Alpine Straightening Systems et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems and Perks Auto Repair, Inc.
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, United Insurance Company, Bear River Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Western United Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Allstate Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Group, Inc., Geico General Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Progressive Max Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2014cv06003
Filed: August 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ENDORSED ORDER granting #155 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Amy F. Sorenson terminated. The Clerk shall remove Ms. Sorenson's name from the CM/ECF service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/9/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION for Amy F. Sorenson to withdraw as attorney by Geico General Insurance Company. (Sorenson, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/9/2016. Copies mailed.(LAM)
November 17, 2016 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #146 Notice of appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 16-15467-AA (JEV)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 25, 2016 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding notification of fee payment re #146 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 16-15467-A. (JEV)
August 25, 2016 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number Orl-056270 re #146 Notice of appeal. (JEV)
August 15, 2016 Filing 147 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #146 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JEV)
August 13, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #126 Order, #140 Order on Motion to Strike, #144 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #139 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Fry, Allison)
July 29, 2016 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2016. (LMM)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER setting August 11, 2016 deadline for filing any amended pleading. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/28/2016. (ED)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER adopting #127 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #104 Motion to Dismiss, #106 Motion to dismiss, #107 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing one state law claim without prejudice and remaining state law claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/21/2016. (ED)
June 2, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Newton on behalf of Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Newton, Emily)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply #137 to Defendant GEICO General's Response #134 to Plaintiffs' Objections #131 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/31/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge Smith's report & Recommendation #131 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/17/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying #128 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2016. (ED)
May 10, 2016 Filing 138 MOTION to Strike #137 Reply To Geico's Response To Plaintiffs' Objections To Magistrate's Report And Recommendation by Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Goldfine, Dan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 5/11/2016 (LMM).
May 6, 2016 Filing 137 **STRICKEN PER #141 ORDER** REPLY to #134 Response to objections to report and recommendations filed by GEICO Defendants by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc.. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 5/9/2016 (LMM). Modified on 6/1/2016 (LMM).
April 28, 2016 Filing 136 MOTION to Strike #131 Objection to Magistrate Judge Smith's R&R (Doc. 127) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance Company. (Yohai, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
April 28, 2016 Filing 135 RESPONSE to objections to #127 Report and Recommendations filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance Company. (Yohai, David)
April 28, 2016 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition to objections to #127 Report and Recommendations filed by Geico General Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 4/29/2016 (LMM).
April 14, 2016 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David)
April 14, 2016 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order filed by Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan)
April 9, 2016 Filing 131 **STRICKEN PER #140 ORDER** OBJECTION re #127 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Asso . (Fry, Allison) Modified on 5/18/2016 (LMM).
April 8, 2016 Filing 130 OBJECTION re #127 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Asso . (Goldfine, Dan)
April 8, 2016 Filing 129 OBJECTION to #127 Report and Recommendations by Bristol West Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Yohai, David)
March 26, 2016 Filing 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Fry, Allison)
March 25, 2016 Filing 127 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Western United Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Geico General Insurance Company, #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/25/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/9/2016. (ED)
January 19, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of supplemental authority in support of #106 Motion to dismiss second amended complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna) Modified on 1/20/2016 (IGC).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying #105 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/20/2015. (TKW)
August 25, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE canceling motions hearing scheduled for 9/24/2015. (LAM)
August 24, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE of RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS re (307 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (306 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint , (302 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (308 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , (90 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, (93 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION for Joinder in (90) Motion to Dismiss, andSupplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint , (89 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (94 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5 BY CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC. and CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC. , (92 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , (154 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint , (155 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (156 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (87 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , (88 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, (86 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (107 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law), (106 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, (104 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (125 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , (121 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (120 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint , (123 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint, (42 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (41 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (45 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, (37 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company and Government Employees Insurance Company's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended. Motions Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Copies mailed.(LAM)
August 18, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law), #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint .Motion Hearing limited to Federal Anti-Trust Claims set for 9/22/2015 at 01:30 PM (90 minutes reserved)in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (TKW)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel and Dan W. Goldfine. (Grabel, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2015 (IGC).
July 16, 2015 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Max Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois. (Clark, Johanna)
July 16, 2015 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Geico General Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
July 14, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE of Joinder in Reply to Response to Motion re: Motion to Strike Amended Complaint (docket entry no. 114) by United Automobile Insurance Company (Edelstein, Lara) Modified on 7/15/2015 (MAL).
