Suntrust Bank, N.A. v. Esposita et al
Plaintiff: |
Suntrust Bank, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Deano S. Esposita, Amy C. Esposita, Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Through, Under, And Against The Herein Named Individual Defendant(s) Who Are Not Known To Be Dead Or Alive, Whether Said Unknown Parties May Claim An Interest, Regions Bank, Magnolia Plantation Homeowners Association, Inc. and Tenant #1, Tenant #2, Tenant #3, and Tenant #4 |
Case Number: |
6:2017cv01891 |
Filed: |
November 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Orlando Office |
County: |
Seminole |
Presiding Judge: |
G. Kendall Sharp |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas B. Smith |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 31, 2018 |
Filing
19
ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Deano S. Esposita's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 16 is denied. The Court hereby certifies that Deano S. Esposita's appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 1/31/2018. (SC)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
14
ENDORSED ORDER adopting and approving 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Esposita's Motion for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis 3 is denied for lack of jurisdiction and this case is remanded for improvident removal. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 11/28/2017. (SC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Suntrust Bank, N.A. v. Esposita et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Suntrust Bank, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Julie Anthousis |
Represented By: |
David Stockton Hendrix |
Represented By: |
Christian Leger |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deano S. Esposita |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amy C. Esposita |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Through, Under, And Against The Herein Named Individual Defendant(s) Who Are Not Known To Be Dead Or Alive, Whether Said Unknown Parties May Claim An Interest |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Regions Bank |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Magnolia Plantation Homeowners Association, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tenant #1, Tenant #2, Tenant #3, and Tenant #4 |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?