Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. et al v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: S. Danihel Collission, Inc., Knebel Autobody Center, Inc., Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc., Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc., Douglas Autobody, Inc., Quality Auto Body, Inc., Mitchell's Motors, Inc., Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. and Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. doing business as Broadway Collision Center
Defendant: Affirmative Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Westfield Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Unique Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, LM Insurance Corporation, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, LM General Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Mutual Casualty Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Delphi Casualty Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, American Heartland Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Universal Casualty Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Apollo Casualty Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Founders Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Safeway Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Automobile Management Corporation, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Erie Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), 21st Century North American Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Dairyland Insurance Company, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company, American Freedom Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, American Access Casualty Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2014cv06011
Filed: December 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE of change of address by William James Kelly, III (Kelly, William)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER for the parties to these cases to confer and advise the Court by July 10, 2020, how they intend to proceed with respect to the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/24/2020. (LAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 169 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ENDORSED ORDER granting #167 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney C. Todd Willis terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/19/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 167 Unopposed MOTION for C. Todd Willis to withdraw as attorney by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Willis, C.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE of change of address by Franklin G. Burt (Burt, Franklin)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ENDORSED ORDER granting #161 Motion to Strike #157 Notice of Appearance. The notice is Stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/28/2019. (Smith, Thomas) Modified on 3/28/2019 (PML).
March 28, 2019 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION to Strike #157 Notice of appearance by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Burt, Franklin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) #159 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/26/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 159 MOTION to Withdraw by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Burt, Franklin) Modified on 3/26/2019 (LMM).
March 20, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin G. Burt on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Burt, Franklin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 157 **STRICKEN PER #161 ORDER** NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin G. Burt on behalf of 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company (Burt, Franklin) Modified on 3/29/2019 (LMM).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER STAYING and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/22/16. (RDO)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Marjorie M. Salazar terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/15/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
August 12, 2016 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Marjorie M. Salazar to withdraw as attorney by Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salazar, Marjorie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 2, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Newton on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company (Newton, Emily)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
January 19, 2016 Filing 148 NOTICE of supplemental authority in support of #134 Motion to dismiss amended complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna) Modified on 1/20/2016 (IGC).
December 8, 2015 Filing 147 REPLY to #139 Response to Motion re #134 MOTION to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Indemnity Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Caldwell, Lori) Modified on 12/8/2015 (IGC).
December 8, 2015 Filing 146 REPLY to #139 Response to Motion re #137 MOTION to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint Geico's Reply in Support of Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 12/8/2015 (IGC).
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ENDORSED ORDER granting #144 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/8/2015. (ED)
December 7, 2015 Filing 144 MOTION for leave to file in Excess of Page Limit by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Caldwell, Lori)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #138 motion to stay.This case is hereby STAYED as against Defendant, Affirmative Insurance Company, until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/30/2015. (TKW)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying #135 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/25/2015. (TKW)
November 13, 2015 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #135 MOTION to Strike #130 Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Notice of electronic filing, #2 Exhibit: Notice of electronic filing, #3 Exhibit: Notice of electronic filing)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 11/16/2015 (JET).
November 13, 2015 Filing 139 Omnibus RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 and #137 MOTIONS to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Response to separate GEICO arguments)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 11/16/2015 (JET).
October 22, 2015 Set deadlines as to #137 MOTION to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint, #135 MOTION to Strike #130 Amended Complaint, #134 MOTION to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 11/13/2015 by Plaintiffs, Replies due by 12/8/2015 by Defendants. (IGC)
October 19, 2015 Filing 138 MOTION to stay by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison)
October 16, 2015 Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 10/19/2015 (JET).
October 12, 2015 Filing 136 JOINDER in motion by Erie Indemnity Company, Erie Insurance Company re #135 MOTION to Strike #130 Amended Complaint filed by 21st Century North American Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Safeway Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Allstate Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Esurance Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Ubersax, Jeffery)
October 9, 2015 Filing 135 MOTION to Strike #130 Amended Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Yohai, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
October 9, 2015 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss #130 First Amended Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants)(Caldwell, Lori) Modified on 10/13/2015 (JET).
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 28, 2015 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Klinger, Gary)
September 28, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Hannay on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Hannay, William)
September 19, 2015 Filing 130 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Illinois market share report, #2 Exhibit national market share report, #3 Exhibit California BAR report, #4 Exhibit USAA parts brochure, #5 Exhibit article, #6 Exhibit unpaid procedures, #7 Exhibit affidavit, #8 Exhibit Consent Decree)(Fry, Allison)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 17, 2015 Set/reset deadlines: Amended complaint due by 9/8/2015. See Order #128. (JET)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #37 motion to dismiss; granting #38 motion to dismiss; terminating #119 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 31, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel and Dan W. Goldfine(Grabel, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2015 (JET).
July 16, 2015 Filing 126 RESPONSE to #124 omnibus objections to #119 Report and Recommendations filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Apollo Casualty Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Automobile Management Corporation, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response - List of Defendants)(Caldwell, Lori) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET).