July 13, 2015 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #105 MOTION to Strike #102 Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Western United Insurance Company. (Yohai, David)
July 13, 2015 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance Company. (Yohai, David)
July 6, 2015 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #105 MOTION to Strike #102 Second Amended Complaint filed by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc.. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 7/7/2015 (IGC).
July 6, 2015 Filing 111 OMNIBUS RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law), #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint filed by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 7/7/2015 (IGC).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Set/ deadlines as to #105 MOTION to Strike #102 Amended Complaint, #107 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law), #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 7/6/2015 (IGC)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 8, 2015 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss the #102 Second Amended Complaint(with Supporting Memorandum of Law) by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David) Modified on 6/9/2015 (IGC).
June 8, 2015 Filing 106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #102 Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clark, Johanna) Modified on 6/9/2015 (IGC).
June 8, 2015 Filing 105 MOTION to Strike #102 Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Western United Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 6/9/2015 (IGC).
June 8, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Geico General Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
June 5, 2015 Filing 103 Second Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #102 Second Amended Complaint by United Insurance Company.(Sanders, Gregory) Modified on 6/8/2015 (IGC).
May 20, 2015 Filing 102 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Market share report, #2 Exhibit: State Farm dashboard, #3 Exhibit: Uncompensated processes and procedures, #4 Exhibit: 1963 Consent Decree)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 5/21/2015 (JET).
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER adopting #95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Geico General Insurance Company, #82 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder of Defendant Western United Insurance Company, now known as CSAA General Insura Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/27/2015. (ED)
April 20, 2015 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Oates, Claire)
April 2, 2015 Filing 99 RESPONSE to objections to #95 Report and Recommendations filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David)
April 2, 2015 Filing 98 RESPONSE to objections to #95 Report and Recommendations filed by Geico General Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
March 19, 2015 Filing 97 OBJECTION filed by All Plaintiffs re #95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Geico General Insurance Company, #82 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder of Defendant Western United Insurance Company, now known as CSAA General Insura . (Fry, Allison) Modified on 3/20/2015 to add filer (JET).
March 19, 2015 Filing 96 (Partial) OBJECTION filed by Geico General Insurance Company re certain dicta in #95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Geico General Insurance Company, #82 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder of Defendant Western United Insurance Company, now known as CSAA General Insura . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 3/20/2015 to add filer (JET).
March 5, 2015 Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 , #82 , #70 , #88 , #45 , #51 , #54 , #71 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/5/2015. (SMW)
December 22, 2014 Filing 94 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Insurance. (Stroud, S.)
November 14, 2014 Filing 93 Minute Entry for motion proceedings held before Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/14/2014. Matters taken under advisement. Court Reporter: Diane Peede. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Appearances) (LAM)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ENDORSED ORDER re #91 Stipulation filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, Farmers Insurance Exchange is substituted as a party for Defendant Farmers Insurance Group, Inc., which is dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/4/2014. (ED)
November 3, 2014 Filing 91 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Dismissing Farmers Insurance Group, Inc. and Substituting Farmers Insurance Group, Inc. with Farmers Insurance Exchange by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Hochstadt, Eric)
October 31, 2014 Filing 90 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by United Insurance.(Sanders, Gregory)
October 30, 2014 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Automobile Insurance Company. (Edelstein, Lara) Modified on 10/31/2014 (LAM).
October 30, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS for failure to state a claim by United Automobile Insurance Company. (Edelstein, Lara) Modified on 10/31/2014 (LAM).
October 30, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara Judith Edelstein on behalf of United Automobile Insurance Company (Edelstein, Lara)
October 28, 2014 Filing 86 AMENDED Notice of hearing on all pending motions set for 11/14/2014 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. 2.5 hours have been reserved for the hearing. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 #191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,254,270,273. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112,114,131,132,133,134,135. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,41,44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,19,69. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 #14,45,51,54,70,71,82. Case number 6:14-cv-6004 #70,73,76,79. Case number 6:14-cv-6005 #19. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/28/2014. (LAK)
October 27, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE of CSAA General Insurance Company Appearance by Richard Wardell Loveland on behalf of Western United Insurance (Loveland, Richard)
October 27, 2014 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of service by Western United Insurance re #83 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Loveland, Richard)
October 27, 2014 Filing 83 Rule 7.1 AMENDED CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Western United Insurance identifying Corporate Parent CSAA Insurance Exchange for Western United Insurance. (Loveland, Richard) Modified on 10/28/2014 (MAL).
