U.S. Lawns, Inc. v. Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Lawns, Inc.
Defendant: Billy Stain and Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01437
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9/4/18 by U.S. Lawns, Inc. as to Billy Stain. (Diamantas, Kyle)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9/4/18 by U.S. Lawns, Inc. as to Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Talley, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Talley, James)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Heather Campbell Burgess and Laura A. Reilly to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing by 9/24/18. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/10/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/10/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/24/2018. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 9/10/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/6/2018. (RN)
September 6, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Laura A Reilly, appearing on behalf of U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number Orl076641.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Laura A. Reilly to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
September 6, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Heather Carson Perkins, appearing on behalf of U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL076639.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Heather Carson Perkins to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
September 6, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Heather Campbell Burgess, appearing on behalf of U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL076637.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Heather Campbell Burgess to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Laura A. Reilly to appear pro hac vice by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Talley, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Heather Carson Perkins to appear pro hac vice by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Talley, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Heather Campbell Burgess to appear pro hac vice by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Talley, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST for oral argument re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction by U.S. Lawns, Inc.. (Talley, James)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JET)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc., Billy Stain. (JET)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Investigator Tasha Sim with exhibits and report in support of #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (JET)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Kenneth L. Hutchinson in support of #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (JET)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Memorandum in Support by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (JET)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Equitable Relief Pending Arbitration against Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc., Billy Stain (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL076521) filed by U.S. Lawns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD)(JET) Modified on 9/5/2018 (JET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Lawns, Inc. v. Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Stain
Represented By: Adam G. Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Stain Landscaping, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Lawns, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: James Michael Talley
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Laura A. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?