People's Trust Insurance Company v. Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.

Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company
Defendant: Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01651
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Anne C Conway
1 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Mark Thomas Babcock and Susan Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 11/7/2018. (Smith, Thomas)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney by People's Trust Insurance Company. (Stevens, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to strike re: 11 Notice (Other) filed by People's Trust Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/30/2018. (EC)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 (STRICKEN AND DELETED PER ORDER #12 ) NOTICE by People's Trust Insurance Company Cancellation of Deposition (Stevens, Michael) Modified on 10/31/2018 (RMF).
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by People's Trust Insurance Company. (Stevens, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by People's Trust Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Stevens, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Michael Bernard Stevens on behalf of People's Trust Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement #5 by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Cyberpower Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Other Affiliate Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. for Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc... (Carey, Douglas) Modified on 10/22/2018 (RMF).
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.. Related case(s): no (Carey, Douglas)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/23/2018, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/9/2018. (RMF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 for attorney Mark T. Babcock (signed by deputy clerk).(Copy mailed to attorney). (RMF)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in Seminole State Court on 9/27/18 by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.(RMF)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. filed in Seminole County State Court on 6/11/2018 by People's Trust Insurance Company.(RMF)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Court, case number 2018-CA-1524-11E-K filed in State Court on 6/11/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL 77372 filed by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(RMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People's Trust Insurance Company v. Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Thomas Babcock
Represented By: Theodore A. Stevens
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?