Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's of London, UK subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP56189A14 v. Fire & Life Safety America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's of London, UK subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP56189A14
Defendant: Fire & Life Safety America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2016cv00258
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Volusia
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/18/2017. (SN)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER -- On or before Thursday, February 23, 2017, the parties are DIRECTED to notify the Court whether they intend to: (1) submit additional briefing with respect to the Partial MSJ; or (2) rest on the current record for resolution of this motio n. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Fire & Life Safety America, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Fire & Life Safety America, Inc. as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/17/2017. (VMF)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/9/2016. (VMF)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER -- the Court determined that the cases should be consolidated for discovery purposes.On or before Monday, April 11, 2016, Fire & Life Safety America shall file a responsive pleading in the Ocean Walk Action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/1/2016. (VMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's of London, UK subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP56189A14 v. Fire & Life Safety America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's of London, UK subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP56189A14
Represented By: Paul A. Casetta
Represented By: Alyssa J. Endelman
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire & Life Safety America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?