Christian Care Ministry, Inc. v. Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Christian Care Ministry, Inc.
Defendant: Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc., John Does 1-10, Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc. and Surecare, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01313
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
0 Judge: Roy B Dalton
1 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 21 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Defendants' Consent Motion for Telephonic Appearance. Provided that if the parties cannot agree on the essential terms of the case management report they must meet and confer in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/1/2018. (HMK)
September 28, 2018 20 Consent MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Surecare, Inc., Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc., Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Weissman, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 25, 2018 19 Remark: Doc. #18 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/25/18. (PKK)
September 24, 2018 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #7 Interested Persons Order by Surecare, Inc., Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc., Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc. (Weissman, Joseph) Modified on 9/25/2018 (LMM).
September 19, 2018 17 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph C. Daniels, Esq. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel must take the tutorial offered on the Middle District of Florida's website before using the CM/ECF system. Local counsel, Michael J. Beaudine, Esq., fully assumes all responsibilities set forth in Local Rule 2.02, including responsibility for trial in default of the non-resident attorney. If local counsel is unwilling to assume all required responsibilities, a written designation and consent to act by another local attorney must be filed within fourteen days of the date of this order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/19/2018. (HMK)
September 19, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joseph C. Daniels, appearing on behalf of Christian Care Ministry, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077028.) Related document: #16 MOTION for Joseph C. Daniels to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
September 19, 2018 16 MOTION for Joseph C. Daniels to appear pro hac vice by Christian Care Ministry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beaudine, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 18, 2018 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint by Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc..(Weissman, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint by Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc..(Weissman, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint by Surecare, Inc..(Weissman, Joseph)
September 12, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Weissman on behalf of Surecare, Inc., Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc., Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc. (Weissman, Joseph)
September 6, 2018 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr on 9/6/18. (PKK)
September 5, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Christian Care Ministry, Inc.. (Grosshans, Joshua)
September 5, 2018 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christian Care Ministry, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Grosshans, Joshua)
August 31, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Beaudine on behalf of Christian Care Ministry, Inc. (Beaudine, Michael)
August 23, 2018 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/23/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
August 23, 2018 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Ctp)(JLC)
August 20, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Christian Care Ministry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Grosshans, Joshua)
August 14, 2018 Set deadlines: Amended complaint due by 8/20/2018 (JP)
August 14, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/14/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
August 13, 2018 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits) (LMM)
August 10, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Surecare, Inc., Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc., Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc. (LMM)
August 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Surecare, Inc., Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc., Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-75978) filed by Christian Care Ministry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian Care Ministry, Inc. v. Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sureco Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sureco Health and Life Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surecare, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Care Ministry, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D. Grosshans
Represented By: Lori T. Milvain
Represented By: Joseph C. Daniels
Represented By: Michael J. Beaudine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?