July 16, 2015 Filing 125 RESPONSE to #124 omnibus objections to #119 Report and Recommendations filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET).
June 29, 2015 Filing 124 Omnibus OBJECTION by various Plaintiffs re #119 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law . (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (JET). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting (200) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Attorney Kathryn A. Honecker terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/29/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS, 6:14-cv-06011-GAP-TBS(Smith, Thomas)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Set/reset deadlines as to #119 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Responses due by 6/29/2015. See Order #121. (JET) Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 3, 2015 Filing 119 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW)
May 18, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of change of address by William James Kelly, III (Kelly, William)
April 22, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Appearance of Counsel (Barthel, David)
April 20, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company (Oates, Claire)
March 23, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE of Errata related to #114 Reply to #111 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Errata: Corrected Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Corrected Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to Corrected Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Kelly, William) Modified on 3/24/2015 (JET).
March 23, 2015 Filing 114 REPLY to #111 Response to Motion re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Kelly, William) Modified on 3/24/2015 (JET).
March 23, 2015 Filing 113 REPLY to #111 Response to Motion re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Indemnity Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Concord Doc 65, #3 Exhibit C - Ultimate Collision Doc 39, #4 Exhibit D - Ultimate Collision Doc 42)(Caldwell, Lori) Modified on 3/24/2015 (JET).
March 23, 2015 Filing 112 REPLY to #111 Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 3/24/2015 (JET).
March 14, 2015 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support, #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc., Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc., Douglas Autobody, Inc., Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc., Knebel Autobody Center, Inc., Mitchell's Motors, Inc., S. Danihel Collission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ultimate Collision v. State Farm)(Fry, Allison)
March 9, 2015 Set deadlines as to #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support, #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 3/13/2015 by Plaintiffs. (IGC)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting (153) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/6/2015. (SMW)
February 24, 2015 Filing 109 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois). (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 108 SUMMONS issued as to American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 107 SUMMONS issued as to Secura Supreme Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 106 SUMMONS issued as to Unique Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 105 SUMMONS issued as to The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 104 SUMMONS issued as to Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 103 SUMMONS issued as to Universal Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 102 SUMMONS issued as to West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 101 SUMMONS issued as to Westfield Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 100 SUMMONS issued as to Kemper Independence Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 99 SUMMONS issued as to Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 98 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Insurance Corporation. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 97 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 96 SUMMONS issued as to LM Insurance Corporation. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 95 SUMMONS issued as to LM General Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 94 SUMMONS issued as to Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 93 SUMMONS issued as to Mid-Century Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 92 SUMMONS issued as to Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 91 SUMMONS issued as to Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 90 SUMMONS issued as to Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 89 SUMMONS issued as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 88 SUMMONS issued as to Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 87 SUMMONS issued as to Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 86 SUMMONS issued as to Property and Casualty Company of Hartford. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 85 SUMMONS issued as to Safe Auto Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 84 SUMMONS issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 83 SUMMONS issued as to Safeway Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 82 SUMMONS issued as to Illinois Farmers Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 81 SUMMONS issued as to Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 80 SUMMONS issued as to Horace Mann Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 79 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 78 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 77 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 76 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 75 SUMMONS issued as to Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 74 SUMMONS issued as to Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 73 SUMMONS issued as to Great Northern Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 72 SUMMONS issued as to Grange Indemnity Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 71 SUMMONS issued as to Government Employee's Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 70 SUMMONS issued as to Geico Indemnity Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 69 SUMMONS issued as to GEICO General Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 68 SUMMONS issued as to Geico Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 67 SUMMONS issued as to Founders Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 66 SUMMONS issued as to Farmers Automobile Management Corporation. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 65 SUMMONS issued as to First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 64 SUMMONS issued as to Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 63 SUMMONS issued as to Esurance Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 62 SUMMONS issued as to Erie Indemnity Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 61 SUMMONS issued as to Erie Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 60 SUMMONS issued as to Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 59 SUMMONS issued as to Encompass Property & Casualty Co. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 58 SUMMONS issued as to Delphi Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 57 SUMMONS issued as to Dairyland Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 56 SUMMONS issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 55 SUMMONS issued as to Country Preferred Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 54 SUMMONS issued as to Country Mutual Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 53 SUMMONS issued as to Country Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 52 SUMMONS issued as to Apollo Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 51 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 50 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century North American Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 49 SUMMONS issued as to Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 48 SUMMONS issued as to American Freedom Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 47 SUMMONS issued as to American Access Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 46 SUMMONS issued as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 45 SUMMONS issued as to Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 44 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Indemnity Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 43 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 42 SUMMONS issued as to Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 41 SUMMONS issued as to AIG Property Casualty Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 40 SUMMONS issued as to Affirmative Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 24, 2015 Filing 39 SUMMONS issued as to American Heartland Insurance Company. (MAL)
February 20, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
February 20, 2015 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Heartland Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Delphi Casualty Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Encompass Property & Casualty Co, Erie Indemnity Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Founders Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Caldwell, Lori)
February 20, 2015 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Erie Insurance Company. (Coburn, Joseph)
February 20, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Cutter on behalf of Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company (Cutter, David)
February 19, 2015 Filing 34 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/18/2015 by Knebel Autobody Center, Inc., Mitchell's Motors, Inc., Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc., Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc., Douglas Autobody, Inc., S. Danihel Collission, Inc., Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc. as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Fry, Allison)
February 19, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles I. Hadden on behalf of Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company (Hadden, Charles)
February 19, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by William James Kelly, III on behalf of Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company (Kelly, William)
February 19, 2015 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Notice of appearance, #20 Notice of appearance Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida identifying Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida.. (Burt, Franklin)
February 19, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Berlin on behalf of Erie Insurance Company (Berlin, Eric)
February 18, 2015 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Order by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company.. (Halavais, Jamie)
February 18, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Dan W. Goldfine, Joshua Grabel, Jamie L. Halavais, and Ian M. Fischer Appearance by Jamie L. Halavais on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company (Halavais, Jamie)
January 28, 2015 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Affirmative Insurance Company. (Seewald, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/29/2015 (JET).