October 27, 2014 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder of Defendant Western United Insurance Company, now known as CSAA General Insurance Company, the First Amended Complaint of American Family Mutual Insurance Company by Western United Insurance. (Loveland, Richard)
October 24, 2014 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
October 24, 2014 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Jenkins, Sarah)
October 24, 2014 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum) filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Yohai, David)
October 18, 2014 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc.. (Fry, Allison)
October 18, 2014 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 10/20/2014 (JET).
October 18, 2014 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center L.L.C., Perks Auto Repair, Inc. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 10/20/2014 (JET).
October 17, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Amelia W. Koch and Steven F. Griffith, Jr., on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Litchford, Hal) Modified on 10/20/2014 (JET).
October 9, 2014 Filing 74 SUMMONS issued as to United Automobile Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 9, 2014 Filing 73 SUMMONS issued as to United Insurance. (MAL)
October 9, 2014 Filing 72 SUMMONS issued as to Western United Insurance. (MAL)
October 3, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 5/21/14 filing in MDL 2557 (Dkt 1, 1-1))(Jenkins, Sarah) Modified on 10/7/2014 (LAM).
October 3, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum) by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Yohai, David) Modified on 10/6/2014 (LAM).
September 15, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of hearing on all pending motions to dismiss set for 11/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 # 156,191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,and 254. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112, and 114. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,24,and 44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,and 19. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 # 14,45,51,and 54. (LAK) Modified on 9/16/2014 (LAM).
August 27, 2014 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Yohai, David)
August 13, 2014 Filing 67 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:14-cv-00261. File received electronically
August 12, 2014 Filing 66 CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re Auto Body Shop Antitrust MDL 2557 signed by Marjorie O. Rendell - Acting Chairman MDL Panel. (tls) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
August 1, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING of Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument (Document #153 of MDL 2557). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Proof of Service)(jwt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
August 1, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING of Defendant Horace Mann Insurance Company, Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Document 145 (Document #152 of MDL 2557). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Proof of Service)(jwt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
August 1, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING of Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument (Document #145 in MDL 2557). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Proof of Service)(jwt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 31, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING of Supplemental Information Regarding Motion to Transfer re #10 Notice, #52 Response, filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Committee Order, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Filed Stamped image - page 1)(rks) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance. (Fields, Jared) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DOCKET TEXT ORDERS granting #56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Cashdan; granting #58 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine A. Hopkinson: both for Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 7/17/14 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DOCKET TEXT ORDERS granting #55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kymberly Kochis; granting #57 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Nelson: both for Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 7/17/14 (docket text order - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 58 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine A. Hopkinson , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2088294, filed by Defendants Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 57 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Nelson , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2088282, filed by Defendants Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 56 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Cashdan , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2088247, filed by Defendants Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 55 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kymberly Kochis , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2088152, filed by Defendants Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 11, 2014 Filing 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Belnap, Paul) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 10, 2014 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs AF Collision Repair, Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Chris Body & Paint, Dave's Body Shop, J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Jenson Enterprises, Lindon Collision Repair, Perks Auto Repair. (Pruyn, Robert) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order of Judge Presnell dated June 11, 2014)(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company identifying The Progressive Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Progressive Classic Insurance identifying The Progressive Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Yohai; granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Mastando, III; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Hochstadt: all for Bristol West Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 7/3/14 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR re #19 Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #20 Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #26 Notice of Appearance, #32 Notice (Other), #33 Notice (Other). Description of error: documents have wrong judge information on them. Filers are reminded to keep track of any/all judge reassignments and ensure that all case information on documents matches that appearing at the top of each CM/ECF screen before submitting same. (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance identifying (no corporate parent) as Corporate Parent. (English, Maralyn) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance, Bristol West Insurance, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Moscon, D.) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Bristol West Insurance. (Shurman, Lauren) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Shurman, Lauren) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Hochstadt , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2080654, filed by Defendants Bristol West Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moscon, D.) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Mastando , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2080644, filed by Defendants Bristol West Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application for Pro Hac, #2 Exhibit B ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moscon, D.) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Yohai , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2080586, filed by Defendants Bristol West Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moscon, D.) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard L. Fenton; granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark L. Hanover; granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bonnie Lau: all for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 7/2/14 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. McCarthy; granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather Carson Perkins: both for American Family Mutual Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 7/1/14 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Mumford for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 6/30/14 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Classic Insurance (Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bonnie Lau , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2080078, filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark L. Hanover , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2080066, filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard L. Fenton , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2080036, filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony C. Kaye on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance (Kaye, Anthony) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Wegener on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance (Wegener, Emily) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Anderson on behalf of Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Anderson, Mark) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Shurman on behalf of Bristol West Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company (Shurman, Lauren) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Matthew Moscon on behalf of Bristol West Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company (Moscon, D.) