Davis v. I.R.S.
Plaintiff: Dominique A. Davis
Defendant: I.R.S.
Case Number: 6:2018cv02052
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to strike re: #10 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Dominique A. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/24/2019. (RDO)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 (STRICKEN BY #11 ORDER) OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Dominique A. Davis. (RDO) Modified on 1/25/2019 (RDO).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) withdrawing #6 Report and Recommendations.; granting #7 Motion to Continue Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/18/2019. (RDO)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/18/2019. (RDO)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Complaint by Dominique A. Davis. (Submitted with the motion is a Complaint which contains tax return forms which include the Plaintiff's social security number and has not been scanned) (RDO)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Dominique A. Davis recommending the District Judge dsmiss this action, deny all pending motions as moot and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/14/2019. (RDO)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove the Complaint (and exhibits thereto) filed at Doc. #4 from CM/ECF and maintain those documents in paper form until the case is closed. On or before January 10, 2019, Plaintiff must file a redacted amended complaint (and exhibits thereto) following the instructions in the.pdf order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/20/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against I.R.S. with Jury Demand filed by Dominique A. Davis.(DMA) Modified on 12/21/2018 (RDO). (RDO). Modified on 1/22/2019 (RDO).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) re 1 Complaint filed by Dominique A. Davis. The Clerk shall remove the document from the public record and the Plaintiff is order to file a redacted copy of the Complaint on or before 12/16/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/4/2018. (RDO)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominique A. Davis. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I.R.S. with Jury Demand filed by Dominique A. Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. I.R.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.R.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?