Omni Healthcare Inc. et al v. Health First, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Omni Healthcare Inc., Interventional Spine Institute of Florida, Craig Deligdish, C. Hamilton Boone, PA, Brian Dowell, Richard Gayles, Stan Golovac, Lance Grenevicki, Aleksander Komar and Scott Seminer
Defendant: Health First, Inc., Holmes Regional Medical Center, Inc., Health First Physicians, Inc., Health First Health Plans, Inc., Health First Insurance, Inc., Michael D. Means and Jerry Senne
Case Number: 6:2013cv01509
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
Referring Judge: David A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:0025
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2016 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 196 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to file and maintain the specified documents under seal pending further Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/25/2016. (SN)
January 19, 2016 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 183 Motion to Seal. On or before January 22, 2016, Corporate Defendants shall file a complete and unredacted version of their motion for summary judgment and Daubert motions under seal, inclusive of all specified confidential ex hibits. Then, on or before January 27, 2016, Corporate Defendants shall file the same motion for summary judgment and Daubert motions on the public docket, omitting confidential exhibits and redacting any discussion of such confidential exhibits. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/19/2016. (SN)
January 15, 2016 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 178 Motion to Seal. On or before January 18, 2016, Defendants may refile a motion that is compliant with Local Rule 1.09 and the directives of this Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/14/2016. (SN)
January 22, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/21/2015. (VMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omni Healthcare Inc. et al v. Health First, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interventional Spine Institute of Florida
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Deligdish
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Hamilton Boone, PA
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dowell
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gayles
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Golovac
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Grenevicki
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksander Komar
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Seminer
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: William G. Kopit
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First Physicians, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Senne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?