Juul Labs, Inc. v. Dovberg
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Noah Dovberg
Case Number: 6:2018cv02018
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Juul Labs, Inc. (Hull, Bryan) Modified on 1/18/2019 (SPM).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/14/2019. (RDO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for leave to file under seal by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Hull, Bryan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 11/28/18 by Juul Labs, Inc. as to Noah Dovberg by substitute service on co-resident. (Banker, David) Modified on 12/14/2018 (SPM).
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Juul Labs, Inc. (Hull, Bryan) Modified on 12/12/2018 (SPM).
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/5/2018. (RDO)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Juul Labs, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Banker, David) Modified on 12/5/2018 (SPM).
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Daniel E. Yonan, Michael E. Joffre, Nirav N. Desai, and Jonathan Tuminaro to appear pro hac vice by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Banker, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael E. Joffre, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054355.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Michael E. Joffre to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nirav N. Desai, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054355.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Nirav N. Desai appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Daniel E. Yonan, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054355.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Daniel E. Yonan to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathan Tuminaro, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054355.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Jonathan Tuminaro to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/3/2018. (RDO)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/3/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/17/2018. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/3/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Daniel E. Yonan, Michael E. Joffre, Nirav N. Desai, and Jonathan Tuminaro to appear pro hac vice by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Banker, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Noah Dovberg. (SPM)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel, Daniel E. Yonan, Michael E. Joffre, Nirav N. Desai, and Jonathan Tuminaro, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). ctp (SPM)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6-Part 1, #8 Exhibit 6-Part 2, #9 Exhibit 6-Part 3, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8-Part 1, #12 Exhibit 8-Part 2, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10-Part 1, #15 Exhibit 10-Part 2, #16 Exhibit 10-Part 3, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12-Part 1, #19 Exhibit 12-Part 2, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14-Part 1, #22 Exhibit 14-Part 2, #23 Exhibit 14-Part 3, #24 Exhibit 15) (SPM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:18-cv-2018-Orl-41KRS. (SJB)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14844940) filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons)(Banker, David) Modified on 11/21/2018 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. Dovberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Dovberg
Represented By: Lori J. Sandman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Daniel E. Yonan
Represented By: Jonathan Tuminaro
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Michael E. Joffre
Represented By: Nirav N. Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?