Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. v. State Farm Indemnity Company, et al
Plaintiff: Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc.
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, State Farm Indemnity Company, 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, American Family Home Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Hanover Insurance Company, United Services Auto Association, 21st Century Pinnacle Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company, Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation and Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 6:2014cv06012
Filed: December 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER for the parties to confer and advise the Court by July 10, 2020, how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/24/2020. (LAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 78 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 74 MANDATE of USCA as to #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 03/12/19 USCA number: 15-14160. AFFIRMED in part; VACATED in part; and REMANDED. (JP)
March 4, 2019 Filing 73 EN BANC OPINION of USCA as to #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc.. EOD: 03/04/19; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 15-14160. AFFIRMED in part/ VACATED in part and REMANDED. (JP)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 13, 2017 Filing 71 OPINION/ORDER of USCA as to #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. EOD: 9/7/2017; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 15-14160. REVERSED AND REMANDED. (JEV)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
May 11, 2016 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 15-14160-AA, 15-14162-AA, 15-14178-AA, 15-14179-AA, 15-14180-AA. (JEV)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER of USCA Reinstating #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc.. EOD: 4/5/16; USCA number: 15-14160-AA,15-14162-AA, 15-14178-AA,15-14179-AA,15-14180-AA. (RDO) Modified on 4/6/2016 (RDO).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ENDORSED ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to refile its Motion for Attorney's Fees until 30 days after the later of the resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate or the resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/7/2016. (TKW)
March 4, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Refile Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan) Text modified on 3/7/2016 (RDO).
February 16, 2016 Filing 64 MANDATE of USCA (Order of Dismissal issued as Mandate) as to #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 2/9/16. USCA number: 15-14160-AA. (JET)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying without prejudice #59 Motion for Attorney Fees, directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/22/2015. (ED)
October 20, 2015 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. re #56 Notice of appeal, #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. USCA number: 15-14160. (Fry, Allison)
October 7, 2015 Set deadline as to #59 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 11/3/2015 (MAL)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 6, 2015 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL047689 re #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. (IGC) Copy of Nef showing appeal fee paid submitted to USCA
September 30, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Goldfine, Dan)
September 17, 2015 Filing 58 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (IGC)
September 17, 2015 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #57 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. (IGC)
September 16, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #54 Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. Filing fee paid. (IGC) Modified on 10/7/2015 (IGC).
September 16, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #54 Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. Filing fee paid. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 9/17/2015 (IGC). (#56 termed and redocketed at #57)(GJS). Modified on 10/8/2015 (IGC).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 17, 2015 Set deadline: Amended complaint due by 9/8/2015 (MAL)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #36 motion to dismiss; granting #37 motion to dismiss; terminating #43 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 31, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel (Grabel, Joshua)
July 16, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE to objections to #43 Report and Recommendations filed by 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Pinnacle Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Auto Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Michael)
July 16, 2015 Filing 51 RESPONSE to objections to #43 Report and Recommendations GEICO's Response to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Objection to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation filed by Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael J. Kurtis terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/15/2015. (Smith, Thomas)
July 14, 2015 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENT re #48 MOTION for Michael J. Kurtis to withdraw as attorney Certificate of Service by Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company. (Nelson, Michael)
July 14, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION for Michael J. Kurtis to withdraw as attorney by Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company. (Nelson, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 29, 2015 Filing 47 OMNIBUS OBJECTION by various plaintiffs re #43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (MAL). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Set deadline: Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2015 (MAL)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 3, 2015 Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW)
April 20, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company (Oates, Claire)
March 17, 2015 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
March 17, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Pinnacle Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Auto Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ultimate Collision Repair, Inc. Reply)(Nelson, Michael)
March 10, 2015 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc.. (Fry, Allison)
March 9, 2015 Set deadlines as to #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 3/13/2015 by Plaintiffs. (IGC)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting (153) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/6/2015. (SMW)
February 20, 2015 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Pinnacle Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Auto Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Moving Defendants)(Nelson, Michael)
February 19, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
February 19, 2015 Filing 35 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/18/2015 by Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Auto Association. (Fry, Allison)
February 19, 2015 Filing 34 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Freedom Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance Company.. (Nelson, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company.. (Halavais, Jamie)
February 18, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance of Dan W. Goldfine, Joshua Grabel, Jamie L. Halavais, and Ian M. Fischer Appearance by Jamie L. Halavais on behalf of Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company (Halavais, Jamie)
January 7, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carpenter on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Carpenter, Michael)
December 22, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS issued as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 29 SUMMONS issued as to Hanover Insurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 28 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to United Services Auto Association. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century Pinnacle Insurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS issued as to American Family Home Insurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 24 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century Assurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 23 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company. (LAK)
December 22, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS issued as to State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to Progressive Freedom Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Geico Casualty Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Geico Indemnity Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS issued as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Government Employee's Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Progressive Garden State Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Insurance Corporation. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to LM Insurance Corporation. (IGC)
December 22, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (RDO)
December 22, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company. (IGC)
December 5, 2014 Filing 8 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 6:14-md-2557-Orl-31TBS receipt of original record from the District of District of New Jersey, case number: 2:14-cv-7002-SRC-CLW. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS. (LAM)
December 4, 2014 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:14-cv-07002. File received electronically
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Middle District of Florida. (jl, ) [Transferred from njd on 12/4/2014.]
November 25, 2014 Set Deadlines as to 5 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the JPML. Motion set for 1/5/2015 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gmd, ) [Transferred from njd on 12/4/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. KURTIS on behalf of PROGRESSIVE FREEDOM INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (KURTIS, MICHAEL) [Transferred from njd on 12/4/2014.]
November 12, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 21ST CENTURY ASSURANCE COMPANY, 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, 21ST CENTURY PINNACLE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALL STATE NEW JERSEY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE FREEDOM INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED SERVICES AUTO ASSOCIATION, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *STEPHEN BOND* (seb) [Transferred from njd on 12/4/2014.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUALITY AUTO PAINTING CENTER OF ROSELLE, INC., TRADED AS PRESTIGE AUTO BODY identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 12/4/2014.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 21ST CENTURY ASSURANCE COMPANY, 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, 21ST CENTURY PINNACLE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALL STATE NEW JERSEY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE FREEDOM INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED SERVICES AUTO ASSOCIATION, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6038556) with JURY DEMAND, filed by QUALITY AUTO PAINTING CENTER OF ROSELLE, INC., TRADED AS PRESTIGE AUTO BODY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(seb) [Transferred from njd on 12/4/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc. v. State Farm Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee's Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Indemnity Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Assurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Marjorie M. Salazar
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Auto Association
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Pinnacle Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Garden State Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael J. Kurtis
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Freedom Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael J. Kurtis
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Auto Painting Center of Roselle, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Joshua S. Bauchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?