Capitol Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Car Care, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, B & W Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc. d/b/a Pitalo Auto Paint & Body, Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc. d/b/a Autoworks Collision Specialist, Protouch Collision, LLC d/b/a Boler-Phillips Body Shop, Mark Cook Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD. and Barry Lewis Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD.
Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Shelter General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, GEICO General Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2014cv06000
Filed: August 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: T B Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 143 REPORT to the Court by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Nelson, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2020 (RDO).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER directing the Progressive defendants, AutoWorks Collision Specialist, LLP, and Walkers Collision Center, Inc. to confer and advise the Court by July 2, 2020, how they would like to proceed toward a final resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/18/2020. (LAM)
June 17, 2020 Filing 141 MANDATE of USCA as to #132 Notice of Appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 06/17/2020 USCA number: 16-13596. VACATE in part; AFFIRM in part; VACATE and REMAND in part (see order for details). (ALL)
March 6, 2020 Filing 140 OPINION of USCA as to #132 Notice of appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc.. EOD: 03/06/2020; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 16-13596. AFFIRM in part; VACATE in part; VACATE and REMAND in part (see order for details). (ALL)
April 27, 2018 Filing 139 MANDATE of USCA as to Porter's Auto Body Service, Inc. ONLY re #132 Notice of appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 04/27/2018; USCA number: 16-13596. DISMISSED AS TO PORTER'S BODY SHOP, INC. ONLY. (ALL) Modified on 8/19/2019 (LAM).
September 9, 2016 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #132 Notice of appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 16-13596-AA (RDO)
August 16, 2016 Filing 138 REPLY to Response to Motion re #136 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc.. (Fry, Allison)
August 9, 2016 Filing 137 RESPONSE to Motion re #136 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Response in Opposition to Motion to Reconsider filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
July 29, 2016 Filing 136 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc.. (Fry, Allison)
July 29, 2016 Filing 135 MOTION for Attorney Fees/Specific Fee Request by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Goldfine, Dan) Text modified on 8/1/2016 (RDO).
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Attorney Fees. As a sanction, the Court will award attorney's fees to GEICO against Plaintiffs Clinton Body Shop, Inc. and Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., and Plaintiffs' counsel John Arthur Eaves, Jr. and Allison P. Fry, in an amount to be determined by the Court. It is further ORDERED that GEICO shall file its specific fee request with appropriate supporting documentation by July 29, 2016. Plaintiffs may oppose the reasonableness of GEICO's fee request by filing a written response on or before August 12, 2016. If Plaintiffs or their counsel want an evidentiary hearing on this matter, they should so indicate in their response. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/19/2016. (TKW)
June 21, 2016 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding notification of fee payment re #132 Notice of appeal. (JEV)
June 20, 2016 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL054484 re #132 Notice of appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. (JEQ)
June 15, 2016 Filing 133 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #132 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JEV)
June 14, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #130 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #129 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Fry, Allison)
June 10, 2016 Filing 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B)(Goldfine, Dan) Text modified on 6/13/2016 (RDO).
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER adopting in part #115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #89, #90, #92, #93, #94, dismissing remaining claims with prejudice, directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/27/2016. (ED)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying #120 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2016. (ED)
March 21, 2016 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Reconsideration re #116 Opinion and order filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Clark, Johanna)
March 18, 2016 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Reconsideration re #116 Opinion and order filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 126 RESPONSE to objections to #115 Report and Recommendations filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
March 17, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Joinder to Certain Defendants' #122 Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Mumford, Michael) Modified on 3/18/2016 (RDO).
March 17, 2016 Filing 124 JOINDER by Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi in Certain Defendants' #122 Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. (Gibson, Walker) Modified on 3/18/2016 (RDO).
March 17, 2016 Filing 123 JOINDER by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company in Certain Defendants' #122 Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. (Gibson, Walker) Modified on 3/18/2016 (RDO).
March 16, 2016 Filing 122 RESPONSE to objections to #115 Report and Recommendations filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, State Farm General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
March 2, 2016 Filing 121 OBJECTION re #115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #91 Request for oral argument filed by Shelter General Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Comp . (Fry, Allison)
March 2, 2016 Filing 120 MOTION for Reconsideration re #116 Opinion and order by Plaintiffs (Fry, Allison) Text modified on 3/3/2016 (RDO).
