Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. and K & M Collision, LLC
Defendant: Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Esurance Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, AMCO Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Geico Indemnity Company, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, 21st Century Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, State Farm Indemnity Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive American Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, Progressive West Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Coast National Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2014cv06016
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 294 JUDGMENT that the Plaintiffs take nothing on their claims against the Defendants and judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiffs. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MAA)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER directing Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/24/2020. (LAM)
January 21, 2020 Filing 292 MANDATE of USCA as to #282 Notice of appeal filed by K & M Collision, LLC, Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 01/21/2020 USCA number: 17-12583. AFFIRMED. (ALL)
December 26, 2019 Filing 291 OPINION of USCA as to #282 Notice of appeal filed by K & M Collision, LLC, Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. EOD: 12/20/2019; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 17-12583. AFFIRMED. (ALL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 290 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
February 9, 2018 Filing 286 MANDATE of USCA as to #282 Notice of appeal filed by K & M Collision, LLC, Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 2/8/2018 USCA number: 17-12583-CC. ENTRY OF DISMISSAL. (LMM)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 7, 2017 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #282 Notice of appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 17-12583-CC (JEV)
July 10, 2017 Filing 284 NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Suzanne L. Trimble re: #282 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 17-12583-C. (SLT)
June 27, 2017 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL-064762 re #282 Notice of appeal filed by K & M Collision, LLC, Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. (JEV)
June 27, 2017 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding notification of fee payment re #282 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 17-12583. (JEV)
June 8, 2017 Filing 283 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #282 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JEV)
June 7, 2017 Filing 282 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #278 Order on motion to dismissOrder on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #275 Order, #274 Order by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. Filing fee not paid. (Bloch, Steven)
May 19, 2017 Filing 281 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble. (SLT)
May 19, 2017 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Docs. 209, 210, 211, 237) held on 4/26/17 before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Court Reporter Suzanne L. Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 6/9/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017. (SLT)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ENDORSED ORDER. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/9/2017. Copies mailed. (LAM)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #209 motion to dismiss; granting #210 motion to dismiss; granting #211 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/8/2017. (ED)
April 26, 2017 Filing 277 Minute Entry for motion proceedings held before Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/26/2017 re Docs. #209, #210, #211, and #237. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble. (LAM) Modified on 4/27/2017 to attach attorney list (LAM).
April 26, 2017 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Blaise Desanto on behalf of Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. (Desanto, Mark)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER OVERRULING #237 MOTION for Reconsideration/Objection and OVERRULING #246 Objection. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/21/2017. (TKW)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER re #239 Response #236 Objection that Defendants' objections are SUSTAINED. The Court will not consider these exhibits in connection with the pending Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/21/2017. (TKW)
April 20, 2017 Filing 273 RESPONSE re #251 Notice of filing supplemental authority by Defendants filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Bloch, Steven)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ENDORSED ORDER vacating 268 Order re #246 Objection, #236 Objection that the parties are to respond by April 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/17/2017. (TKW)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #223 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/17/2017. (Presnell, Gregory)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ENDORSED ORDER granting #249 Motion. Argument is scheduled on April 26,2017. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/17/2017. (Presnell, Gregory)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #261 Motion. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/17/2017. (Presnell, Gregory)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 (VACATED PER ENDORSED ORDER 272)ENDORSED ORDER re #246 Objection, #236 Objection that the parties are to respond by April 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/13/2017. (TKW) Modified on 4/18/2017 (RMF).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ENDORSED ORDER granting #252 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Response (3 page limit) is due 4/20/17. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/13/2017. (TKW)
April 12, 2017 Filing 266 NOTICE by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC of Additional Motions and Matters To Be Heard at the Hearing (Bloch, Steven)
April 6, 2017 Filing 265 NOTICE of supplemental authority by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eleventh Circuit Opinion)(Yohai, David)
April 5, 2017 Filing 264 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Ninety minutes are reserved for the hearing scheduled 4/26/2017. Copies mailed. (LAM) Modified on 4/5/2017 to correct the hearing date. NEF regenerated (LAM).
