Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc. v. Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Plaintiff: Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc.
Defendant: Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv01683
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment after Default filed by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc. A party's failure to file written objections to the proposed findings and recommendations contained in this report within fourteen days from the date of its filing waives the right to challenge on appeal the district court's order based on unobjected-to factual and legal conclusions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/3/2018. (HMK)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Default judgment by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Knox, Steven)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (RMF)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc.. (Burden, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe International (Orlando), Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe International (U.S.A.), Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Limited, Other Affiliate HRC Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe International (Hollywood), Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Stadium Tenant, Inc., Other Affiliate Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Seminole HR Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate SHRE/SHRI, LLC, Other Affiliate Hard Rock NYY, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Wisconsin, LLC, Other Affiliate Seminole EV Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Other Affiliate HR EV Concession Co., LLC, Other Affiliate HR EV Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Interactive, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Aruba Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Aruba Operator N.V., Other Affiliate HR Jamaica, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Canada Gaming, Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Aqueduct, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Atlantic City, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Massachusetts, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Jersey Manager, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Philadelphia Manager, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Ohio Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Ohio Manager, LLC, Other Affiliate HR Punta Cana, LLC, Other Affiliate HR CAGE, LLC, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe St. Thomas, Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Har Rock Records, Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Records (USA), LLC, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe International (Chicago), Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe International (K.W.), Inc., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe Merchandise, Inc., Other Affiliate HRH Management (Chicago) LLC, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe Foundation, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe Franchise Group LLC, Other Affiliate Rank Hotels Orlando, Inc., Other Affiliate Seminole Hard Rock International Cooperative U.A., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Belgium) SA, Other Affiliate Seminole Hard Rock International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate HARD ROCK CAFE NICE SAS, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe Austria GmbH, Other Affiliate Hard Rock International (AU1) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock International (AU2) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Germany) GmbH, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate HRSA Restaurants (Pty) Ltd, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Denmark) A/S, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Amsterdam) BV, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Czech Republic) s.r.o., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (France) S.A., Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Italy) Srl, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Portugal) SA, Other Affiliate Seminole Hard Rock International Spain S.L., Other Affiliate Seminole Hard Rock U.K. Ltd, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Europe Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Hotels Europe Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock International Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Records UK Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (Edinburgh) Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Cafe (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate Hard Rock Holdings Limited for Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc... (Knox, Steven)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Knox, Steven)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 10-15-2018 by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc. as to Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Knox, Steven)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/25/2018, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/11/2018. (RMF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (DG)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA-053519 filed by Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc. v. Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hard Rock Hotel Licensing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Douglas Knox
Represented By: Christian C. Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kittridge Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?