Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc. v. Vistana Signature Experiences, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc. and The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc.
Defendant: Vistana Signature Experiences, Inc., ST. REGIS NEW YORK MANAGEMENT, INC., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., ST. REGIS RESIDENCE CLUB, NEW YORK, INC., INTERVAL LEISURE GROUP, INC.,, VISTANA VACATION OWNERSHIP, INC. and Interval Leisure Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01938
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to show cause filed by The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc.. (Romano, Sharina)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice as duplicative litigation as to The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/19/2018. (DJD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc.. Related case(s): y (Romano, Sharina)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc. (Romano, Sharina) Modified on 11/29/2018 (SPM).
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 (Re-filed at #9 with correct event code) NOTICE of pendency of related cases by The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc. (Romano, Sharina) Modified on 11/29/2018 (SPM).
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14826888) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Order from S.D.N.Y. transferring declaratory judgment claim (Count IV of S.D.N.Y. Second Amended Complaint) to M.D. Fla.)(Romano, Sharina)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to show cause No later than November 29, 2018, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why sanctions, including, but not limited to, dismissal of the case, should not be imposed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Local Rule 3.10. Failure to respond in the time provided may result in this case being dismissed without further warning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/15/2018. (MB)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/14/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/28/2018. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 11/14/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:18-cv-1938-Orl-41GJK. (NAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 Case transferred in from District of S.D.N.Y.; Case Number 1:17-cv-1476-GHW. File received electronically filed by Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romano, Sharina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc. v. Vistana Signature Experiences, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vistana Signature Experiences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. REGIS NEW YORK MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. REGIS RESIDENCE CLUB, NEW YORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERVAL LEISURE GROUP, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISTANA VACATION OWNERSHIP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interval Leisure Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc.
Represented By: Sharina Talbot Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fifth and Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association, Inc.
Represented By: Sharina Talbot Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?