Ery v. Central Florida Educators Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Barbara Ery
Defendant: Central Florida Educators Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 6:2018cv01682
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Dave on behalf of Barbara Ery (Dave, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #8 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mail NOT resent to Barbara Ery. (BIA)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND DIRECTION TO CLERK OF COURT granting in part and denying in part #7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Barbara Ery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/5/2018. (ECJ)
November 3, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Bridget L. Fields to withdraw as attorney by Barbara Ery. (Fields, Bridget) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Barbara Ery identifying Other Affiliate Credit Repair Lawyers of America, P.C. for Barbara Ery.. (Fields, Bridget)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Barbara Ery. Related case(s): no (Fields, Bridget)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/16/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/16/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Central Florida Educators Federal Credit Union. (LMM)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Florida Educators Federal Credit Union with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-77470 filed by Barbara Ery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ery v. Central Florida Educators Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ery
Represented By: Bridget Lynn Fields
Represented By: Timothy L. Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Educators Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?