Thompson et al v. Dealer Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thompson, Barry Thompson, Katavon Brown and Gregory Raymond
Defendant: Dealer Management Services, Inc, Dealer Management Services, Inc. and TT of Brevard, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Toyota of Melbourne
Case Number: 6:2016cv01468
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER adopting #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #24 Amended MOTION for Settlement and Fairness Finding filed by Barry Thompson, Gregory Raymond, Katavon Brown. The Amended Joint Motion for Fairness Finding and Approval of Settlement is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court construes the Amended Joint Motion as a joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/4/2017. (MMW)
December 13, 2016 Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #24 Amended MOTION for Settlement and Fairness Finding filed by Barry Thompson, Gregory Raymond, Katavon Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/14/2016. (RDO)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #23 Motion for Fairness Finding and Approval of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/13/2016. (RDO)
December 13, 2016 Filing 24 Amended MOTION for Settlement and Fairness Finding by Katavon Brown, Gregory Raymond, Barry Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fully Executed Agreement)(Gray, Christopher)
December 12, 2016 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION for Fairness Finding and Approval of Settlement by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - settlement agreement)(Gray, Christopher) Text modified on 12/13/2016 (RDO).
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the parties to file a motion for a fairness finding on or before 12/12/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/21/2016. (RDO)
November 21, 2016 Filing 21 SETTLEMENT/TRIAL report by Katavon Brown, Gregory Raymond, Barry Thompson. (Gray, Christopher)
October 3, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #9 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by Katavon Brown. (Gray, Christopher)
October 3, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #9 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by Gregory Raymond. (Gray, Christopher)
October 3, 2016 Filing 18 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #9 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by Barry Thompson. (Gray, Christopher)
September 12, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of compliance re #9 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by TT of Brevard, Inc. (Nizel, Harris)
September 12, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of compliance re #9 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by Barry Thompson (Gray, Christopher)
September 12, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of compliance Compliance with Magistrate's #9 FLSA Scheduling Order by Dealer Management Services, Inc. (Eavenson, Trizia) Modified on 9/13/2016 (RDO).
September 6, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dealer Management Services, Inc.. Related case(s): y (Eavenson, Trizia)
September 6, 2016 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Dealer Management Services, Inc.. (Eavenson, Trizia)
September 6, 2016 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by TT of Brevard, Inc.. (Nizel, Harris)
August 24, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Katavon Brown, Gregory Raymond, Barry Thompson. Related case(s): y (Gray, Christopher)
August 24, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Katavon Brown, Gregory Raymond, Barry Thompson. (Gray, Christopher)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. By 9/12/16 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 10/31/16 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 10/3/2016, Settlement Report due by 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/22/16. (RDO)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/22/2016. (NBL) copies e-mailed
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/22/2016. (NBL) copies e-mailed
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/22/2016. (NBL) copies e-mailed
August 19, 2016 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Amended Complaint by Dealer Management Services, Inc.. (Originally filed in Brevard County Circuit Court on 8/16/16)(RDO)
August 19, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE by TT of Brevard, Inc. re #2 Amended Complaint of filing Defendant Dealership Management Services, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Dealership Management Service, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Nizel, Harris)
August 17, 2016 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Amended Complaint by TT of Brevard, Inc.. (Originally filed in Brevard County Circuit Court on 8/15/16)(RDO)
August 17, 2016 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Originally filed in Brevard County Circuit Court on 7/18/16)(RDO) (CLB).
August 17, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2015-CA-045082, filed in State Court on 10/8/15. Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number ORL056090. Filed by TT of Brevard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Dealer Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealer Management Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealer Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Trizia Ginarella Eavenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT of Brevard, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Toyota of Melbourne
Represented By: Harris Seth Nizel
Represented By: Scott W. Atherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Thompson
Represented By: Christopher D. Gray
Represented By: Robin Mary Orosz
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katavon Brown
Represented By: Christopher D. Gray
Represented By: Robin Mary Orosz
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Raymond
Represented By: Christopher D. Gray
Represented By: Robin Mary Orosz
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?