Parker Auto Body Inc et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Auto Body L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Jay Smith, Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Stubbs Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Christopher Robertson, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Edward Duchesne, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, David Profit, Medines Collision Center L L C, Robert Jordan, Adams Collision L L C, Parker Auto Body Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Keith Mazarac, Reynolds Body Works L L C, A W Staggs, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Dominic Landry, Complete Collision Center L L C, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Body By Cook, Inc., Edward Duchesne doing business as Duchesne Paint & Body, Robert Jordan doing business as Jordans Automotive & Performance, Joseph S. Kelley doing business as Kelley Kustoms, A W Staggs doing business as Staggs Auto Body Shop, Stubbs Inc doing business as Expressway Paint & Body, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc doing business as Tonys Body Shop, Jay Smith doing business as Precision Collision, Keith Mazarac doing business as Precision Body and Frame, Dominic Landry doing business as Dom's Paint & Body, Kencade Enterprises Inc doing business as Kens Kustom Body Shop, C & C Automotive L L C doing business as Miles Paint & Body, David Profit doing business as Daves Auto Body and Christopher Robertson doing business as Chris Auto Body Shop
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, American National General Insurance Co, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Esurance Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Progressive Security Insurance Co, GEICO General Insurance Company, Imperial Fire & Casualty Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co, Direct General Insurance Co of Louisiana, Encompass Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Geico Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Allstate Insurance Company, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, GoAuto Insurance Co, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Sentry Select Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., America First Insurance Co, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, American National Property & Casualty Co., Shelter General Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2014cv06004
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: T B Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER that the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/8/2016. (TKW)
October 5, 2016 Filing 194 MANDATE of USCA as to #190 Notice of appeal filed by Martins Paint & Body Inc, A W Staggs, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Dominic Landry, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, C & C Automotive L L C, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Complete Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, David Profit, Christopher Robertson, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Medines Collision Center L L C, Big Easy Collision L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Body By Cook, Inc., Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Adams Collision L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Jay Smith, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Robert Jordan, Stubbs Inc, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Keith Mazarac, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Parker Auto Body Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C, Edward Duchesne, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Kencade Enterprises Inc Issued as Mandate: 10/05/2016 USCA number: 16-15470-HH. DISMISSED for want of prosecution. (JEV)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 25, 2016 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding notification of fee payment re #190 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 16-15470-A. (JEV)
August 25, 2016 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number Orl-056271 re #190 Notice of appeal (JEV)
August 15, 2016 Filing 192 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #190 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JEV)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #189 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Marjorie M. Salazar terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/15/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
August 13, 2016 Filing 190 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #184 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #188 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #185 Order on Motion to Strike, #164 Order by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C. Filing fee not paid. (Fry, Allison)
August 12, 2016 Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION for Marjorie M. Salazar to withdraw as attorney by Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salazar, Marjorie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 29, 2016 Set deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2016. (LMM)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER adopting #167 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, dismissing some tortious interference claims without prejudice, dismissing remaining state law claims with prejudice, setting deadline for amended pleading of August 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/28/2016. (ED)
June 2, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Newton on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co (Newton, Emily)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #182 Motion to Strike. The Objection (Doc. No. #178) is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/27/2016. (SR)(ctp)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER denying #166 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2016. (ED)
May 9, 2016 Filing 183 RESPONSE to objections to #167 Report and Recommendations filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (Horn, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2016 Filing 182 MOTION to Strike #177 Objection to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American National General Insurance Co, American National Property & Casualty Co., Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Clark, Johanna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
May 9, 2016 Filing 181 RESPONSE to objections to #167 Report and Recommendations filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American National General Insurance Co, American National Property & Casualty Co., Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
May 9, 2016 Filing 180 RESPONSE to objections to #167 Report and Recommendations Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company And Government Employees Insurance Company's Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Objections To Magistrate's Report And Recommendation filed by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
May 9, 2016 Filing 179 RESPONSE re #178 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company. (Rohback, Thomas)
April 27, 2016 Filing 178 (STRICKEN BY #185 ORDER) OBJECTION to #167 Report and Recommendations Amended by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint in A & R Body Specialty v. Progressive Cas. Ins. Co., #2 Exhibit complaint filed in Price's Collision Ctr., LLC v. Progressive Hawaii Ins. Corp., #3 Exhibit complaint, M.V.B. Collision, Inc., v. Allstate Insurance Company, #4 complaint, Kirby's Spectrum Collision, Inc. v. Government Employees Insurance Company)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 5/31/2016 (RDO).
