Foster v. Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation, et al.

Plaintiff: Cheri A Foster
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Grande Vista Of Orlando Condominium Association, Inc., Marriott Vacation Club International and Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv01096
Filed: July 10, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Daniel C Irick
1 Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 41 NOTICE to counsel (Richard Grungo, Jr., Cathleen Kelly Rebar and Jeannie Park Lee) of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAA)
July 10, 2018 40 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:17-cv-12901. File received electronically
July 10, 2018 39 Featured Case ORDER granting #21 Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/10/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
July 10, 2018 38 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/10/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
July 5, 2018 37 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from counsel for defendant dated July 3, 2018. Counsel for plaintiff shall file a response with the Court by no later than July 12, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/5/2018. (sb) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
July 3, 2018 36 Letter from Defendant's Counsel re: Discovery Dispute per Local Rule 37.1. (LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
June 18, 2018 NOTICE: Telephone conference on 6/19/2018 shall be, and is hereby, adjourned. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
June 18, 2018 35 Letter from Defendant's Counsel re: Resolution of Discovery Dispute re #32 Letter. (LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
June 18, 2018 34 Letter from Plaintiff re discovery. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
June 11, 2018 33 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from defense counsel [D.I. 32] concerning a discovery dispute. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a response with the Court addressing Defendant's assertions by no later than 6/18/2018. The Court will conduct a telephone conference on 6/19/2018 at 3:30 P.M. Counsel for Defendant shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/11/2018. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
June 8, 2018 32 Letter from Defendant's Counsel re: Discovery Dispute per Local Rule 37.1. (LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/1/2018. (sb) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
May 1, 2018 31 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/2/2018 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/1/2018. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
April 4, 2018 30 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 4/25/2018 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 5/1/2018 at 2:15 P.M. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/4/2018. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/2018. (sb) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 27, 2018 29 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/25/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 4/2/2018. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/27/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 27, 2018 28 Featured Case ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION TO REMOVE CASE FROM THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/27/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 26, 2018 27 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida (LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 20, 2018 26 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHERI A FOSTER re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certification)(GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 7, 2018 25 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ORDERED that Plaintiff's extension request #24 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/7/2018. (gn ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 7, 2018 24 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by CHERI A FOSTER re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
February 1, 2018 23 Joint Discovery Plan by CHERI A FOSTER.(GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 22, 2018 22 Featured Case Order Initial Conference set for 2/27/2018 11:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/22/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 22, 2018 21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida by MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 22, 2018 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION.(LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 22, 2018 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION identifying Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 17, 2018 18 Certification of PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT on behalf of CHERI A FOSTER. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 17, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHLEEN KELLY REBAR on behalf of MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION (KELLY REBAR, CATHLEEN) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 17, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNIE PARK LEE on behalf of MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION (LEE, JEANNIE) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 17, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification #15 filed by R. Grungo on 1/17/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Corporate Disclosure Statement. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Certification USING *Certification*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 17, 2018 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHERI A FOSTER. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 17, 2018 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO GRANDE VISTA MARRIOTT VACATIONS WORLDWIDE AND MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB ONLY by CHERI A FOSTER. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 12, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB INTERNATIONAL served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 12, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. MARRIOTT VACATIONS WOLDWIDE CORPORATION served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 12, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
January 12, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. GRANDE VISTA OF ORLANDO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 29, 2017 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT per order to show cause against GRANDE VISTA OF ORLANDO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB INTERNATIONAL, MARRIOTT VACATIONS WOLDWIDE CORPORATION, filed by CHERI A FOSTER.(GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 21, 2017 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION served on 12/15/2017, answer due 1/5/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 21, 2017 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. GRANDE VISTA OF ORLANDO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 12/15/2017, answer due 1/5/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 21, 2017 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB INTERNATIONAL served on 12/15/2017, answer due 1/5/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 21, 2017 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHERI A FOSTER. MARRIOTT VACATIONS WOLDWIDE CORPORATION served on 12/15/2017, answer due 1/5/2018. (GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 20, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (Complaint #1 submitted by Richard Grungo, JR. on 12/11/17 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jbk, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 19, 2017 4 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend her complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/19/2017. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 12, 2017 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GRANDE VISTA OF ORLANDO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB INTERNATIONAL, MARRIOTT VACATIONS WOLDWIDE CORPORATION, filed by CHERI A FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 11, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jbk, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 11, 2017 Featured Case Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/11/17. (jbk, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 11, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jbk, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 11, 2017 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRANDE VISTA OF ORLANDO CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB INTERNATIONAL, MARRIOTT VACATIONS WOLDWIDE CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 11, 2017 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]
December 11, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8321043) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHERI A FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons MARRIOTT RESORTS HOSP, #3 Summons GRANDE VISTA OF ORLANDO, #4 Summons MARRIOTT VACATIONS WW, #5 Summons MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB)(GRUNGO, RICHARD) [Transferred from njd on 7/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri A Foster
Represented By: Richard Grungo, Jr.
Represented By: Laurie M. Lewis
Represented By: Joel J. Ewusiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grande Vista Of Orlando Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Vacation Club International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation
Represented By: Jeannie Park Lee
Represented By: Cathleen Kelly Rebar
Represented By: Scott A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?