United States of America v. Marc et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marcgenson Marc, Character Financial Solutions, LLC, Dosuld Pierre, Advanced Tax Services, Inc., Shirleen Thales, Tiana Character, Genson Financial Group, LLC and LeNorris LaMoute
Case Number: 6:2018cv02147
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Tiana Character, Character Financial Solutions, LLC.(Jefferson, Nehemiah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 40 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shirleen Thales. (LMM)
February 6, 2019 Filing 39 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dosuld Pierre. (LMM)
February 6, 2019 Filing 38 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LeNorris LaMoute. (LMM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Entry of Default; granting #35 Motion for Entry of Default; granting #36 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/5/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Shirleen Thales by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 5, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Dosuld Pierre by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 5, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against LeNorris LaMoute by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 4, 2019 Filing 33 Remark: Doc. #32 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/4/19. (ESG)
February 1, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #23 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Robins, Samuel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #22 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Robins, Samuel) Modified on 2/4/2019 (LMM).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (PKK)
January 15, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 1/15/2019 re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by United States of America. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (JLC)
January 10, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER of Defendants, Marcgenson Marc, Advanced Tax Services, Inc., and Genson Financial Group, LLC, to #1 Complaint by Marcgenson Marc.(Garvin, David) Modified on 1/11/2019 (SPM).
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Temporary Restraining Order, U.S. v. Harden, Case No. 6:18-cv-2148-CEM-DCI, December 21, 2018 (unpublished), #2 Preliminary Injunction, U.S. v. Harden, Case No. 6:18-cv-2148-CEM-DCI, January 7, 2019 (unpublished))(Applegate, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 26 Consolidated RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Garvin, David) Modified on 1/8/2019 (LMM). Modified on 1/8/2019 (LMM).
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Garvin on behalf of Marcgenson Marc (Garvin, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Nehemiah Jefferson on behalf of Tiana Character, Character Financial Solutions, LLC (Jefferson, Nehemiah)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/4/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/4/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on Character Financial Solutions, LLC. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 12/28/2018 by United States of America as to Character Financial Solutions, LLC. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on Shirleen Thales. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on Dosuld Pierre. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on LeNorris LaMoute. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on Genson Financial Group LLC. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on Advanced Tax Services, Inc. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #7 Order pdf on Marcgenson Marc. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 12/22/2018 by United States of America as to Shirleen Thales. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 12/22/2018 by United States of America as to Dosuld Pierre. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 12/22/2018 by United States of America as to LeNorris LaMoute. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/21/2018 by United States of America as to Genson Financial Group, LLC. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/21/2018 by United States of America as to Advanced Tax Services, Inc.. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 12/21/2018 by United States of America as to Marcgenson Marc. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 Set/reset deadlines as to #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction . Responses due by 1/7/2019, Replies due by 1/9/2019., Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2019 at 02:15 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (LMM)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER taking under advisement #6 motion for preliminary injunction and setting expedited briefing schedule. See PDF for directions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/21/2018. (PKK)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for preliminary injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Revenue Agent Ricky Poole, #2 Declaration of Alean Jackson, #3 Declaration of Celia Kelly, #4 Declaration of Earlene Wiley, #5 Declaration of Estevan Acedo, #6 Declaration of Keith Miles, #7 Declaration of Keitra Collier, #8 Declaration of Minnesha Cooper, #9 Declaration of Mira