United States of America v. Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency
Case Number: 6:2018cv01396
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel (Juan de Jesus Gonzalez) re: Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAA)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning on Septmeber 12, 2018 and ending on October 11, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 CLAIM VERIFIED CLAIM AND/OR STATEMENT OF RIGHT OF INTEREST by Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency. (Gonzalez, Juan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 US Marshal 285 form indicating the arrest in rem of the amount of $61,455 in US Currency. (RDO)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Pursuant to Rule G(3)(b)(i), Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is directed to issue the Warrant of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/27/2018. (MB)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (RDO)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency
Represented By: Juan De Jesus Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?