United States of America v. $67,040 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $67,040 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Shannon Nicole Smith
Case Number: 6:2018cv02141
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne C. Nebesky on behalf of United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Claim. The deadline for Claimant Shannon Nicole Smith to file a Notice of Claim is extended up to and including March 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/8/2019. (ECJ)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint until March 15, 2019 by Claimant Shannon Nicole Smith. (Brunvand, Bjorn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 2/11/2019 (JET).
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 US Marshal 285 form for arresting the currency and serving the Complaint and Warrant in Rem on 1/9/19. (JET) Modified on 1/16/2019 (JET).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/28/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 motion for issuance of Warrant of Arrest In Rem. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue the Warrant that was submitted with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/17/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (JET)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for issuance of Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America. (JET) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.(Proposed Warrant was submitted and is in hanging file pending a ruling on the motion.)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $67,040 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $67,040 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $67,040 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Represented By: Suzanne C. Nebesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Bjorn Erik Brunvand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?