Six Star, Inc. v. APR Motors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Six Star, Inc.
Defendant: APR Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01304
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Six Star, Inc.. (Eden, Jennifer)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Six Star, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Eden, Jennifer)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/13/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/13/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (BIA)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APR Motors, Inc., with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-75937) filed by Six Star, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Six Star, Inc. v. APR Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Six Star, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Eden
Represented By: Lori T. Milvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APR Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?