April 4, 2017 Filing 263 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #223 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #237 MOTION for Reconsideration, #209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #249 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Oral Argument , #261 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Status Conference and Oral Argument , #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. THE PARTIES ARE TO ADVISE THE COURT BY 4/14/17 IF THERE ARE ANY ADDITIONAL MOTIONS THEY WISH TO BE HEARD AT THIS HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (TKW)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to reinstate all pending motions that were terminated at the time this case was closed on 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/3/2017. (TKW)
March 31, 2017 Filing 261 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Status Conference and Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Withdraw as liaison counsel for Plaintiffs. Mark L. Shurtleff is no longer liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/1/2017. (Smith, Thomas)
February 23, 2017 Filing 259 MOTION to Withdraw #258 Order on motion to appoint counsel PlaintiffS Liaison by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Shurtleff, Mark)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ENDORSED ORDER granting #256 Motion for Reconsideration and VACATING #255 Order administratively closing case. The Clerk is directed to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/25/2017. (TKW)
January 19, 2017 Filing 256 MOTION for Reconsideration re #255 Order administratively closing case by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER STAYING and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/22/16. (RDO)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 12, 2016 Filing 253 RESPONSE re #246 Objection To Magistrate Judge Smith's Order dated August 10, 2016 Denying Reconsideration of the Order at Docket Entry 234 filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard)
September 9, 2016 Filing 252 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Response to Defendants' #251 Notice of Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven) Linked to Notice on 9/12/2016 (RDO).
September 8, 2016 Filing 251 NOTICE of supplemental authority by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard)
September 2, 2016 Filing 250 RESPONSE to Motion re #249 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Oral Argument filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard)
August 30, 2016 Filing 249 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven)
August 30, 2016 Filing 248 RESPONSE to #243 Notice of filing supplemental authority filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 8/31/2016 (RDO).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ENDORSED ORDER granting #245 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/25/2016. (ED)
August 24, 2016 Filing 246 OBJECTION re #244 Order Denying Reconsideration . (Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 8/25/2016 (RDO).
August 12, 2016 Filing 245 MOTION for leave to file Response to Defendants' #243 Notice of Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 8/15/2016 (RDO).
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER on Motion for Reconsideration contained in docket entry 237. This Order does not dispose of the objections contained in the same motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/10/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
August 8, 2016 Filing 243 NOTICE of supplemental authority by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard)
July 13, 2016 Filing 242 CORRECTED REPLY in support of #237 OBJECTION to, or, alternatively MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 7/14/2016 (RDO).
July 13, 2016 Filing 241 REPLY in support of #237 OBJECTION to, or, alternatively MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 7/14/2016 (RDO).
July 6, 2016 Filing 240 RESPONSE to Objection to #237 Motion for Reconsideration filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard) Modified on 7/7/2016 (RDO).
July 6, 2016 Filing 239 REPLY in support of #236 Objection filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Carpenter, Michael) Modified on 7/6/2016 (LMM). Modified on 7/7/2016 (RDO).
June 29, 2016 Filing 238 RESPONSE and MEMORANDUM in opposition re #236 Objection to Exhibit A filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 6/30/2016 (RDO).
June 20, 2016 Filing 237 OBJECTION re #234 Order on Motion to Strike or, alternatively, Motion for Reconsideration. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 6/21/2016 (RDO).
June 16, 2016 Filing 236 OBJECTION to Exhibit A attached to #235 Sur-Reply/Response to Motions to Dismiss . (Carpenter, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2016 (RDO).
June 13, 2016 Filing 235 RESPONSE to Reply Briefs filed in support of #209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and #210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 6/14/2016 (RDO).
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #225 Motion to Strike exhibits to response to motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/6/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
June 2, 2016 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Newton on behalf of Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company (Newton, Emily)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ENDORSED ORDER granting #230 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/1/2016. (ED)
May 31, 2016 Filing 230 MOTION for leave to file Consolidated Response to Defendants' Replies by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven)
May 30, 2016 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 Joint MOTION to Strike #216 Brief - Plaintiff Exhibits B,C, D, E-1 to E-7, F and G in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bloch, Steven)
May 16, 2016 Filing 228 AMENDED REPLY in support of #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [Amended Reply to Include Certificate of Service] filed by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna) Text modified on 5/17/2016 (RDO).
May 16, 2016 Filing 227 REPLY in support of #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna) Text modified on 5/17/2016 (RDO).
May 16, 2016 Filing 226 REPLY in support of #210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Text modified on 5/17/2016 (RDO).
May 16, 2016 Filing 225 MOTION to Strike Exhibits filed in support of #216 Motion to Dismiss by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Text modified on 5/17/2016 (RDO).
May 16, 2016 Filing 224 REPLY Memorandum in support of #209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Fenton, Richard) Text modified on 5/17/2016 (RDO).