McDougald, #10 Declaration of Mohammed Islam, #11 Declaration of Shanna Rouse, #12 Declaration of Shantarrian Baker Mobley, #13 Declaration of Tammy Jackson, #14 Declaration of Wallace Gordon, #15 Declaration of Wallace Hunt, #16 Exhibit A, #17 Exhibit B, #18 Exhibit C, #19 Exhibit D, #20 Exhibit E, #21 Exhibit F, #22 Exhibit G, #23 Exhibit H, #24 Exhibit I, #25 Exhibit J, #26 Exhibit K, #27 Exhibit L, #28 Exhibit M, #29 Exhibit N, #30 Exhibit O, #31 Exhibit P, #32 Exhibit Q, #33 Exhibit R, #34 Exhibit S, #35 Exhibit T, #36 Exhibit U, #37 Exhibit V, #38 Exhibit W, #39 Exhibit X, #40 Exhibit Y, #41 Exhibit Z, #42 Exhibit AA, #43 Exhibit BB, #44 Exhibit CC, #45 Exhibit DD, #46 Exhibit EE, #47 Exhibit FF, #48 Exhibit GG, #49 Exhibit HH, #50 Exhibit II, #51 Exhibit JJ, #52 Exhibit KK, #53 Exhibit LL, #54 Exhibit MM, #55 Exhibit NN, #56 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Applegate, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for temporary restraining order; denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/20/2018. (PKK)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:18-cv-2147-Orl-37TBS. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order , MOTION for preliminary injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Revenue Agent Ricky Poole, #2 Declaration of Alean Jackson, #3 Declaration of Celia Kelly, #4 Declaration of Earlene Wiley, #5 Declaration of Estevan Acedo, #6 Declaration of Keith Miles, #7 Declaration of Keitra Collier, #8 Declaration of Minnesha Cooper, #9 Declaration of Mira McDougald, #10 Declaration of Mohammed Islam, #11 Declaration of Shanna Rouse, #12 Declaration of Shantarrian Baker Mobley, #13 Declaration of Tammy Jackson, #14 Declaration of Wallace Gordon, #15 Declaration of Wallace Hunt, #16 Exhibit A - Advanced Tax Services Inc. and Genson Financial Group, LLC corporate documents, #17 Exhibit B - Character Financial Solutions, LLC articles of incorporation, #18 Exhibit C - Erick Burkett 2013 tax return, #19 Exhibit D - Bradd Jones 2013 tax return, #20 Exhibit E - Bradd Jones 2014 tax return, #21 Exhibit F -Vernish Allen 2016 tax return, #22 Exhibit G - Ellis Bonds 2015 tax return, #23 Exhibit H - Ellis Bonds 2016 tax return, #24 Exhibit I - Brittany Jackson customer file, #25 Exhibit J - Brittany Jackson 2016 tax return, #26 Exhibit K - Beverly Jackson 2016 tax return, #27 Exhibit L - Beverly Jackson 2016 wage and withholding information, #28 Exhibit M - Lorenzo Maye 2017 tax return, #29 Exhibit N - Lorenzo Maye 2017 wage and withholding information, #30 Exhibit O - Stacie Washington 2017 tax return, #31 Exhibit P - Stacie Washington 2017 wage and withholding information, #32 Exhibit Q - Minnesha Cooper 2017 tax return, #33 Exhibit R - Minnesha Cooper 2017 wage and withholding information, #34 Exhibit S - Jonathan Torvik 2016 tax return, #35 Exhibit T - Naila Hamimaz 2016 tax return, #36 Exhibit U - Mohammed Islam 2014 tax return, #37 Exhibit V - Mohammed Islam 2015 tax return, #38 Exhibit W - Mohammed Islam 2016 tax return, #39 Exhibit X - Mohammed Islam 2017 tax return, #40 Exhibit Y - Celia Kelly 2017 tax return, #41 Exhibit Z - Earlene Wiley 2017 tax return, #42 Exhibit AA - Mira McDougald 2016 tax return, #43 Exhibit BB - Mira McDougald 2017 tax return, #44 Exhibit CC - Minnesha Cooper 2016 tax return, #45 Exhibit DD - Wallace Hunt 2017 tax return, #46 Exhibit EE - Shantarrian Baker Mobley 2016 tax return, #47 Exhibit FF - Shantarrian Baker Mobley 2017 tax return, #48 Exhibit GG - Shanna Rouse 2017 tax return, #49 Exhibit HH - Keitra Collier 2016 tax return, #50 Exhibit II - Keitra Collier 2017 tax return, #51 Exhibit JJ - Alean Jackson 2017 tax return, #52 Exhibit KK - Tammy and Willie Jackson 2017 tax return, #53 Exhibit LL - Keith Miles 2017 tax return, #54 Exhibit MM - Estevan Acedo 2017 tax return, #55 Exhibit NN - Wallace Gordon 2017 tax return, #56 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #57 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Applegate, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Advanced Tax Services, Inc., Tiana Character, Character Financial Solutions, LLC, Genson Financial Group, LLC, LeNorris LaMoute, Marcgenson Marc, Dosuld Pierre, Shirleen Thales. (RMF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Tax Services, Inc., Tiana Character, Character Financial Solutions, LLC, Genson Financial Group, LLC, LeNorris Lamoute, Marcgenson Marc, Dosuld Pierre, Shirleen Thales filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Marc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcgenson Marc
Represented By: David M. Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Character Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nehemiah Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dosuld Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Tax Services, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirleen Thales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiana Character
Represented By: Nehemiah Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genson Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: David M. Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeNorris LaMoute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel A. Applegate
Represented By: Jared S. Wiesner
Represented By: Alison Austen Yewdell
Represented By: Samuel Peter Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?