 6, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Traison on behalf of Bank Sinopac (Traison, Michael)
August 6, 2013 Filing 127 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC (MAL)
August 6, 2013 Filing 126 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bluechip Energy, LLC (MAL)
August 6, 2013 Filing 125 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ICT Investments, LLC (MAL)
August 6, 2013 Filing 124 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Laser Photonics, LLC. (MAL)
August 6, 2013 Filing 123 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 6, 2013 Filing 122 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Bluechip Energy, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 6, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against ICT Investments, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 6, 2013 Filing 120 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Laser Photonics, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 5, 2013 Filing 119 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 6, 2013 to File Response/Reply as to #99 Answer to ComplaintThird Party ComplaintCrossclaimCounterclaim Agreed Motion) by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 8/6/2013 (MAL).
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond re #1 Complaint. Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC answer or response due 8/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/5/2013. (LAK)
August 2, 2013 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time until 8/9/13 to answer Complaint by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. (Hood, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 8/5/2013 to change event(LAK).
August 2, 2013 Filing 116 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bluechip Power, LLC (CH)
August 2, 2013 Filing 115 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Svetlana Nikitin (CH)
August 2, 2013 Filing 114 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Demitri Nikitin (CH)
August 2, 2013 Filing 113 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to US Investing Corporation (CH)
August 2, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Bluechip Power, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 2, 2013 Filing 111 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Svetlana Nikitin by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 2, 2013 Filing 110 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Demitri Nikitin by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 2, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against US Investing Corporation by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #100 Motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to defendant SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. Defendant SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this defendant. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/26/2013. (DJD)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #91 Motion to Quash based on agreement of the parties. The hearing scheduled for Monday, July 29, 2013 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/26/2013. (Spaulding, Karla)
July 26, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A. Without Prejudice of Motion to Quash and Unopposed Motion to Cancel Hearing (Roesch, Robert)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ENDORSED ORDER denying #103 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. While the tone of the correspondence between counsel is inappropriate, it appears that the Receiver has offered a reasonable compromise of the present dispute. It is again ORDERED that lead counsel for the Receiver and Shuffield Lowman speak to each other (in person or by telephone but not via email) in a good faith effort to resolve the dispute. If not resolved, the parties can make whatever additional arguments they wish to assert at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/25/2013. (Spaulding, Karla)
July 25, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE by Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A. of Filing (Roesch, Robert)
July 25, 2013 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to File a Five Page Reply by Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A. (Roesch, Robert) Modified on 7/25/2013 (MAL).
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #91 MOTION to quash Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/24/2013. (LAK)
July 23, 2013 Filing 101 OBJECTION re #91 MOTION to quash Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by Shuffield, Lowman & Wilson by Michael E. Moecker by Michael E. Moecker. (Shuker, R.)
July 19, 2013 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. and SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. (Golden, Eric) Modified on 7/22/2013 (CH).
July 17, 2013 Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sorrento Solar Farm LLC, CROSSCLAIM against Demitri Nikitin, Jeffery L. Carrier, Bluechip Power, LLC, Aegis Business Credit, LLC, Fifth Third Bank, Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC, ICT Investments, LLC, Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lynch, Daniel)
July 16, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Objection by Fifth Third Bank re #56 Order (Norman, Todd) Modified on 8/6/2013 (MAL).
July 16, 2013 Set/reset deadlines for Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. Answer due 8/2/13 (CH)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Defendants Suniva, Inc., Fanuc Robotics America Corporation f/k/a Fanuc Robotics America, Inc., and Michael E. Moecker, as assignee for Bluechip Energy, LLC only re #39 , #76 , and #81 ; directing the Clerk to terminate these Defendants; also directing the Clerk to terminate #37 Motion for a More Definite Statement re #80 ; Defendant Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC shall file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than August 2, 2013. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/15/2013. (BRS)
July 12, 2013 Filing 96 STATUS report of Michael E. Moecker, Receiver (First Report) by Michael E. Moecker as to Demitri Nikitin, Jeffery L. Carrier, Laser Photonics, LLC, Wanxiang America Corp., Bluechip Power, LLC, Aegis Business Credit, LLC, Fanuc Robotics America Corporation, On Deck Capital, Inc., Fifth Third Bank, Suniva Inc., Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC, Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC, Michael E. Moecker, ICT Investments, LLC, Svetlana Nikitin, Bluechip Energy, LLC, SG Equipment Finance USA Corp., Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., US Investing Corporation. (Thompson, Christopher)
July 12, 2013 Filing 95 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffery L. Carrier. Related case(s): yes (McClure, Anthony)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #82 Motion to vacate clerk's default. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to vacate #64 default entered against Wanxiang America Corporation. Answer due 7/18/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/10/2013. (LAK)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 It is ORDERED that Shuffield, Lowman and Wilson, P.A. need not comply with the subpoena issued to it [92-1] pending further order of the Court. The Court will resolve the merits of the motion to quash #91 once a response is received. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/9/2013. (Spaulding, Karla)
July 9, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Terance Thompson and Declaration of Clay Roesch in Support of re #91 Motion to Quash Subpoena by Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Roesch, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2013 (MAL).
