U.S. Bank N.A. v. Gresham et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Defendant: Unknown Tenants/Owners 3, Thomas C. McGill, Unknown Trustee of Emergo Living Trust, Jones Mark Gresham, Candy A. Gresham, Unknown Tenants/Owners 1, Judge T. Phillips, III, Trustee for Emergo Living Trust, Towers Grande Condominium Association, Inc., Unknown Beneficiaries of the Emergo Living Trust and Unknown Tenants/Owners 2
Case Number: 6:2018cv01954
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to attorney Jennifer Scott. The Court directed Jennifer Scott to take the appropriate steps to begin using CM/ECF on or before January 9, 2019. Attorney Jennifer Scott has failed to comply. It is therefore ORDERED that Jennifer Scott file a written response within fourteen (14) days why sanctions should not be imposed, to include termination from the case, for her failure to comply. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/14/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
December 14, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable-No such number-Unable to Forward- re: #5 Interested persons order, #4 Related case order and track 2 notice. Mail not resent to Judge T. Phillips, III. (DMA)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Sykes, Jonathan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by U.S. Bank N.A.. Related case(s): YES (Sykes, Jonathan) Modified on 12/11/2018 (RDO).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Jennifer Scott to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/10/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(a) and (g) #7 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO E-FILE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/6/2018. (MB)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Sykes on behalf of U.S. Bank N.A. (Sykes, Jonathan)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Judge T. Phillips, III. (RDO)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Judge T. Phillips, III. Related case(s): no (RDO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to file electronically by Judge T. Phillips, III. (RDO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2017-32180-CICI, filed in State Court on 12/26/17. Filed by Judge T. Phillips, III.(RDO)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/26/2018. (GNB) copies mailed
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/26/2018. (GNB) copies mailed
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER striking #1 Notice of Removal and directing pro se Defendant Judge T. Phillips, III to file an Amended Notice of Removal on or by December 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/20/2018. (SCM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to counsel Jennifer M. Scott of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (RDO)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2017-32180-CICI filed in State Court on 12/26/17. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL078563 filed by Judge T. Phillips, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B part 1-Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit B part 1(continued)-Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit B part 2- Amended Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibit B part 2(continued)-Amended Verified Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2018: #7 Exhibit A-State Court Docket) (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. Gresham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenants/Owners 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trustee of Emergo Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Mark Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy A. Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenants/Owners 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge T. Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee for Emergo Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towers Grande Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Beneficiaries of the Emergo Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenants/Owners 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Scott
Represented By: Gennifer Lynn Bridges
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?