Gazzara et al v. Pulte Home Corporation

Plaintiff: Shaun Parker Gazzara, Ana Paula Gazzara, Harry James Whitman and Marcia Faye Whitman
Defendant: Pulte Home Corporation
Case Number: 6:2016cv00657
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying 224 Motion for summary judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 224) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/14/2017. (MAF)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER denying 143 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/11/2017. (ED)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 166 Motion to exclude the testimony of Jeffrey Randazzo. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/10/2017. (ED)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 167 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas E. Miller. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/3/2017. (ED)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Compel production of documents identified in privilege logs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/16/2016. (EC)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/12/2016. (ED)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 136 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' supplemental expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/7/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion for remedy for breach of the parties' confidentiality agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 11/28/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/8/2016. (ED)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Quash; denying 75 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Quash; denying 76 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/6/2016. (Smith, Thomas)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel the production of documents; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Compel answers to interrogatories and the production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/30/2016. (Smith, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gazzara et al v. Pulte Home Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Parker Gazzara
Represented By: John Wesley Frost, II
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Michael Cornelius Sasso
Represented By: David Fuller Tegeler
Represented By: Lydia Sturgis Zbrzeznj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Paula Gazzara
Represented By: John Wesley Frost, II
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Michael Cornelius Sasso
Represented By: David Fuller Tegeler
Represented By: Lydia Sturgis Zbrzeznj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry James Whitman
Represented By: John Wesley Frost, II
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Michael Cornelius Sasso
Represented By: David Fuller Tegeler
Represented By: Lydia Sturgis Zbrzeznj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Faye Whitman
Represented By: John Wesley Frost, II
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Michael Cornelius Sasso
Represented By: David Fuller Tegeler
Represented By: Lydia Sturgis Zbrzeznj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Corporation
Represented By: Eric S. Adams
Represented By: John H. Dannecker
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Patrick G. Seyferth
Represented By: James Parker Terpening, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?