May 11, 2016 Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Certain Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Caldwell, Lori)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ENDORSED ORDER granting #220 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/11/2016. (ED)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ENDORSED ORDER granting #219 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/11/2016. (ED)
May 10, 2016 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in support of its #21 Motion to Dismiss by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 5/11/2016 (RDO).
May 10, 2016 Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply in Support of #211 Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna) Modified on 5/11/2016 (RDO).
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ENDORSED ORDER granting #217 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/14/2016. (ED)
April 13, 2016 Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven)
April 13, 2016 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in opposition to #209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Brief in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E1, #6 Exhibit E2, #7 Exhibit E3, #8 Exhibit E4, #9 Exhibit E5, #10 Exhibit E6, #11 Exhibit E7, #12 Exhibit F)(Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 4/14/2016 (RDO).
April 7, 2016 Set/reset deadlines as to #210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/13/2016, Replies due by 5/16/2016. (MAA)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ENDORSED ORDER granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/7/2016. (ED)
April 6, 2016 Filing 214 AGREED FINAL MOTION to Extend Time on the Briefing of Defendant's Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B) Motions addressing Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 4/7/2016 (RDO).
April 4, 2016 Set/reset deadlines as to #210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/6/2016 (RDO)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ENDORSED ORDER granting #212 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/1/2016. (ED)
March 30, 2016 Filing 212 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File on the Briefing of Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B) Motions Addressing Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven) Text modified on 3/31/2016 (RDO).
February 15, 2016 Filing 211 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
February 15, 2016 Filing 210 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Halavais, Jamie)
February 15, 2016 Filing 209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint - List of Defendants)(Caldwell, Lori)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ENDORSED ORDER granting #207 Motion to extend time. The parties shall comply with the proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/15/2016. (Presnell, Gregory)
January 14, 2016 Filing 207 AGREED MOTION to extend time on the Briefing of Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motions Addressing Plaintiffs' #205 Second Amended Class Action Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 1/15/2016 (IGC).
January 11, 2016 Filing 206 SUPPLEMENT re #205 Second Amended Complaint (correcting certain exhibit PDFs) by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit G, #2 Corrected Exhibit H, #3 Corrected Exhibit I, #4 Corrected Exhibit J)(Bloch, Steven) Modified on 1/11/2016 (JET).
January 8, 2016 Filing 205 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F - Part 1, #7 Exhibit F - Part 2, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Bloch, Steven) Modified on 1/11/2016 (JET). EXHIBITS G,H,I AND J HAVE BEEN REFILED AS SUPPLEMENT AT #206 AS THE PDF FILE WAS CORRUPTED.
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ENDORSED ORDER granting #202 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Deadline for amended pleading extended to January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/1/2015. (ED)
December 1, 2015 Set deadlines: Amended complaint due by 1/8/2016 (IGC)
November 30, 2015 Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time through and including 1/8/16 to Amend Class Action Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 11/30/2015 (IGC).
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #157 motion to dismiss; granting #158 motion to dismiss; granting #159 motion to dismiss; denying as moot #190 Motion for oral argument; denying as moot #199 Motion for oral argument. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/25/2015. (ED)
November 25, 2015 Set deadlines: Amended complaint due by 12/15/2015 re #201 Order. (IGC)
October 23, 2015 Filing 200 RESPONSE re #199 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Conference before Judge Gregory A. Presnell filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Clark, Johanna)
October 19, 2015 Filing 199 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Request for Conference before Judge Gregory A. Presnell by All Plaintiffs. (Bloch, Steven)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying as moot motions to dismiss #114, #118, and #121. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed.(LAM)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting (220) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian J. D'Amico terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and Related Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS, 6:14-cv-06016-GAP-TBS(Smith, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel and Dan W. Goldfine. (Grabel, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2015 (IGC).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
May 15, 2015 Filing 190 Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically for oral argument re #158 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(B), 12(B)(1), and 12(B)(6) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support, #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint , #159 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna) Modified on 5/18/2015 (MAL).