April 22, 2016 Filing 177 OBJECTION re #167 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #131 Joinder in motion filed by America First Insurance Co, #122 Joinder in motion filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint in A & R Body Specialty v. Progressive Cas. Ins. Co., #2 Exhibit complaint filed in Price's Collision Ctr., LLC v. Progressive Hawaii Ins. Corp, #3 Exhibit complaint, M.V.B. Collision, Inc., v. Allstate Insurance Company,, #4 Exhibit Kirby's Spectrum Collision, Inc. v. Government Employees Insurance Company,)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 4/27/2016 (LMM). **Attorney's office notified that caption on document is wrong**
April 21, 2016 Filing 176 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 MOTION for Reconsideration re #165 Amended Order filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna) Text modified on 4/22/2016 (RDO).
April 21, 2016 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 MOTION for Reconsideration re #165 Amended Order filed by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldfine, Dan)
April 21, 2016 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 MOTION for Reconsideration re #165 Amended Order filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
April 21, 2016 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #166 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (Horn, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2016 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #166 Motion for Reconsideration filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rohback, Thomas)
April 19, 2016 Filing 171 PARTIAL OBJECTION re #167 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company and Government Employees's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 4/20/2016 (RDO).
April 19, 2016 Filing 170 PARTIAL OBJECTION to #167 Report and Recommendation by Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Plauche, Andrew) Modified on 4/20/2016 (RDO).
April 19, 2016 Filing 169 PARTIAL OBJECTION to #167 Report and Recommendations by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna) Text modified on 4/20/2016 (RDO).
April 19, 2016 Filing 168 PARTIAL OBJECTION to #167 Report and Recommendations by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co. (Nelson, Michael) Text modified on 4/20/2016 (RDO).
April 5, 2016 Filing 167 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #131 Joinder in motion filed by America First Insurance Co, #122 Joinder in motion filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by 21st Century North American Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hanover American Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, #120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company, #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/5/2016. (JMP)
April 4, 2016 Filing 166 MOTION for Reconsideration re #165 Amended Order by All Plaintiffs. (Fry, Allison)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 AMENDED ORDER amending #164 Order to correct scrivener's error. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/23/2016. (ED)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER re #125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim, #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint, #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/16/2016. (ED)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying #124 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/15/2016. (TKW)
January 19, 2016 Filing 162 NOTICE of supplemental authority in support of #125 Motion to dismiss amended complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna) Modified on 1/20/2016 (IGC).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER granting #156 Motion. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/24/2015. (Presnell, Gregory)
August 25, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE canceling motions hearing scheduled for 9/24/2015. (LAM)
August 24, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE of RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS re (307 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (306 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint , (302 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (308 in 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , (90 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint, (93 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION for Joinder in (90) Motion to Dismiss, andSupplemental MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint , (89 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (94 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 3, 4 and 5, (92 in 6:14-cv-06000-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT , (154 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint , (155 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , (156 in 6:14-cv-06001-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss Second Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , (87 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , (88 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (86 in 6:14-cv-06002-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (107 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law), (106 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss Second Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , (104 in 6:14-cv-06003-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (125 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , (121 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (120 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint , (123 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss (119) First Amended Complaint, (42 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (41 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , (45 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , (37 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motions Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Copies mailed.(LAM)
August 18, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , #120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint , #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing limited to Federal Anti-Trust Claims set for 9/22/2015 at 01:30 PM (90 minutes reserved)in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (TKW)
August 18, 2015 Filing 156 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Removal from Electronic Service List in Multidistrict Litigation Case No. 6:14-cv-2557 and Case No. 6:14-cv-06004 by GoAuto Insurance Co. (Zimmerman, Richard)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 13, 2015 Filing 154 REPLY re #153 Response to Motion, and in support of, #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 8/14/2015 (JET).
