Bryant v. Orange County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: |
Willine Bryant and Max Gracia, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Orange County, Florida, Robert J. Buck, III, Maryanne Evans, Karen Clairmont, Elsa Galloza-Gonzalez and Lynn Marie Harter |
Case Number: |
6:2017cv01423 |
Filed: |
August 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Orlando Office |
County: |
Orange |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory A. Presnell |
Presiding Judge: |
Karla R. Spaulding |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 24, 2019 |
Filing
103
ORDER denying as moot 82 Motion for summary judgment; denying 85 Motion for summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for summary judgment. The Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 88) is GRANTED as t o Defendants Harter and Gonzalez and DENIED as to Defendant Buck. Defendant Clairmont's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 85) is DENIED. Defendant Evans's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 82) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/24/2019. (MAF)
|
February 1, 2019 |
Filing
81
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part 80 Motion to file exhibit under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/1/2019. (Spaulding, Karla)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting 54 motion to dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Orange County's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 54) is GRANTED. Count I of the Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/14/2018. (MAF)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing
44
ORDER denying 31 motion to dismiss; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 33 motion to dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Clairmont's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 31) and Defendant Evans's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 32) are DENIED. The Collective Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 33) is GRANTED as to Count I and DENIED as to all other Counts. Count I is DISMISSE D without prejudice. If Plaintiffs wish to amend their Complaint as to Count I, they must do so by January 22, 2018. Orange County's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the State Law Claim (Doc. 33) is GRANTED, and Orange County is hereby afforded fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file its answer and affirmative defenses. The other Defendants shall also answer the Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days.Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/8/2018. (MAF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?