United States of America v. $129,719 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $129,719 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Michael Simon
Case Number: 6:2018cv01568
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 (Amended) Statement of CLAIM and interest in seized $129,719 in U.S. Currency by Michael Simon. (SPM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 Statement of CLAIM and interest in seized $129,719 in U.S. Currency by Michael Simon. (SPM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning October 1, 2018 and ending on October 30, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE/Receipt of Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by Michael Simon. (SPM) Modified on 10/18/2018 (SPM).
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Michael Simon. (SPM) Modified on 10/18/2018 (SPM).
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Andrejko, Nicole)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/28/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/28/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/21/2018. (Smith, Thomas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (SPM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in rem)(SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for forfeiture in rem against $129,719 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $129,719 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $129,719 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?