March 2, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION for Joinder with #117 and #118 Partial Objections to Report and Recommendation by GEICO General Insurance Company and Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 3/3/2016 (RDO).
March 2, 2016 Filing 118 PARTIAL OBJECTION to #115 Report and Recommendations by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna) Text modified on 3/3/2016 (RDO).
March 2, 2016 Filing 117 PARTIAL OBJECTION to #115 Report and Recommendations by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Nelson, Michael) Text modified on 3/3/2016 (RDO).
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION AND ORDER re: #89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , #92 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , #90 MOTION to dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Granting all three motions as to antitrust claims, only. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/22/2016. (ED)
February 17, 2016 Filing 115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #91 Request for oral argument filed by Shelter General Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #99 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, #95 Joinder in motion filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, #102 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Geico Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, #103 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #98 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., #89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, #96 Joinder in motion filed by Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, #92 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Geico Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, #101 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Geico Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, #104 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Shelter General Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #93 MOTION for Joinder in #90 Motion to Dismiss, andSupplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, #94 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5 BY CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC. and CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC. filed by Geico Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/17/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 25, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE canceling motions hearing scheduled for 9/24/2015. (LAM)
August 24, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS re (307 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (306 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint , (302 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (308 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , (90 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, (93 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION for Joinder in (90) Motion to Dismiss, andSupplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint , (89 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (94 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5 BY CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC. and CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC. , (92 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , (154 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint , (155 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (156 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (87 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , (88 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, (86 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (107 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law), (106 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, (104 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (125 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , (121 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (120 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint , (123 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint, (42 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (41 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (45 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, (37 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company and Government Employees Insurance Company's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended. Motions Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Copies mailed.(LAM)
August 18, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , #94 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5 BY CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC. and CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC. , #92 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, #93 MOTION for Joinder in #90 Motion to Dismiss, andSupplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing limited to Federal Anti-Trust Claims set for 9/22/2015 at 01:30 PM (90 minutes reserved)in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (TKW)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Filing 109 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel (Grabel, Joshua)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ENDORSED ORDER granting #100 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/6/2015. (Presnell, Gregory)
May 5, 2015 Filing 104 REPLY to #98 Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Nelson, Michael) Modified on 5/6/2015 (IGC).
May 5, 2015 Filing 103 REPLY to #98 Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Clark, Johanna) Modified on 5/6/2015 (IGC).
May 5, 2015 Filing 102 REPLY to #98 Response to Motion re #94 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5 by Clinton Body Shop, Inc. and Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc. filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Clerks Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter from Turnage to Grabel encl Check for Costs, #4 Exhibit 4 - GEICO's Memorandum Brief ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)(Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 5/6/2015 (IGC).
May 5, 2015 Filing 101 REPLY to #98 Response to Motion re #92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended COmplaint filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 5/6/2015 (IGC).
May 5, 2015 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply in Support of #90 Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna) Modified on 5/6/2015 (IGC).
May 5, 2015 Filing 99 REPLY to #98 Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Carpenter, Michael) Modified on 5/6/2015 (IGC).
April 28, 2015 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , #92 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, #93 MOTION for Joinder in #90 Motion to Dismiss, andSupplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint , #94 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5 BY CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC. and CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC. filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc.. (Fry, Allison)
April 20, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Oates, Claire)
April 9, 2015 Filing 96 JOINDER in motion by Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi re #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Shelter General Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and request for additional relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Opinion and Order)(Gibson, Walker)
April 9, 2015 Filing 95 JOINDER in motion by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company re #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Shelter General Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Gibson, Walker)
April 9, 2015 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss #87 Second Amended Complaint Counts 3, 4 and 5 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 4/10/2015 (IGC).
April 9, 2015 Filing 93 MOTION for Joinder in #90 Motion to Dismiss, and Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clinton Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Clinton Jennings Report, #3 Exhibit C - Clinton Summary Judgment Order, #4 Exhibit D - Clinton Order)(Nelson, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 4/10/2015 (JET).
April 9, 2015 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss #87 Second Amended Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 4/10/2015 (IGC).