January 28, 2015 Filing 26 APPEARANCE Randy R. Dow and of non-resident counsel Jeffrey R. Seewald and Anthony J. Rollo and designation of local counsel by Jeffrey R. Seewald on behalf of Affirmative Insurance Company. (Seewald, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/29/2015 (JET).
January 13, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Coburn on behalf of Erie Insurance Company (Coburn, Joseph)
January 13, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Anderson T. Bailey on behalf of Erie Insurance Company (Bailey, Anderson)
January 13, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Jones on behalf of Erie Insurance Company (Jones, James)
January 7, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carpenter on behalf of Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Carpenter, Michael)
December 30, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Todd Willis on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Willis, C.)
December 30, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin G. Burt on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Burt, Franklin)
December 23, 2014 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Notice (Other) by Grange Indemnity Insurance Company. (Ezzie, Joseph) Modified on 12/24/2014 (JET).
December 19, 2014 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Notice (Other) by Safeway Insurance Company. (Skambis, Christopher)
December 15, 2014 Filing 17 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Jeffery D. Ubersax on behalf of Erie Insurance Company. (Ubersax, Jeffery)
December 5, 2014 Filing 16 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Julia C. Webb on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Webb, Julia)
December 5, 2014 Filing 15 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Matthew T. Furton on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Furton, Matthew)
December 5, 2014 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Snider, Rowe)
December 5, 2014 Filing 13 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Rowe W. Snider on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Snider, Rowe)
December 5, 2014 Filing 12 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 6:14-md-2557-Orl-31TBS receipt of original record from the District of Northern District of Illinois, case number: 1:14-cv-8921. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:14-cv-6011-Orl-31TBS. (LAM)
December 4, 2014 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:14-cv-08921. File received electronically
December 4, 2014 Filing 10 TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division the electronic record. (as, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] Modified on 12/9/2014 (IGC).
December 2, 2014 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division.(as, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Motion hearing held. The Court was advised that the MDL Panel has granted a Conditional Transfer Order. Motion to stay #6 is stricken as moot. Status hearing set for 01/28/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 21, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Lee McCluggage for presentment of motion to stay#6 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 21, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 21, 2014 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Brent R. Austin (Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 21, 2014 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Michael Lee McCluggage (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 6, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. dba Broadway Collission Center, Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc., Knebel Autobody Center, Inc. by Elaine Ryan (Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Knebel Autobody Center, Inc., Mitchell's Motors, Inc., Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. dba Broadway Collission Center, Douglas Autobody, Inc., S. Danihel Collission, Inc., Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10039811. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. et al v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affirmative Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Seewald
Represented By: Anthony J. Rollo
Represented By: Randy R. Dow
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Franklin G. Burt
Represented By: C. Todd Willis
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Represented By: David Frederick Cutter
Represented By: Charles I. Hadden
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee's Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marjorie M. Salazar
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Property & Casualty Co
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property and Casualty Company of Hartford
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph E. Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delphi Casualty Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: William M. Hannay
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Represented By: David Frederick Cutter
Represented By: Charles I. Hadden
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heartland Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Casualty Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Sean McCarthy
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Represented By: Sarah Jenkins
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Casualty Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Founders Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Charles Skambis, Jr.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Mann Insurance Company
Represented By: Marjorie M. Salazar
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Supreme Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew T. Furton
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Automobile Management Corporation
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Indemnity Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois)
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century North American Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairyland Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Keenan Cottrell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Freedom Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: James Michael Jones
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Jeffery D. Ubersax
Represented By: Anderson T. Bailey
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Eric P. Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Access Casualty Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Represented By: David Frederick Cutter
Represented By: Charles I. Hadden
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Julius F. Parker, III
Represented By: Kathy J. Maus
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Represented By: Jason B. Bonk
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Danihel Collission, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knebel Autobody Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Autobody, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Auto Body, Inc.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell's Motors, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. doing business as Broadway Collision Center
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?