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather Carson Perkins , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2078609, filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. McCarthy , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2078599, filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Maralyn M. English on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance (English, Maralyn) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Safeco Corporation; Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation; Liberty Mutual Holdings, Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Huefner, Carl) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance identifying Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Huefner, Carl) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR re #13 Amended Complaint, #15 Notice of Appearance, #16 Notice of Appearance, #17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Description of error: documents have wrong judge information on them. Filers are reminded to keep track of any/all judge reassignments and ensure that all case information on documents matches that appearing at the top of each CM/ECF screen before submitting same. (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Mumford , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2078461, filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Huefner, Carl) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl F. Huefner on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America (Huefner, Carl) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse C Trentadue on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America (Trentadue, Jesse) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 52 RESPONSE re #10 Notice of Multi-District Litigation Motion filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(jwt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance. (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance, American Family Mutual Insurance, Bristol West Insurance, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty, Farmers Insurance Group, Geico General Insurance, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: J.P.s Custom Body & Paint, Inc. d/b/a J.P.s Collision Center; Daves Body Shop, Inc.; and Chris Body & Paint, Inc.. New Defendants: Safeco Insurance Company of America; United Automobile Insurance Company; and United Insurance Company d/b/a United Insurance Group., filed by Jenson Enterprises, Lindon Collision Repair, Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Perks Auto Repair, AF Collision Repair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2012 Market Share Report, #2 Exhibit State Farm 'Dashboard', #3 Exhibit Non-Exhaustive Uncompensated Procedures List, #4 Exhibit Consent Decree) (Pruyn, Robert) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/23/14 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 22, 2014 Filing 11 The case is reassigned to a District Judge per counsel and the multidistrict aspect of the case. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 21, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Multi-District Litigation Motion by AF Collision Repair, Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Jenson Enterprises, Lindon Collision Repair, Perks Auto Repair (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pruyn, Robert) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Geico General Insurance. (las) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 2, 2014 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance identifying Geico Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Fields, Jared) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jamie L. Halavais for Geico General Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/1/14 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan W. Goldfine for Geico General Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/1/14 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
April 30, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jamie L. Halavais , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2041216, filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
April 30, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan W. Goldfine , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2041199, filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
April 30, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared C. Fields on behalf of Geico General Insurance (Fields, Jared) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
April 30, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy F. Sorenson on behalf of Geico General Insurance (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]
April 10, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance, Allstate Insurance, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance, American Family Mutual Insurance, Bristol West Insurance, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty, Farmers Insurance Group, Geico General Insurance, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance, United Services Automobile Association, Western United Insurance (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 50141 (Manual receipt #) 4681061511 Computer receipt #), filed by Jenson Enterprises, Lindon Collision Repair, Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Perks Auto Repair, AF Collision Repair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (rks) Modified adding computer receipt # on 4/16/2014 (rks). [Transferred from utd on 8/13/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpine Straightening Systems et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F. Collision Repair, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenson Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindon Collision Center L.L.C.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Body & Paint, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave's Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpine Straightening Systems
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perks Auto Repair, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Robert Reed Pruyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Gregory J. Sanders
Represented By: S. Shane Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear River Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Mark L. Anderson
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Emily L. Wegener
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Anthony C. Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Sean McCarthy
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Sarah Jenkins
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Carl F. Huefner
Represented By: Jesse C Trentadue
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Emily L. Wegener
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Anthony C. Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western United Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Wardell Loveland
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Classic Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Mark L. Anderson
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Paul M. Belnap
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Lara Judith Edelstein
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Paul Edward Susz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: D. Matthew Moscon
Represented By: Lauren A. Shurman
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Emily L. Wegener
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Anthony C. Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared C. Fields
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Mark J. Criser
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Matthew F. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol West Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: D. Matthew Moscon
Represented By: Lauren A. Shurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Max Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?