Zelenika v. UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: John Zelenika
Defendant: UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01752
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Braunstein, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Joint Agreed Motion to Appear Telephonically to Prepare Case Management Report, provided the parties agree on the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/29/2018. (MB)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically to Prepare Case Management Report by John Zelenika. (Braunstein, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Streit, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 Remark: Doc. #17 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/5/18. (ESG)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by John Zelenika. (Einhorn, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John Zelenika. Related case(s): no (Einhorn, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/1/18.(ESG)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate MHM Group, Inc., Other Affiliate UNITS Moving and Portable Storage of Charleston, Inc., Other Affiliate UNITS Moving and Portable Storage of Greenville, Inc. for UNITS Franchising Group, Inc... (Streit, Robert) Modified on 11/1/2018 (BIA).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #5 Order to Show Cause; denying as moot #9 Motion to Expedite; and denying as moot #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (ESG)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 Certification of John Zelenika re #5 Order to show cause filed by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc. (Streit, Robert) Modified on 10/26/2018 (BIA).
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to show cause filed by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Streit, Robert)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.. (Streit, Robert)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to for Expedited, Written Discovery to Establish Plaintiff's Citizenship by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification)(Streit, Robert) Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 10/25/2018 (BIA).
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc..(Streit, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/19/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to show cause as to UNITS Franchising Group, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/17/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Michael D. Braunstein of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel JoyAnn Kenny of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:18-cv-1752-Orl-37GJK. (NAS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit, in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-008800 filed in State Court on 8/14/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14720296 filed by UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Exhibit All Remaining State Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Streit, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelenika v. UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zelenika
Represented By: Robert M. Einhorn
Represented By: Michael Daniel Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITS Franchising Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Streit
Represented By: JoyAnn Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?