Rodriguez v. Hibachi Express et al
Plaintiff: Saul Rodriguez
Defendant: Jing S Xie and Hibachi Express
Case Number: 6:2018cv01911
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases #4 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Saul Rodriguez. Related case(s): No (Espino, Monica) Modified on 11/16/2018 (RMF).
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF by Saul Rodriguez. (Espino, Monica)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing.(FLSA). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/27/2018, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/13/2018. (RMF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Hibachi Express, Jing S Xie. (RMF)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:18-cv-1911-Orl-22TBS. (SJB)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14798216) filed by Saul Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Espino, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Hibachi Express et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jing S Xie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibachi Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Rodriguez
Represented By: Monica Espino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?