July 9, 2013 Filing 91 MOTION to quash Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A.. (Roesch, Robert)
July 5, 2013 Filing 90 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Golden, Eric)
July 2, 2013 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wanxiang America Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Wanxiang America Corp., Other Affiliate Wanxiang New Energy, LLC for Wanxiang America Corp... (Wieland, William)
June 21, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Daniel Lynch, appearing on behalf of Wanxiang America Corp. (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-26252.) Related document: #83 MOTION for Daniel Lynch to appear pro hac vice. (MAL)
June 21, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Amy J. Hansen, appearing on behalf of Wanxiang America Corp. (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-26253.) Related document: #84 MOTION for Amy J. Hansen to appear pro hac vice. (MAL)
June 21, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffery L. Carrier. Related case(s): no (McClure, Anthony)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Appear Telephonically signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/20/2013. (AKJ)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #83 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #84 motion to appear pro hac vice. Counsel shall register for CM/ECF. Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to both attorneys and no further documents will be mailed to counsel in this case signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/19/2013. (AKJ)
June 19, 2013 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Parties' Conference by Jeffery L. Carrier. (McClure, Anthony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 18, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION for Amy J. Hansen to appear pro hac vice by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Wieland, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 18, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION for Daniel Lynch to appear pro hac vice by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Wieland, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 18, 2013 Filing 82 Amended/Renewed MOTION to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wieland, William) Modified on 6/19/2013 (LMM).
June 18, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Michael Moecker as Assignee of BlueChip Energy, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Golden, Eric) Modified on 6/19/2013 (LMM).
June 14, 2013 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Withdrawal of Defendant, Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC's Motion for More Definitive Statement by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. (Hood, Charles)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying without prejudice #72 Motion to Vacate; denying without prejudice #77 Motion to File Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/14/2013. (SR)
June 11, 2013 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #8 Notice of pendency of related cases, #6 Related case order and track 2 notice . (Golden, Eric)
June 10, 2013 Filing 77 MOTION to supplement Original Declaration by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wieland, William) Modified on 6/11/2013 (LMM).
June 7, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Fanuc Robotics America Corporation f/k/a Fanuc Robotics America, Inc., Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) (Golden, Eric)
June 7, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Scott Shuker and Christopher R. Thompson on behalf of Michael E. Moecker (Shuker, R.) Modified on 6/10/2013 (LMM).
June 6, 2013 Filing 74 SUPPLEMENT re #72 MOTION to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Wieland, William)
June 6, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE to counsel Daniel Lynch and Amy J. Hansen of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). Copies Mailed(CH) SEE DOC. NO. #72
June 5, 2013 Filing 72 MOTION to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default by Wanxiang America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Wieland, William)
June 5, 2013 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #55 Interested persons order by Jeffery L. Carrier. (McClure, Anthony)
June 5, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffery L. Carrier. Related case(s): No (McClure, Anthony) Modified on 6/6/2013 (CH).
May 31, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fifth Third Bank. Related case(s): yes (Norman, Todd)
May 31, 2013 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Fifth Third Bank. (Norman, Todd)
May 30, 2013 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. (Hood, Charles)
May 30, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. Related case(s): no (Hood, Charles)
May 30, 2013 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #8 Notice of pendency of related cases, #6 Related case order and track 2 notice . (Golden, Eric)
May 24, 2013 Filing 64 **VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER AT DOC. NO. #94 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Wanxiang America Corp. (MAL) Modified on 7/11/2013 (CH).
May 24, 2013 Filing 63 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. (MAL)
May 24, 2013 Filing 62 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aegis Business Credit, LLC (MAL)
May 24, 2013 Filing 61 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to On Deck Capital, Inc. (MAL)
May 23, 2013 Filing 60 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Wanxiang America Corp. by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 23, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 23, 2013 Filing 58 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Aegis Business Credit, LLC by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 23, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against On Deck Capital, Inc. by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Appointing Receiver and Granting Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/22/2013. (BRS)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendants Fifth Third Bank, Jeffery Carrier and Rinehart Development and Investment Group within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/22/2013. CTP (DJD)
May 22, 2013 Filing 54 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Jeffery L. Carrier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McClure, Anthony)
May 21, 2013 Filing 53 Exhibit List by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (DJD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2016: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (AKJ).
