CEVD Holdings, LLC v. Virginia College, LLC

Plaintiff: CEVD Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Virginia College, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv01754
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: John Antoon
1 Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: in light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice #6 , the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/19/2018. (BRS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by CEVD Holdings, LLC. (Bombulie, James) Modified on 10/19/2018 (SPM).
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Virginia College, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Education Corporation of America for Virginia College, LLC. (Motles, Irene) Modified on 10/19/2018 (SPM).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/18/2018. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/18/2018. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:18-cv-1754-Orl-28DCI. (NAS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court in and for Seminole County, Florida, case number 2018-cc-003415-21-S filed in State Court on 10/04/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14721421 filed by Virginia College, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tres Cleveland, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tres Cleveland (State Court Doc's), #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tres Cleveland, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tres Cleveland, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tres Cleveland, #6 Affidavit of Roger L. Swartzwelder, #7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Roger L. Swartzwelder, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Motles, Irene) Modified on 10/17/2018 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEVD Holdings, LLC v. Virginia College, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia College, LLC
Represented By: Irene Susan Motles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEVD Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Anthony Bombulie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?