Kumar et al v. Kabulo

Plaintiff: Atul Kumar and AAD Homes, Inc.
Defendant: Francis Mwana Kabulo
Case Number: 6:2018cv02165
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER remanding this case to Orange County Court. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/9/2019. (JRJ)
December 21, 2018 Set/reset deadlines: File the Complaint; and Pay Filing Fee payment or File a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis due by 1/4/2019 (DMA)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before January 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall do the following: File the Complaint; and either pay the full filing fee or file a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The failure to file the Complaint and to either pay the full filing fee or file a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the time provided will result in this case being remanded to state court without further warning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/21/2018. (SPM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francis Mwana Kabulo. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Court, case number 2018-CC-016081-O filed by Francis Mwana Kabulo. (Attachments: #1 State Court Other Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar et al v. Kabulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atul Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAD Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Mwana Kabulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?