Federal Trade Commission et al v. All Us Marketing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs
Defendant: All Us Marketing LLC, Global Marketing Enterprises Inc., Global One Financial Services LLC, Your #1 Savings LLC, Ovadaa LLC, Royal Holdings of America LLC, Gary Rodriguez, Marbel Rodriguez, Carmen Williams, Jonathan Paulino, Fariborz Fard, Shirin Imani and Alex Serna
Receiver: Mark J. Bernet
Case Number: 6:2015cv01016
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER adopting in part 168 Report and Recommendation and granting 166 Second Renewed Motion for Default Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Relief Against Defendants Christian Serna, All Us Marketing LLC, and GRR Financial Services LLC. Court will enter a default judgment and permanent injunction in a separate document. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/22/2017. (EK)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS FAIRIBORZ FARD, SHIRIN IMANI, AND GLOBAL MARKETING ENTERPRISES, INC. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/1/2016. (EK)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS CARMEN WILLIAMS AND OVADAA LLC re 129 Motion. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/8/2016. (EK)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as to Defendants Kimberly Coarse, Auto Guardian USA, LLC, and Premier Marketing International, LLC. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/3/2015. (EK)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as to Defendant All Us Marketing LLC; granting 50 Motion for Entry of Proposed Preliminary Injunctions as to this Defendant; and appointing Mark Bernet as Permanent Equity Receiver for All Us Marketing LLC. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/7/2015. (EK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. All Us Marketing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: James H. Davis
Represented By: John Hallerud
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs
Represented By: Denise Kim Beamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Us Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Marketing Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global One Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Your #1 Savings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovadaa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Holdings of America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rodriguez
Represented By: George Paul Chandler, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Sadaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marbel Rodriguez
Represented By: George Paul Chandler, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Sadaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Paulino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fariborz Fard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirin Imani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Mark J. Bernet
Represented By: Mark James Bernet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?