April 9, 2015 Filing 91 REQUEST for oral argument re #90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
April 9, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clark, Johanna)
April 9, 2015 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Carpenter, Michael)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #84 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/6/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 21, 2015 Filing 87 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Fry, Allison) Modified on 3/23/2015 (IGC).
March 19, 2015 Filing 86 SUPPLEMENT (Amended Counsel Conference Certificate) re #84 MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/15 to file Second Amended Complaint by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 3/20/2015 (JET).
March 19, 2015 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/15 to file Second Amended Complaint filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan)
March 19, 2015 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/15 to file Second Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 3/19/2015 (IGC).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER adopting #82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The motions are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs may amend their complaint by 3/20/2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/27/2015. Copies mailed.(LAM)
February 27, 2015 Set deadline: Amended complaint due by 3/20/2015 (MAL)
February 9, 2015 Filing 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #31 filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, #41 filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, #44 filed by Geico Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, #26 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/9/2015. (SMW)
November 14, 2014 Filing 81 Minute Entry for motion proceedings held before Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/14/2014. Matters taken under advisement. Court Reporter: Diane Peede. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Appearances) (LAM)
October 28, 2014 Filing 80 AMENDED Notice of hearing on all pending motions set for 11/14/2014 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. 2.5 hours have been reserved for the hearing. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 #191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,254,270,273. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112,114,131,132,133,134,135. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,41,44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,19,69. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 #14,45,51,54,70,71,82. Case number 6:14-cv-6004 #70,73,76,79. Case number 6:14-cv-6005 #19. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/28/2014. (LAK)
September 15, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of hearing on all pending motions to dismiss set for 11/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 # 156,191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,and 254. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112, and 114. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,24,and 44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,and 19. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 # 14,45,51,and 54. (LAK) Modified on 9/16/2014 (LAM).
August 12, 2014 Filing 78 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00012. File received electronically
August 12, 2014 Filing 77 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Middle District of Florida. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
August 8, 2014 Filing 76 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Middle District of Florida. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
August 7, 2014 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Goldfine - PHV, Dan) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
August 7, 2014 Filing 74 Rebuttal re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
August 7, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
August 6, 2014 Filing 72 Rebuttal re #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, and #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The new deadline is August 7, 2014. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/31/14. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (jc) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 30, 2014 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 23, 2014 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stamper Complaints)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Dowdy & Dowdy, #2 Exhibit Complaint, US v. ACSC)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 18, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B. Morgan on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Morgan, Benjamin) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 18, 2014 Filing 65 COPY of MDL NOTICE. (RRL) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The new deadline is July 20, 2014. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/17/14. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (jc) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Joint Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim. The new deadline is July 22, 2014. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/17/14. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (jc) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 64 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 63 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 62 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 61 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael R. Nelson, Jeffrey S. Cashdan and Christine A. Hopkinson be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/16/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Dan W. Goldfine be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/16/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION for Dan W. Goldfine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing)(Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION for Christine A. Hopkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 58 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Cashdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION for Michael R. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Dan W. Goldfine receipt number 0538-2725560 $ 100 (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael Nelson, $ 100, receipt number 34643028265. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fees paid by Christine A. Hopkinson and Jeffrey Cashdan, $ 200.00, receipt number 34643028282. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Kymberly Kochis be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/14/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 11, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION for Kymberly Kochis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Kymberly Kochis, $ 100, receipt number 34643028216. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Richard L. Fenton be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property and Casualty Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/2/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Ernest E. Vargo be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/2/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Admission to Bar of Illinois)(Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael H. Carpenter, Michael N. Beekhuizen, Peter T. Snow and Mark J. Botti be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/1/14 (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael P. Kenny, Tiffany L. Powers and Elizabeth Helmer be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurannce Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/1/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Shelter Mutual Insurance Company for Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Best, Robert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for Ernest E. Vargo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Ernest E. Vargo receipt number 0538-2714914 $ 100 (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION for Mark J. Botti to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION for Peter T. Snow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION for Michael N. Beekhuizen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION for Michael H. Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That the motion of Richard L. Fenton for pro hac vice admission is denied. The applicant did not obtain the signature of the resident attorney on the application for admission. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/27/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fees paid by Tiffany L. Powers, Elizabeth Helmer, Michael P. Kenny, $ 300.00, receipt number 34643028000. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael H. Carpenter, $ 100, receipt number 34643028003. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Peter T. Snow, $ 100, receipt number 34643028001. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael N. Beekhuizen, $ 100, receipt number 34643028002. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Mark J. Botti, $ 100, receipt number 34643028004. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] Modified on 9/15/2014 (LAK).
