Concord Auto Body, Inc v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Concord Auto Body, Inc
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Geico Indemnity Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Cornerstone National Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Allstate Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Case Number: 6:2015cv06022
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER for the parties to confer and advise the Court by July 10, 2020, how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/24/2020. (LAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 102 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 98 MANDATE of USCA as to #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc Issued as Mandate: 03/12/19 USCA number: 15-14180. AFFIRMED in part; VACATED in part; and REMANDED in part. (JP)
March 4, 2019 Filing 97 EN BANC OPINION of USCA as to #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. EOD: 03/04/19; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 15-14180. AFFIRMED in part/ VACATED in part and REMANDED. (JP)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 13, 2017 Filing 95 OPINION/ORDER of USCA as to #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. EOD: 9/7/2017; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 15-14180. REVERSED AND REMANDED. (JEV)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER of USCA reinstating #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. EOD: 4/5/16; USCA number: 15-14180-AA. (RDO)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ENDORSED ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to refile its Motion for Attorney's Fees until 30 days after the later of the resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate or the resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/7/2016. (TKW)
March 4, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to Refile Motion for Attoreys' Fees by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 3/7/2016 (RDO).
February 16, 2016 Filing 88 MANDATE of USCA (Order of Dismissal issued as Mandate) as to #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc Issued as Mandate: 2/9/16. USCA number: 15-14180-AA. (JET)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying without prejudice #82 Motion for Attorney Fees, directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/22/2015. (ED)
October 20, 2015 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc re #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #79 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 15-14180. (Fry, Allison)
October 7, 2015 Set deadline as to #82 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 11/3/2015 (MAL)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 6, 2015 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL047696 re #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc (IGC) Copy of Nef showing appeal fee paid mailed to USCA
September 30, 2015 Filing 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Goldfine, Dan)
September 17, 2015 Filing 81 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (MAL)
September 17, 2015 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #80 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. (MAL)
September 16, 2015 Filing 83 Entered in Error
September 16, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #77 Order on motion to dismissOrder on Report and Recommendations by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Filing fee paid. (MAL) Modified on 10/7/2015 (IGC).
September 16, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #77 Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Filing fee paid. (Fry, Allison) (#79 termed and redocketed at #80)(GJS). Modified on 10/8/2015 (IGC).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 17, 2015 Set deadline: Amended complaint due by 9/8/2015 (MAL)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #61 motion to dismiss; granting #62 motion to dismiss; terminating #69 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 31, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel (Grabel, Joshua)
July 16, 2015 Filing 75 RESPONSE to objections to #69 Report and Recommendations filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri, Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response - List of Defendants)(Caldwell, Lori)
July 16, 2015 Filing 74 RESPONSE to objections to #69 Report and Recommendations GEICO's Response to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Objection to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
June 29, 2015 Filing 73 OMNIBUS OBJECTION by various Plaintiffs re #69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (MAL). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Reset deadline: Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2015 (MAL)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 3, 2015 Filing 69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW)
April 20, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company (Oates, Claire)
March 26, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company re #60 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Notice of Errata (Fischer, Ian)
March 23, 2015 Filing 66 REPLY to #64 Response to Motion re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 3/24/2015 (IGC).
March 23, 2015 Filing 65 REPLY to #64 Response to Motion re #62 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri, Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Ultimate Collision Doc. 39, #3 Exhibit C - Ultimate Collision Doc. 42)(Caldwell, Lori) Modified on 3/24/2015 (IGC).
March 14, 2015 Filing 64 Omnibus RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and #62 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Ultimate Collision v. State Farm)(Fry, Allison) Modified on 3/16/2015 (JET).