August 3, 2015 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to certain Defendants' motion to dismiss, #2 Exhibit Response to certain Defendants' motion to dismiss)(Fry, Allison)
July 31, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel and Dan W. Goldfine(Grabel, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2015 (JET).
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #140 Motion to Strike; provided, however, Plaintiff may file an amended response of no more than 30 pages, within seven days ; denying #149 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/28/2015. (TKW)
July 27, 2015 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION to Strike #135 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc. (Fry, Allison)
July 27, 2015 Filing 149 MOTION for Reconsideration re 144 Order on Motion to Strike by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ENDORSED ORDER granting #147 motion to dismiss GoAuto Insurance Co. as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/23/2015. (Presnell, Gregory)
July 22, 2015 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant GoAuto Insurance Company (Agreed) by All Plaintiffs and GoAuto Insurance Company. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 7/23/2015 (JET).
July 16, 2015 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Clark, Johanna)
July 16, 2015 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET).
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ENDORSED ORDER denying #142 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/15/2015. (Presnell, Gregory)
July 14, 2015 Filing 143 SUPPLEMENT (Rule 3.01(g) Certification) re #140 MOTION to Strike #135 Response in Opposition to Motion by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 7/15/2015 (JET).
July 14, 2015 Filing 142 MOTION to Strike #140 MOTION to Strike #135 Response in Opposition to Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Fry, Allison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 13, 2015 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion and in support re #124 MOTION to Strike #119 Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Yohai, David) Modified on 7/14/2015 (JET).
July 13, 2015 Filing 140 MOTION to Strike #135 Response in Opposition to Motion by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 13, 2015 Filing 139 NOTICE Of Joinder In #138 Reply Brief In Further Support Of Motion To Dismiss by AIG Property Casualty Company re #138 Reply to Response to Motion (de Leeuw, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2015 (JET).
July 13, 2015 Filing 138 REPLY to Response to Motion re #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Rohback, Thomas)
July 9, 2015 Filing 137 REPLY to #133 Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (Horn, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/10/2015 (JET).
July 6, 2015 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION to Strike #119 Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C. (Fry, Allison)
July 6, 2015 Filing 135 ***STRICKEN*** RESPONSE in Opposition re #123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 7/28/2015 (JET). STRICKEN PER ORDER #151.
July 6, 2015 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim , #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison)
July 2, 2015 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Body By Cook, Inc., Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Robert Jordan, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Joseph S. Kelley, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Dominic Landry, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Keith Mazarac, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC, Parker Auto Body Inc, David Profit, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Christopher Robertson, Jay Smith, A W Staggs, Stubbs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Independent appraiser estimate, pg. 1, #2 Exhibit Omnibus Response, Brewer Body Shop v.State Farm, 6:14-cv-6002)(Fry, Allison)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 15, 2015 Filing 131 JOINDER in motion by America First Insurance Co re #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by 21st Century North American Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hanover American Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co . (Mumford, Michael)
June 15, 2015 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by America First Insurance Co. (Mumford, Michael) Modified on 6/16/2015 (JET).
June 15, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Mumford and Ernest E. Vargo on behalf of America First Insurance Co (Mumford, Michael) Modified on 6/16/2015 (JET).
June 12, 2015 Set/reset deadlines as to #121, #123 and #125 MOTIONS to dismiss and #124 MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 7/6/2015. See Order #128. (JET)
June 12, 2015 Set/reset deadlines as to #120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint . Responses due by 7/2/2015. See Order #166. (JET)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 11, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE of Joinder re #124 MOTION to Strike #119 Amended Complaint by Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company (Salazar, Marjorie) Modified on 6/12/2015 (JET).