May 13, 2015 Filing 189 REPLY to Response to Motion re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
May 13, 2015 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM in support re #158 Motion to dismiss filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Caldwell, Lori)
May 13, 2015 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENDORSED ORDER granting #185 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/11/2015. (ED)
May 7, 2015 Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Replies in Support of Motions to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
April 24, 2015 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #158 Motion to dismiss, #157 Motion to dismiss, #159 Motion to dismiss filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Bloch, Steven)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ENDORSED ORDER granting #181 Motion to extend time. Deadline to respond to motion to dismiss extended to April 24, 2015; deadline for reply extended to May 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/20/2015. (ED)
April 20, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company (Oates, Claire)
April 20, 2015 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to April 24, 2015 on the Briefing of Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B) Motions Addressing Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., K & M Collision, LLC. (Bloch, Steven)
February 23, 2015 Filing 180 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS. (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 179 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 178 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 177 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS. (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 176 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 175 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS. (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 174 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 173 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ENDORSED ORDER granting #153 Motion to extend time. Briefing schedule and page limits approved as requested in motion. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/23/2015. (ED)
February 23, 2015 Filing 171 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 170 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 169 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 168 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS. (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 167 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 166 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 165 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 164 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 163 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS. (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 162 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO WRONG CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 161 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO INCORRECT CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 160 ENTERED IN ERROR DUE TO INCORRECT CASE # ON SUMMONS (MAL) Modified on 2/23/2015 (MAL).
February 20, 2015 Filing 159 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
February 20, 2015 Filing 158 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(B), 12(B)(1), and 12(B)(6) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (Caldwell, Lori)
February 20, 2015 Filing 157 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Clark, Johanna)
February 19, 2015 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #146 Order by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Halavais, Jamie) Modified on 5/12/2015 (JET).
February 19, 2015 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange. (Yohai, David)
February 18, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Matthew Fischer on behalf of GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company (Fischer, Ian)
February 16, 2015 Filing 153 MOTION to extend time to April 21, 2015 on the Briefing of Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motions Addressing Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Bloch, Steven)
January 22, 2015 Reset deadlines: for All Defendants. Answer due by 2/20/2015. (IGC)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER setting new deadline to respond to amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/21/2015. (Smith, Thomas)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint. Defendants have until 21 days after Court rules on motions to dismiss already argued or 2/20/2015, whichever date is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/12/2015. (Smith, Thomas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 Amended Complaint Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Class Action Complaint in Transferred Action by All Defendants. (Clark, Johanna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
December 19, 2014 Filing 149 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 6:14-md-2557-Orl-31TBS Receipt of original record from the District of Northern District of Illinois, case number: 1:14-cv-3146. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:14-cv-6016-Orl-31TBS. Copies mailed. (LAM)
December 17, 2014 Filing 148 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:14-cv-03146. File received electronically
December 16, 2014 Filing 147 TRANSFERRED Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division the electronic file. Paper documents (entry #132) sent via certified mail number 7006 0100 0001 7313 7451. (rm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2014: #1 Instructions) (rm, ).[Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 146 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel Transferring case to Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division. (rm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
December 16, 2014 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2257 Conditional Transfer Order Filed on 12/16/2014. (rm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff having filed an amended complaint, defendants' motions to dismiss #114#118are moot.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
September 11, 2014 Filing 144 STIPULATED Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/11/2014:Mailed notice(rth, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
September 11, 2014 Filing 143 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint and to name additional plaintiff #135 is granted. Enter Stipulated Order.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 142 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 141 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 140 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 139 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 138 AMENDED complaint Corrected by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Sprengel, Jennifer)[Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.] Modified on 12/17/2014 (LAK).
August 26, 2014 Filing 137 AMENDED complaint by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Sprengel, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 26, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Winter Sprengel for presentment of motion for leave to file, #135 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/10/2014 at 08:45 AM. (Sprengel, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 26, 2014 Filing 135 MOTION by Plaintiff Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. for leave to file the Amended Complaint and to Name Additional Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion (Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Amended complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Amended complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Amended Complaint)(Sprengel, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
August 22, 2014 Filing 134 Notice of Change of Firm Name by Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company (Kochis, Kymberly) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 29, 2014 Filing 133 SUBMISSION of Supplemental Information by Allstate Defendants' regarding Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (Exhibits). (rm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 131 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/21/2014.(jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 130 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. by John W. Barrett (Barrett, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 132 SUPPLEMENTAL Submission to the record by the Allstate Defendants, The Farmers Defendants, and the State Farm Defendants (Exhibits) (Poor Quality-original on file). (rm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: MOTION of Attorney Joshua Grabel for leave to appear pro hac vice #127 on behalf of GEICO defendants is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/10/2014. (jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 10, 2014 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 7/10/2014. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #114, #118, #121 are taken under advisement; responses due by 8/26/2014; replies due by 9/25/2014; rulings will be by mail. Defendants' Motions for leave to file memoranda of law in excess of 15 pages #112, #119, #123 are granted. By agreement, discovery ordered stayed pending disposition of Motions to Dismiss. Parties are to contact the Court following ruling on motions pending before JPML. If this case is not selected for MDL treatment or if an MDL is created in this district, the Court will set this matter of status promptly after JPML issues its ruling. MOTION of Attorney David F. Sorensen for leave to appear pro hac vice #125 on behalf of Plaintiff Crawford's Auto Center, Inc., is granted. MOTION of Attorney Joshua Grabel for leave to appear pro hac vice #127 on behalf of GEICO defendants is granted. Mailed notice (tbk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9649923. (Grabel, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 126 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company (Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9647033. (Sorensen, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Lee McCluggage for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #123 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/10/2014 at 01:30 PM. (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION by Defendants State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Lee McCluggage for presentment of motion to dismiss, #121 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/10/2014 at 01:30 PM. (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION by Defendants State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company to dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Lee Fenton for presentment of motion to dismiss,,,,,,,,,,, #118, motion for leave to file excess pages,,,,,,,,,,, #119 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/10/2014 at 01:30 PM. (Fenton, Richard) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION by Defendants 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Liberty Mutual Insuance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fenton, Richard) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION by Defendants Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Encompass Indemnity Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, The Progressive Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insuance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., 21st Century Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Allstate Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fenton, Richard) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 117 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Motion by John Thomas Williams for presentment of motion to dismiss, #114 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/10/2014 at 01:30 PM. (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company in support of motion to dismiss, #114 (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 114 MOTION by Defendants GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company to dismiss (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by John Thomas Williams for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #112 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/10/2014 at 01:30 PM. (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 112 MOTION by Defendants GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company for leave to file excess pages (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 111 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company by Jason H. Nash (Nash, Jason) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 110 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company by John Thomas Williams (Williams, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 109 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company,The Progressive Corporation, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company by Jeffrey S. Cashdan (Cashdan, Jeffrey) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTIONS #105 and #106 to appear pro hac vice #105 are granted. Mailed notice (tbk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Filing 107 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. by Steven L Bloch (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 24, 2014 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9606896. (Goldfine, Dan) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 24, 2014 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9606747. (Halavais, Jamie) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 24, 2014 Filing 104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation,United Financial Casualty Company by Christine A Hopkinson (Hopkinson, Christine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 20, 2014 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial Status hearing is set for 7/10/2014 at 1:30p.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report at least two days prior to set status. (See Judges web page for status report). Mailed notice (tbk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 19, 2014 Filing 102 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company by Michael Richard Nelson (Nelson, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 19, 2014 Filing 101 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company by Kymberly Kochis (Kochis, Kymberly) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 19, 2014 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Application to appear pro hac vice #73 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #74 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #90 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #91 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #92 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #96 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #97 is granted; Application to appear pro hac vice #98 is granted. Mailed notice (tbk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 99 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange (Harris, Katherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9591773. (Yohai, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9591740. (Mastando, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9591690. (Hochstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 95 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange by Brian Ignatius Hays (Hays, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 94 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange by Randall Allan Hack (Hack, Randall) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 93 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange by Katherine Heid Harris (Harris, Katherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9589944. Application of Tiffany Powers (Attachments: #1 Supplement A Listing Entities Represented, #2 Supplement B Listing Bars of Admission)(Powers, Tiffany) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9589899. Application of Michael Kenny (Attachments: #1 Supplement A Listing Entities Represented, #2 Supplement B Listing Bars of Admission)(Kenny, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 18, 2014 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9589842. Application of Elizabeth Helmer (Attachments: #1 Supplement A Listing Entities Represented, #2 Supplement B Listing Bars of Admission)(Helmer, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 89 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 88 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Safeco Insurance Company of America and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 87 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Peerless Insurance Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 86 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LM General Insurance Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 85 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liberty Mutual Insuance Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 84 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 83 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 82 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 81 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 80 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 79 DESIGNATION of Local Counsel for Nonresident Attorneys Michael E. Mumford, Joseph E. Ezzie and Trischa Snyder Chapman. (Ezzie, Joseph) (Docket text modified by Clerk's office ) (vcf, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 78 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Liberty Mutual Insuance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation by Joseph E Ezzie (Ezzie, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 77 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Liberty Mutual Insuance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation by Trischa Snyder Chapman (Chapman, Trischa) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 76 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Liberty Mutual Insuance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation by Michael E. Mumford (Mumford, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 75 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America by William Kevin Kane (Kane, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9582407. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Additional entities, #2 Attachment B - Additional Bar Admissions)(Nelson, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9581856. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Additional entities)(Kochis, Kym) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 72 (CORRECTED) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) Modified on 6/16/2014 (mjc, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: MOTION of Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson for leave to appear pro hac vice #66 on behalf of The Progressive Corporation and others is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/13/2014. Mailed notice (ao,) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 13, 2014 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company by Elizabeth Gwynn Doolin (Doolin, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 13, 2014 Filing 69 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company (Galibois, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 13, 2014 Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation, United Financial Casualty Company by Michael Brian Galibois (Galibois, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: MOTION by Attorney Michael H. Carpenter for leave to appear pro hac vice #62 on behalf of Nationwide defendants is granted. MOTION by Attorney Peter T. Snow for leave to appear pro hac vice #63 on behalf of Nationwide defendants is granted. MOTION by Attorney Michael N. Beekhuizen for leave to appear pro hac vice #64 on behalf of Nationwide defendants is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/12/2014. Mailed notice (td, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 12, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9573438. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment A, #2 Supplement Attachment B, #3 Supplement Attachment C)(Hopkinson, Christine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 12, 2014 Filing 65 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $50.00, receipt no. 0752-9566563, regarding motion to appear pro hac vice#62 Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, et al. (Carpenter, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9569798. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beekhuizen, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9566644. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snow, Peter) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9566615. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carpenter, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' Motions for extension of time #56 #59 to answer or otherwise plead, to and including 6/27/2014, are granted. Notice of Motion date of 6/10/2014 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 4, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Brent R. Austin for presentment of extension of time, #59 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/10/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 4, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION by Defendants State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond (unopposed) (Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 4, 2014 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Josh Goldberg (Goldberg, Josh) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Motion by Mark L. Hanover for presentment of extension of time, #56 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/10/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Hanover, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION by Defendants Allstate Corporation, Esurance Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Government Employees Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation for extension of time Unopposed Motion (Hanover, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company by Brent R. Austin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 54 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company by Michael Lee McCluggage (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Liberty Mutual Insuance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation by William Kevin Kane (Kane, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Richard Lee Fenton (Fenton, Richard) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 3, 2014 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Mark L. Hanover (Hanover, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to GEICO Advantage Insurance Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Government Employees Insurance Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to GEICO Indemnity Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to GEICO General Insurance Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to GEICO Choice Insurance Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to GEICO Casualty Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Truck Insurance Exchange on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to The Progressive Corporation on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to State Farm Indemnity Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to State Farm General Insurance Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Progressive Specialty Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Progressive Northern Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Progressive Direct Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Progressive Casualty Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Nationwide Insurance Company of America on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America on 5/21/2014, answer due 6/11/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Mid-Century Insurance Company on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Illinois Farmers Insurance Company on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Farmers Insurance Exchange on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to AMCO Insurance Company on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allstate New Jersey Insurance on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allstate Insurance Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allstate Indemnity Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allstate Corporation on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to The First Liberty Insurance Corporation on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas on 5/16/2014, answer due 6/6/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Insuance Company on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc. on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company on 5/15/2014, answer due 6/5/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. as to 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company on 5/15/2014, answer due 6/5/2014. (Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AMCO Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Esurance Insurance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Corporation, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Holding Co., Inc., Liberty Mutual Insuance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insutance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Progressive Corporation, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Financial Casualty Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Insurance Company, Progressive Michigan Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance of IL, Progressive Security Insurance Company. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 8, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Choice Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Garden State Insurance. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: MOTION of Attorney Steven L. Bloch for leave to appear pro hac vice #3 on behalf of Plaintiff is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/5/2014. Mailed notice(mr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
May 2, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9447518. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Additional Courts)(Bloch, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
April 30, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sprengel, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]
April 30, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9441017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 2, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 3, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D - Part 1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D - Part 2)(Sprengel, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/17/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford's Auto Center, Inc. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Premier Insurance of IL
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Washington
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate New Jersey Insurance
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Michigan Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Classic Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee's Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Progressive Corporation
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Indemnity Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Garden State Insurance
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive West Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Texas
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Marathon Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast National Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Josh Goldberg
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Secure Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jason H. Nash
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol West Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artisan & Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Randall Allan Hack
Represented By: Katherine Heid Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crawford's Auto Center, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Patricia M. Kipnis
Represented By: Mark Blaise Desanto
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Jennifer Winter Sprengel
Represented By: David F. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K & M Collision, LLC
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Jennifer Winter Sprengel
Represented By: David F. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?