Estate of Gregory V. Faull v. McAfee et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Gregory V. Faull
Defendant: John McAfee, Samantha Vanegas and Amy Herbert
Case Number: 6:2013cv01746
Filed: November 8, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Referring Judge: Karla R. Spaulding
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 92 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint filed by Estate of Gregory V. Faull; denying leave to amend; dismissing complaint without prejudice; directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/15/2017. (ED)
January 12, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 82 MOTION for default judgment against John McAfee filed by Estate of Gregory V. Faull, denying 82 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/12/2017. (ED)
October 16, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Set Pre-trial Conf or Jury Trial Date & to Extend Date to Enter Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/16/2015. (ED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Gregory V. Faull v. McAfee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gregory V. Faull
Represented By: John Stewart Mills
Represented By: Gary William Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Vanegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?