June 8, 2015 Filing 125 MOTION to dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casuality Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clark, Johanna) Modified on 6/9/2015 (JET).
June 8, 2015 Filing 124 MOTION to Strike #119 Amended Complaint (with Supporting Memorandum of Law) by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Paloverde Insurance Co, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 8, 2015 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 6/9/2015 (JET).
June 8, 2015 Filing 122 JOINDER in motion by AIG Property Casualty Company re #121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by 21st Century North American Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Progressive Security Insurance Co, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hanover American Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Paloverde Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co Notice of Joinder in Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Docket #121). (de Leeuw, Michael)
June 8, 2015 Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Paloverde Insurance Co, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rohback, Thomas)
June 5, 2015 Filing 120 MOTION to Dismiss #119 First Amended Complaint by Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (Horn, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/8/2015 (JET).
May 21, 2015 Filing 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Market share report, #2 Exhibit Louisiana v. State Farm, #3 Exhibit Uncompensated processes and procedures, #4 Exhibit affidavit, #5 Exhibit Consent Decree)(Fry, Allison)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER adopting #109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (70 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by 21st Century North American Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/27/2015. (ED)
April 22, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. of Appearance of Counsel (Barthel, David)
April 20, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Paloverde Insurance Co, Progressive Security Insurance Co (Oates, Claire)
April 10, 2015 Filing 115 RESPONSE to objections to #109 Report and Recommendations filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Paloverde Insurance Co, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company, U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casuality Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
April 9, 2015 Filing 114 RESPONSE to #112 objections to #109 Report and Recommendations filed by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 4/10/2015 (JET).
April 7, 2015 Filing 113 RESPONSE to #112 objections to #109 Report and Recommendations filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Horn, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/10/2015 (JET).
March 24, 2015 Filing 112 OBJECTION re #109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (70 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by 21st Century North American Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, . (Fry, Allison)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re #110 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by Big Easy Collision L L C that all claims of Big Easy Collision, LLC, a Plaintiff in the above-styled case, are dismissed, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Any pending motions as to these claims are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/17/2015. (TKW)
March 16, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Big Easy Collision L L C (MAL)
March 10, 2015 Filing 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (70 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, (76 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, (88 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Incorporated Memorandum, (19 in 6:14-cv-06005-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint, (79 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Action, (73 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Supporting Memorandum, (101 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim, (100 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim, (102 in 6:14-cv-06004-GAP-TBS) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/10/2015. (SMW)
February 20, 2015 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Firemans Fund Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz, SE, Corporate Parent Allianz, SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V. for Firemans Fund Insurance Company.. (Horn, Elizabeth)
January 29, 2015 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hanover Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc. for Hanover Insurance Company.. (Salazar, Marjorie)
January 29, 2015 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hanover American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc. for Hanover American Insurance Co.. (Salazar, Marjorie)
January 20, 2015 Filing 105 REPLY to #103 Response to Motion re #101 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company. (Salazar, Marjorie) Modified on 1/20/2015 (IGC).
January 9, 2015 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company. (Seewald, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/12/2015 (JET).
January 7, 2015 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Edward Duchesne, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc. (Fry, Allison)
January 5, 2015 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum by U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company. (Seewald, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2014 Filing 101 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Company. (Salazar, Marjorie)
December 17, 2014 Filing 100 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (Horn, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2014 Filing 99 JOINDER in motion by AIG Property Casualty Company re #70 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #76 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #73 MOTION to dismiss and #96 REPLY to Response to Motion re 76 MOTION to Dismiss. (de Leeuw, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2014 (JET).
December 16, 2014 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by AIG Property Casualty Company. (No parent entity or publicly held entity owns 10% or more of the stock of AIG) . (de Leeuw, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2014 (JET).
December 16, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. de Leeuw, John J. Sullivan and Jason Bonk on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company (de Leeuw, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2014 (JET).