May 21, 2013 Filing 52 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge John Antoon II: MOTION HEARING held on 5/21/2013 re #3 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp., #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. Plaintiff advises the Court that the parties are in the process of stipulating to the preliminary injunction and requests the Court appoint a receiver in this case. Court hears objections by Defendants Jeffrey Carrier, Fifth Third Bank and Rinehart Development. Court to grant Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction - Plaintiff to submit proposed order by 5:00 p.m. today. Court Grants Plaintiff's Motion to appoint receiver and appoints Michael Moecker, which language should be included in the proposed order. Counsel for Pltf: Eric Golden and Michael Nardella; Counsel for Deft. Rinehart Development: Charles David Hood, Jr.; Counsel for Deft. Fifth Third Bank: Todd Norman; Counsel for Deft. Jeffrey L. Carrier: Anthony McClure/Telephone. Start time: 8:35 a.m; End time: 9:10 a.m. Court Reporter: Amie First (DJD)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #46 Motion to Appear Telephonically; see Doc. 49. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/20/2013. (BRS)
May 20, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Ross McClure on behalf of Jeffery L. Carrier (McClure, Anthony)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #48 Motion to be admitted to the bar of the Court and appear telephonically at a hearing. Provided his application is in Order, the Clerk of Court is directed to admit Andrew R. McClure, Esq., to the bar of this Court on an expedited basis. After admission, Attorney McClure may file a notice of appearance in this case. Once the notice of appearance is filed, Attorney McClure may appear at the hearing scheduled for May 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. by telephone. It is ORDERED that Attorney McClure shall speak with Judge Antoon's courtroom deputy clerk, Darlene Darley, immediately to coordinate a telephone appearance. Ms. Darley may be reached at (407) 835-4304. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/20/2013. (Spaulding, Karla)
May 20, 2013 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Temporary Admission of Anthony R. McClure by Jeffery L. Carrier. (Pacheco, Javier)
May 17, 2013 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Jeffery L. Carrier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pacheco, Javier)
May 17, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Jeffery L. Carrier. (Pacheco, Javier) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 17, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier Adolfo Pacheco on behalf of Jeffery L. Carrier (Pacheco, Javier)
May 17, 2013 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Surplus Proceeds by SG Equipment Finance USA Corp..(Davis, Ryan)
May 17, 2013 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Societe Generale for SG Equipment Finance USA Corp... (Davis, Ryan)
May 17, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by SG Equipment Finance USA Corp.. Related case(s): yes (Davis, Ryan) Modified on 5/17/2013 (CH).
May 17, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Edward Davis on behalf of SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. (Davis, Ryan)
May 16, 2013 Filing 40 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to re #1 Complaint by Fifth Third Bank.(Norman, Todd) Modified on 5/16/2013 (CH).
May 15, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Suniva, Inc., Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) (Golden, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2013 (CH).
May 13, 2013 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. (Hood, Charles)
May 13, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. (Hood, Charles)
May 13, 2013 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric)
May 13, 2013 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #8 Notice of pendency of related cases, #6 Related case order and track 2 notice . (Golden, Eric)
May 13, 2013 Filing 34 RETURN of service executed on May 2, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Suniva Inc.. (Golden, Eric)
May 8, 2013 Filing 33 RETURN of service executed on May 1, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Jeffery L. Carrier. (Golden, Eric)
May 8, 2013 Filing 32 RETURN of service executed on April 29, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to SG Equipment Finance USA Corp.. (Golden, Eric)
May 8, 2013 Filing 31 RETURN of service executed on April 29, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Newlogic Business Loans, Inc.. (Golden, Eric)
May 6, 2013 Filing 30 RETURN of service executed on April 25, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC. (Golden, Eric)
May 6, 2013 Filing 29 RETURN of service executed on May 1, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Wanxiang America Corp.. (Golden, Eric)
May 6, 2013 Filing 28 RETURN of service executed on April 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Fanuc Robotics America Corporation. (Golden, Eric)
May 6, 2013 Filing 27 RETURN of service executed on April 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to On Deck Capital, Inc.. (Golden, Eric)
May 6, 2013 Filing 26 RETURN of service executed on April 29, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Aegis Business Credit, LLC. (Golden, Eric) Modified on 5/7/2013 (MAL).
