Potter v. Florida Patients Compensations Fund et al
Plaintiff: Issac A. Potter, Jr.
Defendant: Florida Patients Compensations Fund, Joshua Stephany, Orlando Health, Inc., Gerber Life Insurance Company and Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv02205
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing the case and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/21/2019. (JRJ)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #14 Objection filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Guzzi, Gary)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Objection to Order Filed December 26, 2018 for Application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs re #11 Order. (AC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order, #10 Interested persons order by Gerber Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. for Gerber Life Insurance Company.. (Guzzi, Gary)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gerber Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Guzzi, Gary)
January 31, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/15/2019 (DMA)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice; On or before February 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/31/2019. (RN)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Gerber Life Insurance Company shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/31/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel Corey Berkin, Esq. of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk) (ctp). (DMA)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J. Guzzi on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company (Guzzi, Gary)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Issac A. Potter, Jr. (DMA)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Military Service by Issac A. Potter, Jr. (DMA)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Issac A. Potter, Jr. (DMA)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/31/2018. (GNB) copies mailed
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/31/2018. (GNB) copies mailed
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Issac A. Potter, Jr. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Florida Patients Compensations Fund, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Orlando Health, Inc., Joshua Stephany with Jury Demand filed by Issac A. Potter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter v. Florida Patients Compensations Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Patients Compensations Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Stephany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gideon Reitblat
Represented By: Gary J. Guzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac A. Potter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?