December 15, 2014 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
December 10, 2014 Filing 95 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Jeffrey R. Seewald on behalf of U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company. (Seewald, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ENDORSED ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to File. Reply of ten pages or fewer due on or before December 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/8/2014. (ED)
December 5, 2014 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
November 14, 2014 Filing 92 Minute Entry for motion proceedings held before Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/14/2014. Matters taken under advisement. Court Reporter: Diane Peede. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Appearances) (LAM)
November 12, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of joinder in #70, #73, #76, #79 MOTIONS to Dismiss by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana. (Skambis, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2014 (JET).
November 12, 2014 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re Order in lead case 6:14-md-2557 by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana; see also Notices #3 and #4. (Skambis, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2014 (JET).
November 12, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Skambis, Jr on behalf of Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana (Skambis, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2014 (JET).
November 11, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Incorporated Memorandum by GoAuto Insurance Co. (Zimmerman, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Case transferred in - district transfer (Western District of Louisiana 14-02270) by GoAuto Insurance Co. (Zimmerman, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of GoAuto Insurance Co (Zimmerman, Richard)
October 28, 2014 Filing 85 AMENDED Notice of hearing on all pending motions set for 11/14/2014 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. 2.5 hours have been reserved for the hearing. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 #191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,254,270,273. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112,114,131,132,133,134,135. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,41,44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,19,69. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 #14,45,51,54,70,71,82. Case number 6:14-cv-6004 #70,73,76,79. Case number 6:14-cv-6005 #19. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/28/2014. (LAK)
October 24, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carpenter on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. (Carpenter, Michael)
October 22, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Keenan Cottrell on behalf of Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company (Cottrell, Edward)
October 22, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE by USAA Casuality Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company of Ripe Motions to Dismiss (Litchford, Hal)
October 15, 2014 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company for Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co.. (Plauche, Andrew)
October 10, 2014 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co (Kaplan, Howard) Modified on 10/14/2014 (MAL).
October 10, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Action by United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (Kaplan, Howard)
October 9, 2014 Filing 78 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Co. (MAL)
October 8, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lane Plauche, James K. Ordeneaux, and Attie B. Carville on behalf of Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co (Plauche, Andrew) Modified on 10/9/2014 (JET).
October 3, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
October 3, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company (Fenton, Richard)
October 3, 2014 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re Order entered in 6:14-md-2557 by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Fischer, Ian) Modified on 10/6/2014 (JET).
October 3, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Supporting Memorandum by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Fischer, Ian) Modified on 10/6/2014 (JET).
October 3, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Matthew Fischer and Dan W. Goldfine on behalf of GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company (Fischer, Ian) Modified on 10/6/2014 (JET).
October 3, 2014 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Co.; Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Rohback, Thomas) Modified on 10/6/2014 (JET).
October 3, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Esurance Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co., Paloverde Insurance Co, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casuality Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Rohback, Thomas)
October 3, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Rohback on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Co., Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Rohback, Thomas)
October 2, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant and Designation of Trial Counsel Appearance by Howard Bruce Kaplan on behalf of United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire & Indemnity Co. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN CASE # 6:14-md-2557 on 10/1/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 67 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 66 SUMMONS issued as to Paloverde Insurance Co. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 65 SUMMONS issued as to Progressive Security Insurance Co. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 64 SUMMONS issued as to State Farm General Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 63 SUMMONS issued as to State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 62 SUMMONS issued as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 61 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 60 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Indemnity Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 59 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 58 SUMMONS issued as to Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 57 SUMMONS issued as to GEICO Casualty Co.. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 56 SUMMONS issued as to GEICO General Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 2, 2014 Filing 55 SUMMONS issued as to Geico Indemnity Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 54 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 53 SUMMONS issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 52 SUMMONS issued as to USAA Casuality Insurance Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 51 SUMMONS issued as to GoAuto Insurance Co. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 50 SUMMONS issued as to Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 49 SUMMONS issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 48 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 47 SUMMONS issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of America. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 46 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 45 SUMMONS issued as to Government Employee's Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 44 SUMMONS issued as to Shelter General Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 43 SUMMONS issued as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 42 SUMMONS issued as to Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 41 SUMMONS issued as to Direct General Insurance Co of Louisiana. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 40 SUMMONS issued as to Sentry Select Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 39 SUMMONS issued as to AIG Property Casualty Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 38 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 37 SUMMONS issued as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 36 SUMMONS issued as to Hanover Insurance Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 35 SUMMONS issued as to Hanover American Insurance Co. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 34 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 33 SUMMONS issued as to Farmers Insurance Exchange. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 32 SUMMONS issued as to United Fire & Casualty Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS issued as to United Fire & Indemnity Co. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 29 SUMMONS issued as to Encompass Indemnity Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 28 SUMMONS issued as to Encompass Insurance Company of America. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century North American Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS issued as to Encompass Property & Casualty Co. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 24 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 23 SUMMONS issued as to America First Insurance Co. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to American National General Insurance Co. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS issued as to American National Property & Casualty Co.. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Esurance Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Indemnity Company. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS issued as to Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (MAL)
October 1, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (IGC)
October 1, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Imperial Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. (MAL)
September 15, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of hearing on all pending motions to dismiss set for 11/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 # 156,191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,and 254. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112, and 114. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,24,and 44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,and 19. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 # 14,45,51,and 54. (LAK) Modified on 9/16/2014 (LAM).