March 9, 2015 Set deadlines as to #62 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support, #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 3/13/2015 by Plaintiffs. (IGC)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting (153) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/6/2015. (SMW)
February 20, 2015 Filing 62 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri, Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Caldwell, Lori)
February 19, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
February 17, 2015 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #47 Order by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Fischer, Ian)
February 17, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance of Dan W. Goldfine, Joshua Grabel, Ian Fischer, Jamie Halavais Appearance by Ian Matthew Fischer on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company (Fischer, Ian)
February 17, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carpenter on behalf of Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Carpenter, Michael)
February 13, 2015 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #47 Order, #46 Order by American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin. (Jenkins, Sarah)
February 13, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Hurley on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin (Hurley, Ryan)
February 13, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin (Perkins, Heather)
February 13, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy Lynn Osborn on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin (Osborn, Kathy)
February 13, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jenkins on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin (Jenkins, Sarah)
February 13, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sean McCarthy on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin (McCarthy, Michael)
February 11, 2015 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Best, Robert)
February 11, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bradley Best on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Best, Robert)
February 9, 2015 Filing 48 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:14-cv-01857. File received electronically
February 6, 2015 Filing 51 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: MDL 2557. Receipt of original record from the District of Eastern District of Missouri, case number: 4:14-1857. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:15-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. Copies mailed. (LAM)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Middle District of Florida; Case Transferred via CM/ECF Extraction; (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 46 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
December 12, 2014 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri waiver signed on 12/8/2014, answer due 2/6/2015. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine Baber Fezzi for Defendant Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (Fezzi, Katherine) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (Schwartz, Steven) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Doc. #5) is GRANTED. The above-captioned action is STAYED pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Allstate Defendants Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #40) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/2/14. (ARL) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E. Wilke for Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilke, Daniel) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 28, 2014 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Safe Auto Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Preferred Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Advanced Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Lm General Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Government Employees Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Geico Indemnity Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Geico General Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Geico Casualty Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. United Services Automobile Association served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. USAA General Indemnity Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. American Family Mutual Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Farmers Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Nationwide Insurance Company of America served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allstate Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay (Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay (Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Deborah C. Druley for Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (LGK) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (LGK) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to Cornerstone National Insurance Company. (LGK) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (LGK) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Concord Auto Body, Inc. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: NA,. (Farrar, Tonna) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 4, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Concord Auto Body, Inc Process Server: HPS Process & Investigations (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4568950, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Market Share Report, #2 Exhibit 2-State Farm Dashboard, #3 Exhibit 3-Unpaid Procedures, #4 Exhibit 4-Consent Decree, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Allied Prop & Cas., #7 Summons Allstate Fire & Cas, #8 Summons Allstate Ins Co, #9 Summons Allstate Prop & Cas., #10 Summons American Standard, #11 Summons AmFam Mutual, #12 Summons Automobile Club, #13 Summons Cornerstone National, #14 Summons Esurance, #15 Summons Farm Bureau, #16 Summons Farmers Ins Co, #17 Summons GEICO Casualty, #18 Summons GEICO Gen Ins Co, #19 Summons GEICO Indemnity, #20 Summons Government Employees, #21 Summons Liberty Mutual Fire, #22 Summons Lm General, #23 Summons Nationwide Affinity, #24 Summons Nationwide Insurance, #25 Summons Progressive Advanced, #26 Summons Progressive Casualty, #27 Summons Progressive Direct, #28 Summons Progressive Northwestern, #29 Summons Progressive Preferred, #30 Summons Safe Auto, #31 Summons SAFECO, #32 Summons Shelter Mutual, #33 Summons State Farm Fire & Cas., #34 Summons State Farm Mutual, #35 Summons Travelers Home & Marine, #36 Summons United Svcs Auto, #37 Summons USAA Casualty, #38 Summons USAA Gen Indemnity)(Farrar, Tonna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2014: #39 Original Filing Form) (BAK). [Transferred from moed on 2/9/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concord Auto Body, Inc v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Daniel E. Wilke
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Daniel E. Wilke
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee's Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Deborah C. Druley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Deborah C. Druley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Michael Sean McCarthy
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Represented By: Sarah Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone National Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Michael Sean McCarthy
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Represented By: Sarah Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Deborah C. Druley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Deborah C. Druley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Katherine Baber Fezzi
Represented By: Steven Howard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Auto Body, Inc
Represented By: Tonna K. Farrar
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?