May 6, 2013 Filing 25 RETURN of service executed on April 27, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Svetlana Nikitin. (Golden, Eric)
May 6, 2013 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on April 27, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Demitri Nikitin. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #17 Summons returned executed, #10 Waiver of service executed, #20 Summons returned executed, #21 Summons returned executed, #5 Order, #19 Summons returned executed, #22 Summons returned executed, #18 Summons returned executed on all Lessee Defendants of all initial pleadings and Order. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on May 2, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to US Investing Corporation. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on April 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to ICT Investments, LLC. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on April 26, 2013 and April 30, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Laser Photonics, LLC. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on April 25, 2013 and May 2, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on April 25, 2013 and May 2, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Bluechip Energy, LLC. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on April 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Bluechip Power, LLC. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 16 PROOF of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Golden, Eric) **REFILED CORRECTLY AT #17 ** Modified on 5/6/2013 (LMM).
May 3, 2013 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of service by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. re #13 Affidavit, #5 Order, #14 Affidavit . (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Aryan Rochon re: #3 MOTION for preliminary injunction, #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric)
May 3, 2013 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Jim Rollo re: #3 MOTION for preliminary injunction, #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Golden, Eric)
May 1, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd K. Norman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank (Norman, Todd)
May 1, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard H. Gentry on behalf of Fifth Third Bank (Norman, Todd) Modified on 5/2/2013 (MAL).
April 30, 2013 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on April 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Michael E. Moecker. (Golden, Eric)
April 30, 2013 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on April 26, 2013 by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. as to Fifth Third Bank. (Golden, Eric)
April 30, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re: #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. Related case(s): Yes (Golden, Eric) Modified on 5/1/2013 (LMM).
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/29/2013. CTP (DJD)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/29/2013. CTP (DJD)
April 26, 2013 Set/reset deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #3 MOTION for preliminary injunction. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge John Antoon II. (CH)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff and Lessee Defendants shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Receiver and Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Tuesday, May 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m.; on or before Friday, May 3, 2013 at 12:00 p.m., Plaintiff shall serve Lessee Defendants with all papers filed in this action; Lessee Defendants shall have until Friday, May 10, 2013 at 12:00 p.m. to file and serve any briefs, affidavits, or other evidence in opposition to Plaintiff's motions. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/25/2013. (BRS)
April 23, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (Provided Over the Counter) (CH)
April 23, 2013 Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (CH)
April 23, 2013 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(CH)
April 23, 2013 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY JUDGMENT, PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, REPLEVIN, FORECLOSURE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number Orl-24802) filed by Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E Part 1-1, #7 Exhibit E Part 1-2, #8 Exhibit E Part 1-3, #9 Exhibit E Part 1-4, #10 Exhibit E Part 2, #11 Exhibit E Part 3, #12 Exhibit F, #25 Exhibit G (Redacted), #14 Exhibit H, #26 Exhibit I (redacted), #27 Exhibit J (redacted) #17 Exhibit K, #18 Exhibit L, #19 Exhibit M, #20 Exhibit N, #21 Exhibit O, #22 Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Q, #24 Civil Cover Sheet)(CH) Modified on 4/24/2013 (CH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2014(LMM). Modified on 4/23/2014 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp. v. Bluechip Power, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suniva Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorrento Solar Farm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanuc Robotics America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Solar Photonics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole County Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Bernard H. Gentry, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Scott Kobert
Represented By: Todd K. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICT Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlogic Business Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Moecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Deck Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery L. Carrier
Represented By: Javier Adolfo Pacheco
Represented By: Anthony Ross McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluechip Power, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Equipment Finance USA Corp.
Represented By: Ryan E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demitri Nikitin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rinehart Development and Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Charles David Hood, Jr.
Represented By: Tamara R. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser Photonics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Business Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluechip Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Investing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svetlana Nikitin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Electric Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dmitri Nikitin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlogic Business Loans, Inc. doing business as APZB Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svetlana Nikitina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanuc Robotics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitri Nikitin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suntrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.
Represented By: Michael A. Nardella
Represented By: Eric Scott Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shuffield Lowman & Wilson, P.A.
Represented By: Robert Clayton Roesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Wanxiang America Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Lynch
Represented By: Amy J. Hansen
Represented By: William J. Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bank Sinopac
Represented By: Michael H. Traison
Represented By: Clarissa A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Katherine Alena Sanoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?