September 4, 2014 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by USAA General Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA General Indemnity Company.. (Litchford, Hal)
August 27, 2014 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Case transferred in - district transfer , 14-md-2557 #2 Order, #3 Interested persons order by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon . (Mumford, Michael) Modified on 8/27/2014 (LAM).
August 21, 2014 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 3:14-cv-02270. File received electronically
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 1, directing transfer to Middle District of Florida, In Re: Auto Body Shop Antitrust Litigation, MDL # 2557. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Transfer Order in MDL 2257 - In re: Auto Body Shop Antitrust Litigation, advising case shall be transferred to the Middle District of Florida upon request of the record. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
August 6, 2014 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, Parker Auto Body Inc, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Taylor Auto Body L L C. (aty,Alexander, Kevin) Modified filers on 8/6/2014 (Yocum, M). [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
August 6, 2014 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Daniel P Parker, Kevin D Alexander, Michael L DuBos on behalf of Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Bradshaws Body Shop Inc, Brileys Paint & Body Inc, Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldstons Auto Body L L C, Guillorys Collision Center Inc, Jims Body Shop L L C, Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, LeJeunes Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martins Paint & Body Inc, Medines Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, Parker Auto Body Inc, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Taylor Auto Body L L C. Show Cause Response due by 8/20/2014. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
August 4, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Action filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (crt,Yocum, M) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Related Actions with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Yocum, M) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint,, sent to Daniel P Parker, Kevin D Alexander, Michael L DuBos on behalf of Adams Collision L L C, Advantage Collision Center Inc, Antley's Collision & Repair Center L L C, Auto Body Specialists Inc, Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc, Big Easy Collision L L C, Bobby's Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C, Bradshaw's Body Shop Inc, Briley's Paint & Body Inc, Brouillette's Paint & Body L L C, C & C Automotive L L C, Complete Collision Center L L C, Country Club Auto Repair Inc, Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc, Final Touch Collision Repair Inc, Ginn's Automotive Frame Shop L L C, Goldston's Auto Body L L C, Guillory's Collision Center Inc, Jim's Body Shop L L C, Johnnie's Paint & Body Shop Inc, Keith's Paint & Body L L C, Kencade Enterprises Inc, Krystal Auto Collision Inc, Le Jeune's Body Works Inc, Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C, Martin's Paint & Body Inc, Medine's Collision Center L L C, Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc, Parker Auto Body Inc, Reynolds Body Works L L C, Stubbs Inc, Taylor Auto Body L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/29/2014. (crt,Yocum, M) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 21st Century Centennial Insurance Co, 21st Century North America Insurance Co, A I G Property Casualty Co, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co, Allstate Indemnity Co, Allstate Insurance Co, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co, America First Insurance Co, American National General Insurance Co, American National Property & Casualty Co, Direct General Insurance Co of Louisiana, Encompass Indemnity Co, Encompass Insurance Co of America, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Firemans Fund Insurance Co, G E I C O Casualty Co, G E I C O General Insurance Co, G E I C O Indemnity Co, GoAuto Insurance Co, Government Employees Insurance Co, Hanover American Insurance Co, Hanover Insurance Co, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Insurance Co, Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Hartford Fire Insurance Co, Hartford Insurance Co of the Midwest, Imperial Fire & Casualty Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co, Paloverde Insurance Co, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Safeco Insurance Co of America, Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co, Sentry Select Insurance Co, Shelter General Insurance Co, Shelter Mutual Insurance Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, State Farm General Insurance Co, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Co of America, Travelers Indemnity Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of America, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Co of America, U S A A Casualty Insurance Co, U S A A General Indemnity Co, U S Agencies Casualty Insurance Co Inc, United Fire & Casualty Co, United Fire & Indemnity Co, eSurance Insurance Co (crt,Yocum, M) [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2562436) filed by Parker Auto Body, Inc, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kevin D Alexander added to party Parker Auto Body, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Alexander, Kevin) Modified text on 7/15/2014 (Yocum, M). [Transferred from lawd on 8/21/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker Auto Body Inc et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Auto Body L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnies Paint & Body Shop Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginns Automotive Frame Shop L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brileys Paint & Body Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto Body Specialists Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Easy Collision L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Auto Collision Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith's Paint & Body L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph S. Kelley
