Sebti v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Abderrahmane Sebti
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. and Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. doing business as The Walt Disney Parks World Resort
Case Number: 6:2017cv02211
Filed: December 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #25 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/14/2018. (TKW)
August 13, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
March 22, 2018 Filing 24 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Richard Joyce appointed as Mediator. (LMM)
March 22, 2018 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 3/30/2018, Discovery due by 10/5/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/16/2018, Joint final Pretrial statement due by 3/15/2019, All other motions due by 3/29/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Trial term begins 5/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 11/5/2018. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/27/2018, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/29/2018 (LMM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/21/2018. (TKW)
March 19, 2018 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Muldowney, Patrick)
February 14, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc..(Muldowney, Patrick)
February 5, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
February 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. Related case(s): no (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference. Provided the parties agree to the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/26/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
January 26, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Abderrahmane Sebti. (Romano, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE to withdraw docket # 15 as duplicate by Abderrahmane Sebti re #15 Notice of pendency of related cases (Romano, Jay) Modified on 1/24/2018 (LMM).
January 24, 2018 Filing 15 **WITHDRAWN AS DUPLICATE PER #16 NOTICE** NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Abderrahmane Sebti. Related case(s): no (Romano, Jay) Modified on 1/24/2018 (LMM).
January 24, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 Order to show cause filed by Abderrahmane Sebti. (Romano, Jay)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/7/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/24/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
January 24, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Abderrahmane Sebti. Related case(s): no (Romano, Jay) Modified on 1/24/2018 (LMM).
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/24/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/24/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
January 23, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 12, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 1/10/2018 by Abderrahmane Sebti as to Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (LMM)
January 8, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (LMM)
January 2, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Abderrahmane Sebti. (Romano, Jay)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/16/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/2/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/16/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/2/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the United States Marshal. Upon receipt of the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s), the United States Marshal is directed to serve the summonses without cost to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/29/2017. (RN)
December 29, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Abderrahmane Sebti. (JP) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Abderrahmane Sebti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebti v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. doing business as The Walt Disney Parks World Resort
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abderrahmane Sebti
Represented By: Jay F. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?