June 26, 2014 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] Modified on 9/15/2014 (LAK).
June 26, 2014 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC for Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Brabec on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION for Elizabeth Helmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Helmer GA Bar Good Standing Certificate)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Tiffany L. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Powers DC, GA, VA and PA Bar Good Standing Certificates)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION for Michael P. Kenny to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Kenny GA Bar Good Standing Certificate)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] Modified on 9/15/2014 (LAK).
June 26, 2014 Filing 30 ATTACHMENT re #29 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Griffin on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #110 Order of Dismissal in A&E Auto Body, Inc. v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, et al.; USDC, MD FL; No. 6:14cv310-ORL-31TBS)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Richard L. Fenton receipt number 0538-2712879 $ 100 (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael E. Mumford be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/25/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Jamie L. Halavais be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/25/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 24, 2014 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 23, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION for Michael E. Mumford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 23, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Neville H. Boschert on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 23, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION for Jamie L. Halavais to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Jamie L. Halavais receipt number 0538-2710573 $ 100 (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Michael E. Mumford receipt number 0538-2710631 $ 100 (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Amelia W. Koch and Steven F. Griffith, Jr. be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants USAA Casualty Insurance Company and United Services Automobile Association in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/17/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 13, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by (Amelia W Koch, Steven F. Griffith) $ 200, receipt number 34643027810. (TLC) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Steven F. Griffith, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION for Amelia W. Koch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Joshua Grabel be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/4/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for Joshua Grabel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Joshua Grabel receipt number 0538-2694364 $ 100 (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Best, Robert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shelter General Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014; Shelter Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/29/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/28/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, May 22, 2014 E-mail from Plaintiffs' Counsel to E. Barney Robinson III)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Gibson, Walker) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi (Gibson, Walker) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/23/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/23/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 22, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #3 Amended Complaint by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. New deadline will be set out in docket entry to follow. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/22/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 21, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint. GEICO Defendants have until 6/26/14 to respond to First Amended Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/21/14 (YWJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. USAA Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014; United Services Automobile Association answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/20/14. (YWJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014; Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/20/14. (YWJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 19, 2014 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, and for Entry of an Order Confirming Stipulated Sixty (60) Day Extension of Time by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email confirming agreement, #2 Exhibit B - email re agreement)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 16, 2014 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 16, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson H. Ables, III on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/14/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 13, 2014 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 6, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Defendants in re #3 Amended Complaint. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
May 6, 2014 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Barry Lewis, Alexander Body Shop, LLC as to All Defendants. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellie F. Turnage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turnage, Ellie) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Halbert E. Dockins, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dockins, Halbert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
March 4, 2014 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Barry Lewis, Crystal Car Care, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
January 8, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]
January 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, and United Services Automobile Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643025398), filed by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Barry Lewis, and Alexander Body Shop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Company Market Share Report - 2012, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Farm's Dashboard/Scorecard, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Procedures & Processes short paid/not paid, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1963 Consent Decree, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi
Represented By: Charles G. Copeland
Represented By: Walker Reece Gibson
Represented By: James R. Moore
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: William C. Griffin
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Neville H. Boschert
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Keith R. Raulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson, III
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Jackson H. Ables, III
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Clifford (Ford) K. Bailey, III
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Neville H. Boschert
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Keith R. Raulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: William C. Griffin
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Walker Reece Gibson
Represented By: Charles G. Copeland
Represented By: James R. Moore
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Jackson H. Ables, III
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson, III
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Car Care, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Body Shop, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & W Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot Auto Body, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bolden Body Shop, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protouch Collision, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Lewis
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canton Collision, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkers Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porter's Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cook
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East McComb Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc. d/b/a Pitalo Auto Paint & Body
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc. d/b/a Autoworks Collision Specialist
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protouch Collision, LLC d/b/a Boler-Phillips Body Shop
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cook Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Lewis Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?