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAPA Collision Center of Bastrop, LLC
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Smith
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradshaws Body Shop Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbys Paint & Body Shop & Auto Sales L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stubbs Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advantage Collision Center Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillorys Collision Center Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Final Touch Collision Repair Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Robertson
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kencade Enterprises Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martins Paint & Body Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Body & Frame Shop Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Club Auto Repair Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goldstons Auto Body L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Duchesne
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brouillettes Paint & Body L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Profit
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medines Collision Center L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jordan
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams Collision L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Auto Body Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jims Body Shop L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeJeunes Body Works Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Mazarac
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynolds Body Works L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A W Staggs
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antleys Collision & Repair Center L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & C Automotive L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Lauw Collision Repair Center L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Landry
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Collision Center L L C
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Auto Body & Paint Service Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Body By Cook, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Duchesne doing business as Duchesne Paint & Body
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jordan doing business as Jordans Automotive & Performance
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph S. Kelley doing business as Kelley Kustoms
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A W Staggs doing business as Staggs Auto Body Shop
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stubbs Inc doing business as Expressway Paint & Body
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Warehouse of Natchitoches Inc doing business as Tonys Body Shop
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Smith doing business as Precision Collision
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Mazarac doing business as Precision Body and Frame
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Landry doing business as Dom's Paint & Body
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kencade Enterprises Inc doing business as Kens Kustom Body Shop
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & C Automotive L L C doing business as Miles Paint & Body
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Profit doing business as Daves Auto Body
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Robertson doing business as Chris Auto Body Shop
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Michael L DuBos
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Kevin David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National General Insurance Co
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firemans Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Elizabeth Swingle Horn
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Property & Casualty Co
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: James Keith Ordeneaux
Represented By: Andrew Lane Plauche, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Babin Carville
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Karina Isabel Perez
Represented By: Howard Bruce Kaplan
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Indemnity Co
Represented By: Karina Isabel Perez
Represented By: Howard Bruce Kaplan
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct General Insurance Co of Louisiana
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Salomon Laguerre
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana
Represented By: Christopher Charles Skambis, Jr.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee's Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoAuto Insurance Co
Represented By: Richard F. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Julie M. McCall
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Agencies Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Seewald
Represented By: Randy R. Dow
Represented By: Anthony J. Rollo
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Marjorie M. Salazar
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Co.
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Keenan Cottrell
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Gregg A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America First Insurance Co
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property & Casualty Co.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Gregg A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company
Represented By: Edward Keenan Cottrell
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century North American Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover American Insurance Co
Represented By: Marjorie M. Salazar
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Represented By: Jason B. Bonk
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?